EP2774640 - Re-useable injector device for syringe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5 Basel Street, P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL | [2014/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cowe, Toby 9 Stanwick Crescent Cheltenham, GL51 9LQ / GB | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Cottam, David William, et al Teva UK Ltd. Global Patent Group Field House Station Approach Harlow, Essex CM20 2FB / GB | [2014/39] | Application number, filing date | 13158439.3 | 08.03.2013 | [2014/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2774640 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2774640 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/24 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
A61M5/2033 (EP);
A61M5/24 (EP);
A61M5/3157 (EP);
A61M2005/202 (EP);
A61M2005/206 (EP);
A61M2005/208 (EP);
A61M2005/2407 (EP);
A61M2005/2488 (EP);
A61M2005/3143 (EP);
A61M2205/581 (EP);
A61M2205/584 (EP);
A61M5/3204 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/37] | Title | German: | Wiederverwendbare Einspritzvorrichtung für eine Spritze | [2014/37] | English: | Re-useable injector device for syringe | [2014/37] | French: | Dispositif d'injecteur réutilisable pour seringue | [2014/37] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2013 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 08.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2011125100 (SCHWIRTZ ANDREAS [AT], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2-19; | [Y]US2012191047 (RADAY LIOR [IL], et al) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2009141219 (SHL GROUP AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document * | by applicant | US3849550 | US5800808 | US5858964 | US5981589 | US6048898 | US6054430 | US6214791 | US6342476 | US6362161 | - LAMPERT, "Autoimmune and virus-induced demyelinating diseases. A review", AM. J. PATH., (1978), vol. 91, pages 176 - 208 | - JOHNSON ET AL., "Copolymer 1 reduces relapse rate and improves disability in relapsing-remitting multiple sclerosis: results of a phase III multicenter, double-blind placebo-controlled trial. The Copolymer 1 Multiple Sclerosis Study Group", NEUROL., (1995), vol. 45, page 1268 | - FILIPPI ET AL., "Glatiramer acetate reduces the proportion of MS lesions evolving into black holes", NEUROL., (2001), vol. 57, pages 731 - 733 | - "COPAXONE@", Physician's Desk Reference, THOMPSON REUTERS - PHYSICIAN'S DESK REFERENCE INC., (2008), pages 3110 - 3113 | - YONG, "Differential mechanisms of action of interferon-? and glatiramer acetate in MS", NEUROLOGY, (2002), vol. 59, pages 1 - 7 |