|
05.11.2021 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2021 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2021 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2021 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.10.2021 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.08.2021 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.08.2021 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.08.2021 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2021 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
09.07.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.07.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2021 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.05.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.2021 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2021 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.05.2021 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
8 |
|
19.05.2021 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2021 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.05.2021 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2021 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.05.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.05.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.05.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2021 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2021 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2021 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2021 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.10.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.10.2020 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
13.10.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2020 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2019 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
08.04.2019 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
08.02.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.02.2019 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.01.2019 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2018 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2018 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.11.2018 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.11.2018 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.11.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2018 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
05.11.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
05.11.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
05.11.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
53 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.10.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.10.2018 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2018 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Request for correction of client data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.10.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.09.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.09.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.09.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.09.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.09.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
05.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.2018 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2018 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.09.2018 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.09.2018 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.2018 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.05.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.2018 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.01.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2017 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.06.2017 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2016 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2016 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2016 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
09.03.2016 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
08.02.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2014 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.11.2013 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2013 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2013 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2013 |
Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
64 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
15.06.2013 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
15.06.2013 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2013 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
15.06.2013 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.06.2013 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
15.06.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.06.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
15.06.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
15.06.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2013 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.06.2013 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.06.2013 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.06.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2013 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2013 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |