EP2611042 - Immunoassay test strip integrating radio frequency identification tags (RFID) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Altivera L.L.C. 10400 Connecticut Ave., Suite 602 Kensington, MD 20895 / US | [2014/50] |
Former [2013/27] | For all designated states Altivera, LLC 9505 Hemswell Place Potomac, MD 20854 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peeters, John P. 9505 Hemswell Place Potomac, MD 20854 / US | [2013/27] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/27] | Becker Kurig Straus Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13160321.9 | 24.01.2005 | [2013/27] | Priority number, date | US20040539419P | 27.01.2004 Original published format: US 539419 P | [2013/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2611042 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2611042 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/00, C12Q1/00, C12M3/00, G08B1/08, G08B21/00, G08B23/00, G08C15/00, G01N33/543 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
A61B5/0002 (EP,US);
G01N33/543 (KR);
A61B5/02028 (US);
A61B5/00 (KR);
A61B5/0008 (EP,US);
A61B5/1112 (EP,US);
A61B5/14514 (EP,US);
A61B5/14546 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150358 (EP,US);
A61B5/150793 (EP,US);
A61B5/150854 (EP,US);
A61B5/15087 (EP,US);
A61B5/150969 (EP,US);
A61B5/150984 (EP,US);
A61B5/157 (EP,US);
A61B5/411 (EP,US);
A61B5/4839 (EP,US);
A61B5/6833 (US);
A61B90/98 (US);
A62B99/00 (EP,US);
G01D21/00 (EP,US);
G01K13/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/146 (EP,US);
G01N33/54373 (EP,US);
G01N33/5438 (EP,US);
G01N33/58 (EP,US);
G01N35/00871 (EP,US);
G06K17/00 (KR);
G06K19/0717 (EP,US);
G06K19/0723 (US);
G08B31/00 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0242 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0285 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0412 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0462 (EP,US);
A61B2562/08 (EP,US);
A61B5/02 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/1491 (EP,US);
B01L2300/08 (US);
B01L2300/0816 (US);
B01L2300/0819 (US);
B01L2300/0825 (US);
G01N2035/00881 (EP,US);
G01N33/12 (EP,US);
H04M1/72412 (EP,US);
H04M2250/02 (EP,US);
H04W64/00 (EP,US);
H04W80/00 (EP,US);
H04W84/18 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/27] | Title | German: | Immunoassay Teststreifen mit integrierte Funkfrequenzidentifikationssensoren (RFID) | [2013/27] | English: | Immunoassay test strip integrating radio frequency identification tags (RFID) | [2013/27] | French: | Elément d'analyse pour l'essai immunologique intégré avec identification de fréquence radio de diagnostic (RFID) | [2013/27] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/27] | 23.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05706054.3 / EP1709750 | Divisional application(s) | EP14192663.4 / EP2843848 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050706054) is 31.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9733513 (LIPOMATRIX INC [CH]) [I] 1,5-9,11,12* the whole document *; | [XP]US2005009122 (WHELAN JAMES P [US], et al) [XP] 1,2,5,8-10 * paragraph [0027]; figure 2; claim 1 * | by applicant | US6002344 | US6031454 | US6720866 | US2004119591 | US20040761362 |