EP2642238 - View-point guided weapon system and target designation method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROSEMOUNT AEROSPACE INC. 14300 Judicial Road Burnsville, MN 55306-4898 / US | [2013/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ell, Todd A. 5620 Oak View Court Savaga, MN Minnesota 55378 / US | 02 /
Rutkiewicz, Robert D. 5525 York Avenue S Edina, MN Minnesota 55410 / US | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Bridge, Kerry Ann, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2013/39] | Application number, filing date | 13160431.6 | 21.03.2013 | [2013/39] | Priority number, date | US201213426114 | 21.03.2012 Original published format: US201213426114 | [2013/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2642238 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F41G3/14, F41G7/00, F41G7/22 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
F41G7/007 (EP,US);
F41G3/145 (EP,US);
F41G7/2226 (EP,US);
F41G7/2253 (EP,US);
F41G7/2293 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sichtpunktgesteuertes Waffensystem und Zielzuweisungsverfahren | [2013/39] | English: | View-point guided weapon system and target designation method | [2013/39] | French: | Système d'arme guidée par point de vue et procédé de désignation de cible | [2013/39] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/43] | 20.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US4106726 (EMMONS DAVID L, et al) [I] 1-8,12-14 * abstract * * column 11, line 5 - column 12, line 17 * * column 13, line 44 - column 17, line 57 * [Y] 9-11,15; | [AD]US6157875 (HEDMAN BRENT R [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * abstract *; | [YA]US2005271248 (TEKU HAGOS [US], et al) [Y] 9-11,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0058] * [A] 1-8,12-14; | [A]FR2914055 (LKF LENKFLUGKOERPERSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [AD]US2009283598 (SHERMAN NEIL Z [US]) [AD] 1-15* abstract * | by applicant | US3321761 | US3652837 | US4347996 | US4690351 | US5052045 | US5201895 | US5881969 | US5890808 | US6111241 | US6157875 | US6529614 | US6987256 | US7059560 | US7191056 | US2009248304 | US7725257 | US7858939 | US2011017864 | US7909253 |