EP2685313 - Multi-projection system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CJ CGV Co., Ltd. 10th 434 World cup buk-ro Mapo-gu Seoul 121-835 / KR | [2014/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Hwan Chul 101-1005, Yuwon Apt. Seocho-dong Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Kang, Su Ryeon 506-601, Munchon Maeul 5 Danji Apt. Juyeop 2-dong Ilsanseo-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2014/03] | Representative(s) | Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/04] |
Former [2014/03] | Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13163160.8 | 10.04.2013 | [2014/03] | Priority number, date | KR20120076100 | 12.07.2012 Original published format: KR 20120076100 | KR20120081376 | 25.07.2012 Original published format: KR 20120081376 | [2014/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2685313 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2685313 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/20, G03B21/56, E04H3/22, H04N9/31, G03B21/16, G03B21/60, G03B37/04, A63J25/00, A63J5/00 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
A63J25/00 (EP,US);
G03B21/56 (EP,CN,US);
G03B31/00 (US);
A47C1/12 (US);
A47C3/18 (US);
E04H3/22 (EP,US);
G02B30/50 (US);
G03B21/003 (US);
G03B21/14 (US);
G03B21/16 (EP,US);
G03B21/2053 (EP,US);
G03B21/206 (EP,US);
G03B21/26 (US);
G03B21/60 (EP,US);
G03B21/608 (US);
G03B29/00 (US);
G03B35/20 (KR);
G03B41/00 (US);
H04N21/4122 (US);
H04N21/4316 (US);
H04N21/47 (US);
H04N9/3147 (EP,US);
H04N9/3182 (EP,US);
H04N9/3185 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/03] | G03B21/56, E04H3/22, H04N9/31 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] |
Former [2014/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Mehrfachprojektionssystem | [2014/03] | English: | Multi-projection system | [2014/03] | French: | Système à plusieurs projections | [2014/03] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2013 | Examination requested [2014/03] | 11.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: designation fee not paid in time | 25.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/01] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 29.08.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 29.08.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.09.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.04.2013 | AL | 23.01.2019 | AT | 23.01.2019 | CY | 23.01.2019 | CZ | 23.01.2019 | DK | 23.01.2019 | EE | 23.01.2019 | ES | 23.01.2019 | FI | 23.01.2019 | HR | 23.01.2019 | IT | 23.01.2019 | LT | 23.01.2019 | LV | 23.01.2019 | MC | 23.01.2019 | MK | 23.01.2019 | MT | 23.01.2019 | NL | 23.01.2019 | PL | 23.01.2019 | RO | 23.01.2019 | RS | 23.01.2019 | SE | 23.01.2019 | SI | 23.01.2019 | SK | 23.01.2019 | SM | 23.01.2019 | IE | 10.04.2019 | LU | 10.04.2019 | BG | 23.04.2019 | NO | 23.04.2019 | GR | 24.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | IS | 23.05.2019 | PT | 23.05.2019 | [2023/24] |
Former [2022/31] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
MK | 23.01.2019 | ||
MT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
IE | 10.04.2019 | ||
LU | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
MT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
IE | 10.04.2019 | ||
LU | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
IE | 10.04.2019 | ||
LU | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
IE | 10.04.2019 | ||
LU | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
LU | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
LU | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
AT | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
DK | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 23.01.2019 | |
ES | 23.01.2019 | ||
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
IT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 23.01.2019 | |
FI | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
PL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
SE | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
NL | 23.01.2019 | ||
NO | 23.04.2019 | ||
PT | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 23.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5130794 (RITCHEY KURTIS J [US]) [X] 17 * column 9, lines 14-27; figure 32 * [Y] 17; | [XY]EP0514045 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8 * column 4 - column 6; figures 2-3. * [Y] 4,7,9-16; | [Y]US6065854 (WEST DERIK [US], et al) [Y] 17* columns 2-3; figure 5 *; | [XY]US6176584 (BEST LEONARD G [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, lines 50-51; figure 6 * [Y] 16; | [Y]US2003080968 (NIIKAWA MASAHITO [JP], et al) [Y] 10,11,13 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1365584 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 7,10-13,16 * paragraphs [0080] , [0 84] , [ 108] , [ 115] , [ 120] , [ 125] *; | [Y]US2005248726 (READ STEVEN C [CA], et al) [Y] 14,15 * paragraph [0051] *; | [XY]WO2006056797 (TV SPORTS NETWORK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 17 * paragraph [0044] * [Y] 17; | [XY]FR2911966 (THALES SA [FR]) [X] 1-5,7 * page 3; figure 1 * [Y] 4; | [XYI]US2009100767 (KONDO TETSUJIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,12-15 * paragraphs [0160] , [0179] , [0261] - [0030]; figures 17,42,50,51 * [Y] 9-15 [I] 16; | [XY]DE202010008442U (GRATH CHRISTIAN [DE]) [X] 17 * paragraphs [0005] , [0008] , [0009]; figure 1 * [Y] 17 |