EP2793401 - Tracking exposure to electromagnetic fields [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/43] | Tracking exposure to electomagnetic fields | ||
[2017/31] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki 211-8588 / JP | [2017/31] |
Former [2015/15] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
Former [2014/43] | For all designated states Fujitsu Laboratories of Europe Limited Hayes Park Central Hayes End Road Hayes Middlesex UB4 8FE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tesanovic, Milos c/o Fujitsu Laboratories of Europe Limited Hayes Park Central Hayes End Road Hayes, Middlesex UB4 8FE / GB | 02 /
Vadgama, Sunill Keshavji 24 Ashview Gardens Ashford, Hampshire TW15 3RD / GB | 03 /
Wilson, Mick 18 Northland Road Romsey, Hampshire SO51 5RW / GB | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2014/43] | Application number, filing date | 13164179.7 | 17.04.2013 | [2014/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2793401 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/38 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
H04B1/3838 (EP,US);
G08B21/182 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfolgung der Aussetzung elektromagnetischer Felder | [2014/43] | English: | Tracking exposure to electromagnetic fields | [2017/31] | French: | Suivi d'une exposition à des champs électromagnétiques | [2014/43] |
Former [2014/43] | Tracking exposure to electomagnetic fields | Examination procedure | 30.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 04.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/20] | 21.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010203862 (FRIEDLANDER GIL [IL], et al) [X] 1-5,7-11,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0040]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0049]; figure 4 * [I] 6,12,14-16; | [X]WO2011159357 (SEARETE LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * page 2, line 31 - page 16, line 29; figures 1-4 ** page 24, line 24 - line 25; figure 14 *; | [X]EP2410661 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0036] * |