EP2669548 - Two-gear transmission for electric machines with a system for controlling the angular play [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OERLIKON GRAZIANO S.P.A. Via Cumiana, 14 10098 Rivoli (Torino) / IT | [2013/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertolotto, Stefano Via XI Febbraio 8 I-12050 MAGLIANO ALFIERI (Cuneo) / IT | 02 /
Scalici, Giorgio Via Vecchia dei Bagliani 7 I-15122 CASALBAGLIANO (Alessandria) / IT | [2013/49] | Representative(s) | Rondano, Davide, et al Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2013/49] | Application number, filing date | 13165219.0 | 24.04.2013 | [2013/49] | Priority number, date | IT2012TO00484 | 01.06.2012 Original published format: IT TO20120484 | [2013/49] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2669548 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2669548 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16H3/10 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
F16H3/10 (EP,US);
F16H3/08 (US);
F16H2200/0021 (EP,US);
F16H2200/0034 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19219 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19223 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19242 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Title | German: | Zwei-Gang-Getriebe für elektrische Maschinen mit einem System zur Einstellung des Winkelspiels | [2014/04] | English: | Two-gear transmission for electric machines with a system for controlling the angular play | [2013/49] | French: | Transmission deux vitesses pour machines électriques avec un système permettant de contrôler le jeu angulaire | [2014/04] |
Former [2013/49] | Zwei-Gang-Getriebe für elektrische Maschinen mit einem System zur Steuerung des Winkelspiels | ||
Former [2013/49] | Transmission deux vitesses pour machines électriques avec un système permettant de commander le jeu angulaire | Examination procedure | 27.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 22.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2013 | AL | 02.07.2014 | AT | 02.07.2014 | BE | 02.07.2014 | CY | 02.07.2014 | CZ | 02.07.2014 | DK | 02.07.2014 | EE | 02.07.2014 | FI | 02.07.2014 | HR | 02.07.2014 | LT | 02.07.2014 | LV | 02.07.2014 | MC | 02.07.2014 | MK | 02.07.2014 | MT | 02.07.2014 | NL | 02.07.2014 | PL | 02.07.2014 | RO | 02.07.2014 | RS | 02.07.2014 | SE | 02.07.2014 | SI | 02.07.2014 | SK | 02.07.2014 | SM | 02.07.2014 | TR | 02.07.2014 | BG | 02.10.2014 | NO | 02.10.2014 | GR | 03.10.2014 | IS | 02.11.2014 | PT | 03.11.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 24.04.2013 | |
AT | 02.07.2014 | ||
BE | 02.07.2014 | ||
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
MK | 02.07.2014 | ||
MT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
SM | 02.07.2014 | ||
TR | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2017/40] | HU | 24.04.2013 | |
AT | 02.07.2014 | ||
BE | 02.07.2014 | ||
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
MT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
TR | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
BE | 02.07.2014 | ||
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
MT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
BE | 02.07.2014 | ||
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
HR | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RS | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 02.07.2014 | |
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
NO | 02.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 02.07.2014 | |
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 02.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2021165 (BARTON CLARENCE H) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5341698 (TSENG SHENG-TSAI [TW]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [AD]EP2305501 (OERLIKON GRAZIANO SPA [IT]) [AD] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP2305501 |