EP2664958 - Light source apparatus and image projection apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2013/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishimori, Takehiro c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
Fujita, Kazuhiro c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 03 /
Murai, Toshiharu c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 04 /
Maeda, Ikuo c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 05 /
Takahashi, Tatsuya c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2013/47] | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2015/44] |
Former [2013/47] | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp & Co 14 South Square Gray's Inn London Greater London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13165397.4 | 25.04.2013 | [2013/47] | Priority number, date | JP20120114923 | 18.05.2012 Original published format: JP 2012114923 | JP20130048137 | 11.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013048137 | [2013/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2664958 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2664958 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F21V7/00, G03B21/20, G02B27/10, // G03B21/16 | [2015/20] | CPC: |
G03B21/2013 (EP,US);
F21V7/0033 (US);
F21V13/04 (US);
F21V29/60 (US);
G03B21/2033 (EP,US);
G03B21/2066 (EP,US);
G03B21/16 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/47] | G03B21/20, // G03B21/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/47] | Title | German: | Lichtquellenvorrichtung und Bildprojektionsvorrichtung | [2013/47] | English: | Light source apparatus and image projection apparatus | [2013/47] | French: | Appareil de source lumineuse et appareil de projection d'image | [2013/47] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/47] | 17.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2013 | AL | 28.10.2015 | AT | 28.10.2015 | BE | 28.10.2015 | BG | 28.10.2015 | CY | 28.10.2015 | CZ | 28.10.2015 | DK | 28.10.2015 | EE | 28.10.2015 | ES | 28.10.2015 | FI | 28.10.2015 | HR | 28.10.2015 | IT | 28.10.2015 | LT | 28.10.2015 | LV | 28.10.2015 | MC | 28.10.2015 | MK | 28.10.2015 | NL | 28.10.2015 | PL | 28.10.2015 | RO | 28.10.2015 | RS | 28.10.2015 | SE | 28.10.2015 | SI | 28.10.2015 | SK | 28.10.2015 | SM | 28.10.2015 | TR | 28.10.2015 | NO | 28.01.2016 | GR | 29.01.2016 | IS | 28.02.2016 | PT | 29.02.2016 | IE | 25.04.2016 | LU | 25.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 25.04.2013 | |
AT | 28.10.2015 | ||
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
BG | 28.10.2015 | ||
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
TR | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
IE | 25.04.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 25.04.2013 | |
AT | 28.10.2015 | ||
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
TR | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
IE | 25.04.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 25.04.2013 | |
AT | 28.10.2015 | ||
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
TR | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
IE | 25.04.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 25.04.2013 | |
AT | 28.10.2015 | ||
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
MK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
IE | 25.04.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
IE | 25.04.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
LU | 25.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
SM | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
HR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RS | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NO | 28.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
LT | 28.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2002114158 (CHUANG FU-MING [TW]) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0015] - [0027]; figures 1-3 * [I] 6,8,9,11,12; | [XI]WO2006027621 (POWER PROJECTOR LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,11,12 * page 9, line 21 - page 11, line 30; figures 1-5; claims 1-19,29,32-35 * [I] 9,10; | [XI]US2009190347 (LANZ RUDIGER [DE]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0012] - [0017] - [0026] - [0032]; figures 1-3 * [I] 3,5,6,8,9; | [X]US2010020538 (SCHULZ JAN [DE], et al) [X] 1-3* paragraphs [0007] , [0020] - [0024]; figures 1-5 *; | [XI]US2010118530 (NAGAI HIDEO [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0050] - [0057] - [0060] - [0072]; figures 1,2,4,5,7,8 * [I] 8,9 | by applicant | JP2011013317 |