EP2806280 - Detecting electrical islands using wide-area measurements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd. Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [2014/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krata, Jaroslaw 14/20 Smugowa St 97-200 Tomaszów Mazowiecki Lódzkie / PL | 02 /
Balcerek, Przemyslaw 8 Galaktyczna St 30-389 Kraków Malopolskie / PL | 03 /
Nuqui, Reynaldo 245 Churchview Street Cary, NC 27513 / US | [2014/48] | Representative(s) | Postiglione, Ferruccio, et al Gregorj S.r.l. Intellectual Property Via L. Muratori, 13 b 20135 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/48] | Postiglione, Ferruccio, et al Gregorj S.r.l. Intellectual Property Via Muratori, 13 b 20135 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 13168510.9 | 21.05.2013 | [2014/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2806280 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/08, H02J3/38 | [2014/48] | CPC: |
H02J3/38 (EP);
H02J3/381 (EP);
H02J3/388 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] |
Former [2014/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Erkennung elektrischer Inseln unter Verwendung grossflächiger Messungen | [2014/48] | English: | Detecting electrical islands using wide-area measurements | [2014/48] | French: | Détection des îlots électriques utilisant des mesures de longue portée | [2014/48] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 30.09.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US7225087 (SICILIANO ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * paragraph [0044]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0051] *; | [Y] - A. ETXEGARAI, P. EGUIA, I. ZAMORA, "Analysis of Remote Islanding Detection Methods for Distributed Resources", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON RENEWABLE ENERGIES AND POWER QUALITY (ICREPQ'11), (20110413), XP002716559 [Y] 1-21 * page 4, paragraph A.1 * | [Y] - SCHWEITZER, WHITEHEAD, ZWEIGLE, RAVIKUMAR, "Synchrophasor based power system protection and control application", 2010 TEXAS A&M CONFERENCE FOR PROTECTIVE RELAY ENGINEERS, (20100329), XP002716560 [Y] 1-21 * page 4 - page 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CPRE.2010.5469481 |