EP2815834 - Wire monitoring system for a wire saw and method for monitoring a wire saw [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Advanced Technologies Co., Ltd. 5-3-38 Ujina-Higashi Minami-ku Hiroshima, 734-8501 / JP | [2016/41] |
Former [2016/24] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | ||
Former [2014/52] | For all designated states Applied Materials Switzerland Sàrl Route de Genève 42 1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zominy, Claude 14 Place de l'église 74350 Copponex / FR | 02 /
Schmid, Andreas Rue Oscar Patthey 39 3280 Meyriez / CH | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Widenmayerstraße 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/52] | Zimmermann & Partner Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13173234.9 | 21.06.2013 | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2815834 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B23D59/00, B23D57/00, B28D1/10 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
B23D57/003 (EP);
B23D59/001 (EP);
B28D1/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] |
Former [2014/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Drahtüberwachungssystem für eine Drahtsäge und Verfahren zur Überwachung einer Drahtsäge | [2014/52] | English: | Wire monitoring system for a wire saw and method for monitoring a wire saw | [2014/52] | French: | Système de surveillance de fil destiné à une scie à fil et procédé de surveillance d'une scie à fil | [2014/52] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 03.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/24] | 29.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]JP3244099B (TOKYO SEIMITSU CO LTD) [X] 1,9,11,12,14 * the whole document * * in particular: * * paragraphs [0009] , [0017] , [0021] * [A] 5,7,8,15 [I] 2-4,6,10,13; | [XAYI]JP2002192231 (KANAI HIROAKI) [X] 1,9,12,14 * the whole document * [A] 5,11,15 [Y] 7,8 [I] 2-4,6,10,13; | [Y]JPH11188599 (TOKYO SEIMITSU CO LTD) [Y] 7,8 * paragraph [0014] * * figures 3,4 * |