EP2679088 - Rhizotron and uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut National de la Recherche Agronomique (INRA) 147, rue de l'Université 75338 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | For all designated states Inoviaflow 4 rue du Bas de Chanot 21800 Chevigny Saint Sauveur / FR | [2014/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Salon, Christophe Rue d'en haut 21250 Montagny lès Seurre / FR | 02 /
Jeudy, Christian 4 rue du Puits 21270 Maxilly sur Saône / FR | 03 /
Bernard, Céline 13 rue Colson 21000 Dijon / FR | 04 /
Mougel, Christophe 35 rue de la gare 21310 Mirebeau sur Bèze / FR | 05 /
Coffin, Arnaud 5 rue de Montmuzard 21000 Dijon / FR | 06 /
Bourion, Virginie 6 rue Gabriel Revel 21600 Longvic / FR | 07 /
Moreau, Delphine 16 rue du 27ème régiment d'infanterie 21000 Dijon / FR | 08 /
Palavioux, Karine 33 rue Neuve Bergère 21000 Dijon / FR | 09 /
Baussart, Christophe 7 rue Gentil 70140 Pesmes / FR | [2014/01] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 13173626.6 | 25.06.2013 | [2014/01] | Priority number, date | FR20120056069 | 26.06.2012 Original published format: FR 1256069 | [2014/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2679088 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2679088 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01G7/00 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
A01G7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] |
Former [2014/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Rhizotron und seine Anwendungen | [2014/01] | English: | Rhizotron and uses thereof | [2014/01] | French: | Rhizotron et utilisations de celui-ci | [2014/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 11.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.06.2013 | AL | 11.05.2016 | AT | 11.05.2016 | BG | 11.05.2016 | CY | 11.05.2016 | DK | 11.05.2016 | EE | 11.05.2016 | ES | 11.05.2016 | FI | 11.05.2016 | HR | 11.05.2016 | IS | 11.05.2016 | LT | 11.05.2016 | LV | 11.05.2016 | MC | 11.05.2016 | MK | 11.05.2016 | MT | 11.05.2016 | PL | 11.05.2016 | RO | 11.05.2016 | RS | 11.05.2016 | SE | 11.05.2016 | SI | 11.05.2016 | SK | 11.05.2016 | SM | 11.05.2016 | TR | 11.05.2016 | IE | 25.06.2016 | LU | 25.06.2016 | BE | 30.06.2016 | NO | 11.08.2016 | GR | 12.08.2016 | PT | 12.09.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 25.06.2013 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
MT | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
TR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 25.06.2016 | ||
LU | 25.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 25.06.2013 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
MT | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
TR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 25.06.2016 | ||
LU | 25.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 25.06.2013 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
TR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 25.06.2016 | ||
LU | 25.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 25.06.2013 | |
AT | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 25.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
IE | 25.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/17] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | DK | 11.05.2016 | |
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 11.05.2016 | |
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 11.05.2016 | |
NO | 11.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2006114714 (PHENOTYPE SCREENING CORP [US]) [AD] 1,2,17,18 * abstract *; | [AD]WO2006029987 (CROPDESIGN NV [BE], et al) [AD] 1,2,17 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]KR20100046407 (RYU SEUNG YUN [KR], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [AD] - DANIELA L. BELL ET AL, "Dynamic Phenotypic Plasticity for Root Growth in Polygonum: A Comparative Study", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF BOTANY, (19990601), vol. 86, no. 6, doi:10.2307/2656702, ISSN 0002-9122, pages 807 - 819, XP055053811 [AD] 1,2,17,18 * chapter "MATERIALS AND METHODS" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2307/2656702 | [AD] - NIMA YAZDANBAKHSH ET AL, "High throughput phenotyping of root growth dynamics, lateral root formation, root architecture and root hair development enabled by PlaRoM", FUNCTIONAL PLANT BIOLOGY, (20090101), vol. 36, no. 11, doi:10.1071/FP09167, ISSN 1445-4408, page 938, XP055053819 [AD] 1,2,17,18 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1071/FP09167 | [A] - JENNESON P M ET AL, "Optimisation of X-ray micro-tomography for the in situ study of the development of plant roots", 1999 IEEE NUCLEAR SCIENCE SYMPOSIUM. CONFERENCE RECORD. 1999 NUCLEAR SCIENCE SYMPOSIUM AND MEDICAL IMAGING CONFERENCE (CAT. NO.99CH37019) IEEE PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,, (19990101), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-5696-9, pages 429 - 432VOL.1, XP002640859 [A] 1,2,17 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2006114714 | WO2006029987 | - YAZDANBAKHSH ET AL., FUNCTIONAL PLANT BIOLOGY, (2009), vol. 36, pages 938 - 946 | - BELL ET AL., AMERICAN JOURNAL OF BOTANY, (1999), vol. 86, no. 6, pages 807 - 819 |