EP2703926 - Aircraft control system and method for reaching a waypoint at a required time of arrival [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2022/07] |
Former [2015/51] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | ||
Former [2014/10] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Polansky, Michal HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | 02 /
Jancik, Zdenek HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | 03 /
Jackson, Mike HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | 04 /
Paricaud, Erwan HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | [2014/10] | Representative(s) | LKGlobal UK Ltd. Cambridge House Henry Street Bath BA1 1BT / GB | [2022/07] |
Former [2014/10] | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13181748.8 | 26.08.2013 | [2014/10] | Priority number, date | US201213602076 | 31.08.2012 Original published format: US201213602076 | [2014/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2703926 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2703926 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2703926 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, G08G5/00 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
G05D1/0202 (EP,US);
G08G5/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/10] | Title | German: | Flugzeugsteuersystem und Verfahren zum Erreichen eines Wegpunktes zu einer erforderlichen Ankunftszeit | [2014/10] | English: | Aircraft control system and method for reaching a waypoint at a required time of arrival | [2014/10] | French: | Système et procédé de commande d'aéronef permettant d'atteindre un point de cheminement à une heure d'arrivée requise | [2014/10] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2013 | Examination requested [2014/10] | 25.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.08.2013 | AL | 16.02.2022 | AT | 16.02.2022 | CY | 16.02.2022 | CZ | 16.02.2022 | DK | 16.02.2022 | EE | 16.02.2022 | ES | 16.02.2022 | FI | 16.02.2022 | HR | 16.02.2022 | IT | 16.02.2022 | LT | 16.02.2022 | LV | 16.02.2022 | MC | 16.02.2022 | NL | 16.02.2022 | PL | 16.02.2022 | RO | 16.02.2022 | RS | 16.02.2022 | SE | 16.02.2022 | SI | 16.02.2022 | SK | 16.02.2022 | SM | 16.02.2022 | BG | 16.05.2022 | NO | 16.05.2022 | GR | 17.05.2022 | IS | 16.06.2022 | PT | 16.06.2022 | GB | 26.08.2022 | IE | 26.08.2022 | LU | 26.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/18] | HU | 26.08.2013 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
GB | 26.08.2022 | ||
IE | 26.08.2022 | ||
LU | 26.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
GB | 26.08.2022 | ||
IE | 26.08.2022 | ||
LU | 26.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IE | 26.08.2022 | ||
LU | 26.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
IT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IE | 26.08.2022 | ||
LU | 26.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
IE | 26.08.2022 | ||
LU | 26.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
LU | 26.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 16.02.2022 | |
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 16.02.2022 | |
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 16.02.2022 | |
NO | 16.05.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO02093281 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5-8,11-15 * paragraphs [0033] , [0046]; figures 1-6 * [I] 3,4,9,10; | [XI]US2010114407 (KLOOSTER JOEL KENNETH [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,11-15 * paragraphs [0052] , [0 53] , [0 47]; figures 7,5,6 * [I] 3,4,9,10; | [XI]US2011029158 (KLOOSTER JOEL KENNETH [US]) [X] 1,2,5-8,11-15 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023]; figures 1-3 *[I] 3,4,9,10; | [XI]US2011295501 (GUTIEREZ-CASTANEDA MANUEL [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,11-15 * paragraph [0058]; figures 1,2 * [I] 3,4,9,10 |