Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2848997

EP2848997 - Scanning probe nanolithography system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.02.2016
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.08.2018Change - applicantpublished on 26.09.2018  [2018/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SwissLitho AG
Technoparkstrasse 1
8005 Zürich / CH
For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[2018/39]
Former [2015/12]For all designated states
SwissLitho AG
Technoparkstrasse 1
8005 Zürich / CH
For all designated states
Intellectual Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, New York 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Holzner, Felix
Leimbachstrasse 215
8041 Zürich / CH
02 / Paul, Philip
Rainstrasse 13
8134 Adliswil / CH
03 / Zientek, Michal
Schützenrain 31
8047 Zürich / CH
04 / Knoll, Armin
Oberhusstrasse 9
8134 Adliswil / CH
05 / Rawlings, Colin
Oberer Rütiweg 1
8803 Rüschlikon / CH
 [2015/12]
Representative(s)Liebetanz, Michael
Isler & Pedrazzini AG
Giesshübelstrasse 45
Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2015/12]Liebetanz, Michael
Isler & Pedrazzini AG
Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date13184651.116.09.2013
[2015/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2848997
Date:18.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/00
[2015/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/12]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Rastersonden-Nanolithografiesystem und Verfahren[2015/12]
English:Scanning probe nanolithography system and method[2015/12]
French:Système et procédé de nanolithographie à sonde de balayage[2015/12]
Examination procedure16.09.2013Examination requested  [2015/12]
19.09.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/11]
27.10.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/11]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US2011268882  (BUSSAN JOHN EDWARD [US], et al) [X] 1,3-8,10-12 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0068] , [0073] , [0078] , [0087] , [0088] , [0107] - [0109]; figures 1B,2B; claims 1-3,6,9,18,44,64 * [A] 13,14 [Y] 2,9;
 [XAY]US7060977  (DUPEYRAT SYLVAIN CRUCHON [US], et al) [X] 1,3-8,10-12 * claims 1-6,8,16-18,35-37,63,64,67 * [A] 13,14 [Y] 2,9;
 [XAY]US5825670  (CHERNOFF DONALD A [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 33, line 26 - column 34, line 16; claim 1 * [A] 13,14 [Y] 2,4-12;
 [XAY]US5327625  (CLARK JR HARRY R [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 2, lines 51-53; claims 1,2 * * column 3, lines 9-12 * [A] 13,14 [Y] 2,4-12;
 [Y]US4889988  (ELINGS VIRGIL B [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column 4, lines 5-48; claims 1-12 *;
 [Y]US2003185967  (EBY RAYMOND K [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0044] , [0064] , [0065]; figure 4; claims 41-50 *;
 [YD]US8261662  (SHILE RAYMOND ROGER [US], et al) [YD] 1-3 * column 14, line 1 - column 15, line 26; claim 1 * * column 26, lines 23-38 *
by applicantUS8261662
    - YAN ET AL., SMALL, (2010), vol. 6, no. 6, pages 724 - 728
    - CHEN ET AL., OPTICS LETTERS, (2005), vol. 30, no. 6, pages 652 - 654
    - ROLANDI ET AL., ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (2007), vol. 46, no. 39, pages 7477 - 7480
    - SRITURAVANICH ET AL., NATURE NANOTECHNOLOGY, (2008), vol. 3, no. 12, pages 733 - 737
    - RADHA ET AL., ACS NANO, (2013), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 2602 - 2609
    - PIRES ET AL., SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 328, page 732
    - SZOSZKIEWICZ ET AL., NANO LETTERS, (2007), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 1064 - 1069
    - MARTINEZ ET AL., NANOTECHNOLOGY, (2010), vol. 21, no. 24, page 245301
    - NELSON ET AL., APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (2006), vol. 88, page 033104