EP2724743 - Angled component for a breathing mask [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Drägerwerk AG & Co. KGaA Moislinger Allee 53-55 23558 Lübeck / DE | [2015/49] |
Former [2014/18] | For all designated states Dräger Medical GmbH Moislinger Allee 53 - 55 23558 Lübeck / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wallnewitz, Oliver Steinrader Mühlenberg 6b 23556 Lübeck / DE | 02 /
Soltész, Krisztina Seydlitz Str. 23 23564 Lübeck / DE | 03 /
Gawrysch, Alexandra Buschkämpen 65 27576 Bremerhaven / DE | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2016/12] |
Former [2014/18] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 13188544.4 | 14.10.2013 | [2014/18] | Priority number, date | DE20121020917 | 25.10.2012 Original published format: DE102012020917 | [2014/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2724743 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2724743 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/08, A61M16/20, // A61M16/06 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
A61M16/0816 (EP,US);
A61M16/20 (EP,US);
A61M16/208 (EP,US);
A61M16/0875 (EP,US);
A61M16/201 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] |
Former [2014/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Winkelstück für eine Beatmungsmaske | [2014/18] | English: | Angled component for a breathing mask | [2014/18] | French: | Pièce d'angle pour un masque respiratoire | [2014/18] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 05.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.10.2013 | AL | 23.03.2016 | CY | 23.03.2016 | CZ | 23.03.2016 | DK | 23.03.2016 | EE | 23.03.2016 | ES | 23.03.2016 | FI | 23.03.2016 | HR | 23.03.2016 | IT | 23.03.2016 | LT | 23.03.2016 | LV | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | MK | 23.03.2016 | MT | 23.03.2016 | NL | 23.03.2016 | PL | 23.03.2016 | RO | 23.03.2016 | RS | 23.03.2016 | SE | 23.03.2016 | SI | 23.03.2016 | SK | 23.03.2016 | SM | 23.03.2016 | TR | 23.03.2016 | BG | 23.06.2016 | NO | 23.06.2016 | GR | 24.06.2016 | IS | 23.07.2016 | PT | 25.07.2016 | IE | 14.10.2016 | LU | 14.10.2016 | BE | 31.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | FR | 02.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 14.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
MT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
TR | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
IE | 14.10.2016 | ||
LU | 14.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 14.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
MT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
IE | 14.10.2016 | ||
LU | 14.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 14.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
IE | 14.10.2016 | ||
LU | 14.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
IE | 14.10.2016 | ||
LU | 14.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/42] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
LU | 14.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US5647355 (STARR JOHN R [US], et al) [XD] 1-5,7,8,13,14 * abstract * * column 1, line 10 - column 4, line 21 * * column 5, line 10 - column 8, line 21 *; | [A]WO2005051468 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-5,7-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0092] * * figures 1-13, 15-20, 22-27b *; | [A]US2010154799 (BREWER JOHN [US], et al) [A] 6 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0049] * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2012055471 (HADAS NOAM [IL], et al) [A] 1-5,8,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0056] ** figures 1a-7b *; | [AP]WO2013040198 (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) [AP] 1-5,7-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0131] * * paragraph [0145] - paragraph [0150] * * paragraph [0154] - paragraph [0159] * * paragraph [0170] - paragraph [0171] * * paragraph [0203] * * figures 2A-3, 5A-5C, 8A-13D, 27A, 27B * | by applicant | US5647355 |