EP2876852 - Transmitter Linearisation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sequans Communications Limited 155 Wharfedale Road Winnersh Triangle Reading, Berkshire RG41 5RB / GB | [2015/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Winiecki, Thomas c/o Sequans Communications Limited 155 Wharfedale Road Winnersh Triangle Reading, Berkshire RG41 5RB / GB | [2015/22] | Representative(s) | Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/22] | Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13194170.0 | 22.11.2013 | [2015/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2876852 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/36, H03F1/32 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
H03F1/3258 (EP,US);
H04L25/03828 (US);
H03F1/3241 (EP,US);
H03F1/3294 (EP,US);
H03F3/189 (EP,US);
H03F3/245 (EP,US);
H04L25/06 (US);
H04L25/08 (US);
H04L27/367 (EP,US);
H03F2200/336 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Senderlinearisierung | [2015/22] | English: | Transmitter Linearisation | [2015/22] | French: | Linéarisation d'un émetteur | [2015/22] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 02.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/45] | 02.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5111155 (KEATE CHRISTOPHER R [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 6 - line 29 * * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 45 * * column 4, line 36 - column 7, line 63 * * figures 3A, 3B, 4, 5, 6A *; | [A]GB2339657 (IFR LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 5 - page 4, line 31 * * page 7, line 1 - page 9, line 2 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2013044791 (RIMINI ROBERTO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0132] ** figures 12, 13 * |