EP2743468 - GAS EXCHANGE VALVE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A GAS EXCHANGE VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/25] | Gas exchange valve, and method for producing a gas exchange valve | ||
[2019/25] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wärtsilä Schweiz AG Zürcherstrasse 12 8401 Winterthur / CH | [2014/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Häntzka, Torsten Hochstrasse 81 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | 02 /
Schlager, Dietmar Dr. Erlenstrasse 59 8408 Winterthur / CH | [2014/25] | Representative(s) | IPS Irsch AG Langfeldstrasse 88 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | Intellectual Property Services GmbH Langfeldstrasse 88 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | Application number, filing date | 13195119.6 | 29.11.2013 | [2014/25] | Priority number, date | EP20120196566 | 11.12.2012 Original published format: EP 12196566 | [2014/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2743468 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2743468 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F01L3/04 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
F01L3/04 (EP,KR);
F01L3/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] |
Former [2014/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GASWECHSELVENTIL, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GASWECHSELVENTILS | [2019/25] | English: | GAS EXCHANGE VALVE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A GAS EXCHANGE VALVE | [2019/25] | French: | SOUPAPE DE CHANGEMENT DE GAZ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE SOUPAPE DE CHANGEMENT DE GAZ | [2019/25] |
Former [2014/25] | Gaswechselventil, sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Gaswechselventils | ||
Former [2014/25] | Gas exchange valve, and method for producing a gas exchange valve | ||
Former [2014/25] | Soupape de changement de gaz et procédé de fabrication d'une soupape de changement de gaz | Examination procedure | 26.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 14.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.05.2020
ADMISSIBLE Mahle International GmbH Pragstr. 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/27] | 19.06.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.10.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.05.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.07.2021 | 07.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 17.06.2021 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2021/42] | 21.07.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.11.2013 | AL | 04.09.2019 | CY | 04.09.2019 | CZ | 04.09.2019 | DK | 04.09.2019 | EE | 04.09.2019 | ES | 04.09.2019 | FI | 04.09.2019 | HR | 04.09.2019 | LT | 04.09.2019 | LV | 04.09.2019 | MC | 04.09.2019 | MK | 04.09.2019 | MT | 04.09.2019 | PL | 04.09.2019 | RO | 04.09.2019 | RS | 04.09.2019 | SE | 04.09.2019 | SI | 04.09.2019 | SK | 04.09.2019 | SM | 04.09.2019 | TR | 04.09.2019 | AT | 29.11.2019 | IE | 29.11.2019 | LU | 29.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | FR | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | BG | 04.12.2019 | GB | 04.12.2019 | NO | 04.12.2019 | GR | 05.12.2019 | IS | 05.01.2020 | PT | 06.01.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/26] | HU | 29.11.2013 | |
AL | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
MT | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
TR | 04.09.2019 | ||
AT | 29.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GB | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 29.11.2013 | |
AL | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
MT | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
AT | 29.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GB | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 29.11.2013 | |
AL | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
AT | 29.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GB | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
AT | 29.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GB | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
AT | 29.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GB | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GB | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GB | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
IE | 29.11.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
LU | 29.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 04.09.2019 | |
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 04.09.2019 | |
NO | 04.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1394167 (MM. CLAUDE, LÉONCE, GASTON DUTEIL ET LÉONCE, JEAN, ALBERT DUTEIL) [A] 1-3,13 * page 1, column 1, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 1, column 2, paragraph 9 - page 2, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3 *; | [A]JPS6040709 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [A] 1-3,13* abstract *; | [A]GB2238349 (T & N TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [A] 1-4,6,7,13,14 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 1, line 1, paragraph 2 - line 4 * * page 8, paragraph 2 * * figure 3 *; | [A]FR2666847 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1-3,13,14 * page 1, line 1 - line 2 * * page 9, line 26 - page 11, line 27 * * page 12, line 30 - line 35 * * page 7 *; | [A]US5441024 (WIETIG FREDERICK G [US], et al) [A] 1-3,9,10,12-15 * column 1, line 9 - line 27 * * column 4, line 8 - line 22 * * column 6, line 14 - line 28 * * figures 1,2 * | Examination | JP2002018594 | Opposition | US1628911 | US2662011 | FR1394167 | US3408995 | DE3125560 | US4346870 | DE8202802U | EP0049396 | JPS6040709 | DE3236354 | US4867116 | GB2238349 | DE4024084 | FR2666847 | US5441024 | JP2002018594 | EP2743024 | EP2743468 | - Wolfgang Weissbach, Werkstoffkunde Strukturen, Eigenschaften , Prüfung 17. Auflge, Vieweg + Teubner, (2010), pages 2pp, 304 - 305, XP055702648 |