EP2857869 - Operation managing system for driving a navigation control device according to a degraded operating mode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sercel 16, rue de Bel Air 44470 Carquefou / FR | [2015/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roger, Thierry 18, quai François Mitterand 44200 NANTES / FR | 02 /
L'Her, Christophe 28 route de Rostiviec 29470 LOPERHET / FR | 03 /
Vignaux, Jean-Jacques 8 rue des Canotiers - La Savaudière 44470 CARQUEFOU / FR | 04 /
Coutinieau, Christophe 7, bd des Sports 44120 VERTOU / FR | 05 /
Barbot, Dominique 2 rue de Keraveloc 29280 LOCMARIA PLOUZANE / FR | 06 /
Rousseau, Stéphane 50, La Bussonière 44240 LA CHAPELLE SUR ERDRE / FR | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [2023/18] |
Former [2015/15] | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13306385.9 | 07.10.2013 | [2015/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2857869 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2857869 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/38 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
G01V1/3826 (EP,BR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] |
Former [2015/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Betriebsverwaltungssystem zur Ansteuerung einer Navigationssteuerungsvorrichtung entsprechend eines herabgestuften Betriebsmodus | [2015/15] | English: | Operation managing system for driving a navigation control device according to a degraded operating mode | [2015/15] | French: | Système de gestion de fonctionnement pour commander un dispositif de commande de navigation conformément à un mode de fonctionnement dégradé | [2015/15] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 12.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2018 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2023 | CZ | 03.05.2023 | DK | 03.05.2023 | EE | 03.05.2023 | ES | 03.05.2023 | FI | 03.05.2023 | HR | 03.05.2023 | IT | 03.05.2023 | LT | 03.05.2023 | LV | 03.05.2023 | MC | 03.05.2023 | NL | 03.05.2023 | PL | 03.05.2023 | RO | 03.05.2023 | RS | 03.05.2023 | SE | 03.05.2023 | SI | 03.05.2023 | SK | 03.05.2023 | SM | 03.05.2023 | GR | 04.08.2023 | IS | 03.09.2023 | PT | 04.09.2023 | LU | 07.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | FR | 31.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
IT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
LU | 07.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
FR | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
IT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
LU | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
IT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
IT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
PT | 04.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1031855 (L 3 COMM CORP [US]) [A] 3* paragraphs [0005] , [0010] , [0011]; figure 3 *; | [YDA]US2008008033 (FOSSUM BJORN A [NO], et al) [YD] 1,2,4-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0006] , [0023] - [0034] - [0043] , [0052] * [A] 3; | [YA]WO2009088291 (KONGSBERG SEATEX AS [NO], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 3 - line 7 * * page 3, line 33 - line 35 * * page 4, line 5 - page 7, line 31 * * page 8, line 22 - page 9, line 21 * * page 10, line 9 - page 11, line 34 * * page 12, line 22 - page 13, line 17 * * page 15, line 3 - line 31 * * page 16, line 5 - line 6 * * page 18, line 14 - line 23 * [A] 3; | [YA]WO2011014071 (KONGSBERG SEATEX AS [NO], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line 22 * * page 5, line 4 - page 8, line 35 * * page 10, line 5 - page 12, line 28 * * page 15, line 30 - page 18, line 17 * * page 22, line 24 - page 23, line 24 * * page 24, line 32 - line 35 * [A] 3 | by applicant | US6525992 | US7080607 | US7206254 | US2009204274 | US7933163 |