|
21.01.2025 |
Payment submission rejected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2023 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
22.12.2023 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.12.2023 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2023 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.10.2023 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2023 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.09.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.09.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
14 |
|
21.09.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
14 |
|
21.09.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
14 |
|
21.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.09.2023 |
Description |
Appeal |
14 |
|
21.09.2023 |
Description |
Appeal |
14 |
|
21.09.2023 |
Description |
Appeal |
14 |
|
21.09.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2023 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.09.2023 |
Main request during appeals procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.09.2023 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2023 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
17 |
|
04.08.2023 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.08.2023 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2021 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2020 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
02.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.03.2020 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.01.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.01.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.01.2020 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2020 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
03.01.2020 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.10.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.10.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.10.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.12.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.12.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.12.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.12.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.08.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.08.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.10.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2014 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.03.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |