EP2807103 - SAFETY DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD FOR A LIFT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/49] | METHOD AND CONTROL DEVICE FOR MONITORING TRAVELLING MOVEMENTS OF A LIFT CABIN | ||
[2015/37] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STÖLZL, Stefan Lärchenweg 4 69469 Weinheim / DE | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Thomas Kanonenstrasse 20D 61389 Schmitten / DE | 03 /
DEGEN, Michael Hasselmannring 4 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | 04 /
DÜCHS, Dominik An den Platzäckern 5 55127 Mainz / DE | 05 /
SCHREINER, Frank Saalburgstrasse 61 61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE | 06 /
BÜTLER, Erich Sonnhaldenrain 50 6030 Ebikon / CH | 07 /
GEISSHÜSLER, Michael Himmelrichstrasse 3 6003 Luzern / CH | 08 /
GREMAUD, Nicolas Im Leemann 5 8805 Richterswil / CH | [2016/01] |
Former [2014/49] | 01 /
STÖLZL, Stefan Lärchenweg 4 69469 Weinheim / DE | ||
02 /
SCHMIDT, Thomas Kanonenstrasse 20D 61389 Schmitten / DE | |||
03 /
DEGEN, Michael Hasselmannring 4 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | |||
04 /
DÜCHS, Dominik An den Platzäckern 5 55127 Mainz / DE | |||
05 /
SCHREINER, Frank Saalburgstrasse 61 61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE | |||
06 /
BÜTLER, Erich Sonnhaldenrain 50 CH-6030 Ebikon / CH | |||
07 /
GEISSHÜSLER, Michael Himmelrichstrasse 3 CH-6003 Luzern / CH | |||
08 /
GREMAUD, Nicolas Im Leemann 5 CH-8805 Richterswil / CH | Application number, filing date | 13701254.8 | 24.01.2013 | [2016/01] | WO2013EP51318 | Priority number, date | DE201210201086 | 25.01.2012 Original published format: DE102012201086 | EP20120189011 | 18.10.2012 Original published format: EP 12189011 | EP20120190499 | 30.10.2012 Original published format: EP 12190499 | [2014/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013110693 | Date: | 01.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2807103 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2807103 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/06, B66B5/00, B66B1/34 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
B66B5/0031 (EP,US);
B66B1/30 (US);
B66B1/32 (US);
B66B1/343 (EP,US);
B66B5/04 (US);
B66B5/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/49] | B66B5/06, B66B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND STEUEREINRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VON FAHRBEWEGUNGEN EINER AUFZUGSKABINE | [2014/49] | English: | SAFETY DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD FOR A LIFT SYSTEM | [2015/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SÉCURITÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE D'UNE INSTALLATION D'ASCENSEUR | [2015/37] |
Former [2014/49] | METHOD AND CONTROL DEVICE FOR MONITORING TRAVELLING MOVEMENTS OF A LIFT CABIN | ||
Former [2014/49] | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE POUR SURVEILLER LES DÉPLACEMENTS D'UNE CABINE D'ASCENSEUR | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 12.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.09.2016
06.10.2016
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Elevator AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE Opponent's representative thyssenkrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | 02
29.09.2016
06.10.2016
ADMISSIBLE Otis Elevator Company 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington CT 06032 / US Opponent's representative Davies, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.09.2016
06.10.2016
ADMISSIBLE ThyssenKrupp Elevator AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE Opponent's representative ThyssenKrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | ||
02
29.09.2016
06.10.2016
ADMISSIBLE Otis Elevator Company 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington CT 06032 / US Opponent's representative Davies, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | 09.11.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 20.10.2017 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.12.2015 | BG | 30.12.2015 | CH | 30.12.2015 | CY | 30.12.2015 | DK | 30.12.2015 | EE | 30.12.2015 | HR | 30.12.2015 | LI | 30.12.2015 | LV | 30.12.2015 | MC | 30.12.2015 | MT | 30.12.2015 | RO | 30.12.2015 | RS | 30.12.2015 | SM | 30.12.2015 | IE | 24.01.2016 | LU | 24.01.2016 | GR | 31.03.2016 | IS | 30.04.2016 | [2020/21] |
Former [2019/38] | AL | 30.12.2015 | |
BG | 30.12.2015 | ||
CH | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LI | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
IE | 24.01.2016 | ||
LU | 24.01.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 30.12.2015 | |
CH | 30.12.2015 | ||
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LI | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
IE | 24.01.2016 | ||
LU | 24.01.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CH | 30.12.2015 | |
DK | 30.12.2015 | ||
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LI | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
IE | 24.01.2016 | ||
LU | 24.01.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | DK | 30.12.2015 | |
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MT | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
IE | 24.01.2016 | ||
LU | 24.01.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 30.12.2015 | |
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
IE | 24.01.2016 | ||
LU | 24.01.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 30.12.2015 | |
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
LU | 24.01.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | EE | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
LU | 24.01.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | EE | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
LU | 24.01.2016 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | EE | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | EE | 30.12.2015 | |
HR | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RO | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | HR | 30.12.2015 | |
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | HR | 30.12.2015 | |
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 30.12.2015 | |
RS | 30.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0039016 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US]) [Y] 5,6 * figure 2; claims 1,2 *; | [XYI]WO2007145613 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,10 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 * [Y] 5,6,12-14 [I] 3,4,9,11; | [Y]WO2010072714 (INVENTIO AG [CH], et al) [Y] 12-14* page 5, line 12 - line 16 * | Opposition | WO03004397 | WO2007145613 | US7377366 | EP2022742 | WO2009074627 | WO2009105903 | DE102008022416 | EP1602610 | WO2011076590 |