EP2812735 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INSPECTING THE CARGO SPACE OF A TRUCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smiths Heimann GmbH Im Herzen 4 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [2014/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JECK, Michael Pfarrer-Brantzenstraße 26 55122 Mainz / DE | 02 /
SCHALL, Patricia Gerhart-Hauptmann-Str. 10 64331 Weiterstadt / DE | [2014/51] | Representative(s) | Greif, Thomas Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Derendorfer Allee 6 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/51] | Greif, Thomas Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 13703800.6 | 08.02.2013 | WO2013EP52538 | Priority number, date | DE20121002484 | 10.02.2012 Original published format: DE102012002484 | [2014/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013117694 | Date: | 15.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2812735 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01V5/00 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
G01V5/22 (EP,US);
G01V5/232 (US);
G01S13/58 (US);
G01V5/223 (US);
G01V5/224 (EP,US);
G01V5/226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERPRÜFUNG DES LADERAUMS EINES LASTKRAFTWAGENS | [2014/51] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR INSPECTING THE CARGO SPACE OF A TRUCK | [2014/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR CONTRÔLER L'ESPACE DE CHARGEMENT D'UN POIDS LOURD | [2014/51] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 28.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/40] | 12.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2015/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2004256565 (ADAMS WILLIAM [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0039] , [0041] - [0046]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2010034355 (LANGEVELD WILLEM G J [US], et al) [A] 1-6* paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0022] , [0028] , [0070]; figures 1B,6 *; | [Y]WO2010135620 (RAPISCAN SECURITY PRODUCTS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 15, lines 19-23; figures 4a,12-16,19,20 * * page 28, lines 18-31 * * page 31, line 17 - page 33, line 23 *; | [Y]EP2275839 (AMERICAN SCIENCE & ENG INC [US]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0028] , [0029]; figure 3 *; | [Y]US2011038453 (MORTON EDWARD JAMES [GB], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0100] , [0153] , [0166] - [0171]; figures 4a,12-16,19,20 * | by applicant | DE10122279 |