EP2814999 - SLIDING ELEMENT FOR USE IN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/52] | SPECIFICATION OF AN INVENTION PATENT FOR "SLIDING ELEMENT FOR USE IN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES". | ||
[2020/01] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mahle Metal Leve S/A Rodovia Anhanguera Sentido Interior - capital Km 49, 7 13210-877 Jundiaí, SP / BR | For all designated states Mahle International GmbH Pragstraße 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/25] |
Former [2014/52] | For all designated states Mahle Metal Leve S/A Rodovia Anhanguera Sentido Interior - capital Km 49, 7 13210-877 Jundiaí, SP / BR | ||
For all designated states Mahle International GmbH Pragstrasse 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AVELAR ARAUJO, Juliano Rua Benjamin Constant 131 - Centro CEP-13201-046 Jundiai - SP / BR | 02 /
COSTA, Nuno Rua 27 de setembro Lto 9 R/C Dto 3050-371 Mealhada / PT | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/52] | Application number, filing date | 13708068.5 | 15.02.2013 | [2020/25] | WO2013BR00044 | Priority number, date | BR20121003607 | 16.02.2012 Original published format: BR102012003607 | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013120157 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2814999 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2814999 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C23C28/04, C23C14/06, F16J9/26, F16C33/12, C23C14/34, C23C28/00 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
F16J9/26 (EP,US);
C23C14/0641 (CN);
C23C14/0605 (EP,US);
C23C14/0635 (EP,US);
C23C14/34 (EP,CN,US);
C23C28/04 (EP,US);
C23C28/046 (EP,CN,US);
C23C28/322 (EP,CN,US);
C23C28/341 (EP,CN,US);
C23C28/343 (EP,CN,US);
C23C28/347 (EP,US);
C23C28/42 (EP,US);
F16C33/124 (EP,CN,US);
C10N2080/00 (EP,US);
F16C2206/04 (EP,CN,US);
F16C2223/60 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/52] | C23C28/04, C23C14/06, F16J9/26, F16C33/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLEITELEMENT ZUR VERWENDUNG FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN | [2020/01] | English: | SLIDING ELEMENT FOR USE IN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES | [2020/01] | French: | ÉLÉMENT COULISSANT UTILISABLE DANS DES MOTEURS À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2020/01] |
Former [2014/52] | SPEZIFIKATION EINES ERFINDUNGSPATENT FÜR GLEITELEMENT ZUR VERWENDUNG FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN . | ||
Former [2014/52] | SPECIFICATION OF AN INVENTION PATENT FOR "SLIDING ELEMENT FOR USE IN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES". | ||
Former [2014/52] | DESCRIPTION D'UNE DEMANDE DE BREVET D'INVENTION POUR "ÉLÉMENT COULISSANT UTILISABLE DANS DES MOTEURS À COMBUSTION INTERNE" | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 15.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.03.2021
19.03.2021
ADMISSIBLE IHI Ionbond AG Industriestrasse 9 4657 Dulliken / CH Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/17] | 31.03.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.07.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.02.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.02.2023 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/29] | 27.02.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.02.2013 | AL | 17.06.2020 | AT | 17.06.2020 | CY | 17.06.2020 | CZ | 17.06.2020 | DK | 17.06.2020 | EE | 17.06.2020 | ES | 17.06.2020 | FI | 17.06.2020 | HR | 17.06.2020 | IT | 17.06.2020 | LT | 17.06.2020 | LV | 17.06.2020 | MC | 17.06.2020 | NL | 17.06.2020 | PL | 17.06.2020 | RO | 17.06.2020 | RS | 17.06.2020 | SE | 17.06.2020 | SI | 17.06.2020 | SK | 17.06.2020 | SM | 17.06.2020 | BG | 17.09.2020 | NO | 17.09.2020 | GR | 18.09.2020 | IS | 17.10.2020 | PT | 19.10.2020 | GB | 15.02.2021 | IE | 15.02.2021 | LU | 15.02.2021 | BE | 28.02.2021 | CH | 28.02.2021 | FR | 28.02.2021 | LI | 28.02.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 15.02.2013 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
GB | 15.02.2021 | ||
IE | 15.02.2021 | ||
LU | 15.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
GB | 15.02.2021 | ||
IE | 15.02.2021 | ||
LU | 15.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
GB | 15.02.2021 | ||
IE | 15.02.2021 | ||
LU | 15.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
IE | 15.02.2021 | ||
LU | 15.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
FR | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
LU | 15.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 17.06.2020 | |
NO | 17.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102006002034 (HAUZER TECHNO COATING B V [NL]) [A] 1-14* claims 1-39 *; | [A]WO2010017984 (AMG COATING TECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * claims 32-34 *; | [XI]DE102010002687 (FEDERAL MOGUL BURSCHEID GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7 * claims 1-8 * [I] 8-14; | [A]DE102010002686 (FEDERAL MOGUL BURSCHEID GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * figure 1; claims 1-10 *; | [A]DE102010002688 (FEDERAL MOGUL BURSCHEID GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * figure 1; claims 1-9 * | Examination | US2001028926 | by applicant | US2007078067 | DE102008042747 | DE102009046281 | DE102009028504 | Opposition | US2001028926 | DE102008042747 | DE102010002687 | DE102010002686 | WO2013120157 | - BEWILOGUA K, ET AL., "STRUCTURE, PROPERTIES AND APPLICATIONS OF DIAMOND-LIKE CARBON COATINGS PREPARED BY REACTIVE MAGNETRON SPUTTERING", ZEITSCHRIFT FUR METALLKUNDE, CARL HANSER, MUNICH., DE, DE , (20050901), vol. 96, no. 09, ISSN 0044-3093, pages 998 - 1004, XP001234905 | - Bewilogua, K. Wittorf, R. Thomsen, H. Weber, M., "DLC based coatings prepared by reactive d.c. magnetron sputtering", Thin Solid Films, Elsevier, AMSTERDAM, NL, AMSTERDAM, NL , (20040130), vol. 447-448, doi:10.1016/S0040-6090(03)01088-5, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 142 - 147, XP004493730 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-6090(03)01088-5 | - Bewilogua K, C.V Cooper, C. Specht J.Schroder , R. Wittrof, M.Crischke, "Effect of target material on deposition and properties of metal-containing DLC (Me-DLC) coatings", Surface & Coatings Technology, (20000101), vol. 127, pages 224 - 232, XP093011970 | - Strondl C, N.M. Carvalho, ""Investigation on the formation of tungsten carbide in tungsten-containing diamond like carbon coatings"", et al., "Investigation on the formation of tungsten carbide in tungsten-containing diamond like carbon coatings" Surface & Coatings Technology, 2003, (20030101), vol. 162, pages 288 - 293, XP093011973 | - Anonymous, "Kohlenstoffschichten", VDA, (20040101), XP093011974 | - Anonymous, "CHROMIUM ", WIKIPEDIA, (20120210), WIKIPEDIA, (20230106), XP093011975 | - Anonymous, "AMORPHOUS SOLID ", WIKIPEDIA, (20120209), WIKIPEDIA , (20230106), XP093011976 |