EP2989233 - A PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CO FROM CO2 IN A SOLID OXIDE ELECTROLYSIS CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haldor Topsøe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2016/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAKOBSSON, Niklas Bengt Hästskovägen 1 26023 Kågeröd / SE | 02 /
FRIIS PEDERSEN, Claus Grøndals Parkvej 94 2720 Vanløse / DK | 03 /
BØGILD HANSEN, John GL. Strandvej 190A 3050 Humlebaek / DK | [2020/30] |
Former [2016/09] | 01 /
JAKOBSSON, Niklas Bengt Hästskovägen 1 S-26023 Kågeröd / SE | ||
02 /
FRIIS PEDERSEN, Claus Grøndals Parkvej 94 DK-2720 Vanløse / DK | |||
03 /
BØGILD HANSEN, John Willemoesgade 39 2.th. DK-2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | Representative(s) | Topsoe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2016/09] | Haldor Topsøe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Application number, filing date | 13711915.2 | 26.03.2013 | [2016/09] | WO2013EP56411 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014154253 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2989233 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2989233 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C25B15/00, C25B15/08, C25B1/00, C25B9/00, C25B9/18, C25B15/02 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
C25B15/08 (EP,US);
B01D53/047 (US);
C25B1/00 (EP,US);
C25B15/00 (EP,US);
C25B15/02 (EP,US);
C25B9/00 (EP,US);
C25B9/70 (EP,US);
B01D2253/102 (US);
B01D2253/104 (US);
B01D2253/1122 (US);
B01D2253/1124 (US);
B01D2256/20 (US);
B01D2257/504 (US);
B01D2259/402 (US);
Y02C20/40 (EP);
Y02E60/36 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/09] | C25B15/00, C25B15/08, C25B1/00, C25B9/00, C25B9/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CO AUS CO2 IN EINER FESTOXID-ELEKTROLYSEZELLE | [2016/09] | English: | A PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CO FROM CO2 IN A SOLID OXIDE ELECTROLYSIS CELL | [2016/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CO À PARTIR DE CO2 DANS UNE CELLULE D'ÉLECTROLYSE À OXYDE SOLIDE | [2016/09] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 10.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.03.2013 | AL | 22.07.2020 | AT | 22.07.2020 | CY | 22.07.2020 | CZ | 22.07.2020 | EE | 22.07.2020 | FI | 22.07.2020 | HR | 22.07.2020 | IT | 22.07.2020 | LT | 22.07.2020 | LV | 22.07.2020 | MC | 22.07.2020 | NL | 22.07.2020 | PL | 22.07.2020 | RO | 22.07.2020 | RS | 22.07.2020 | SE | 22.07.2020 | SI | 22.07.2020 | SK | 22.07.2020 | SM | 22.07.2020 | BG | 22.10.2020 | NO | 22.10.2020 | GR | 23.10.2020 | IS | 22.11.2020 | PT | 23.11.2020 | IE | 26.03.2021 | LU | 26.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 26.03.2013 | |
AL | 22.07.2020 | ||
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
IE | 26.03.2021 | ||
LU | 26.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
IE | 26.03.2021 | ||
LU | 26.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
IE | 26.03.2021 | ||
LU | 26.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
IE | 26.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
AT | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
IT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
PL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RS | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 22.07.2020 | |
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 22.07.2020 | |
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
PT | 23.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 22.07.2020 | |
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0129444 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-25 * claims 1,9,14,18 *; | [X]US6106966 (CROW STEVEN COLLINS [US]) [X] 1-25 * claims 1,5 * * figures 13,14,22 * * column 1, lines 20-25 * * column 6, lines 9-12 *; | [XD]US2008023338 (STOOTS CARL M [US], et al) [XD] 1-25 * claims 11,12,15,20 * * paragraphs [0011] , [0021] , [0029] *; | [X]US2011253551 (LANE JONATHAN ANDREW [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * claims 1,8,9,14 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0022] - [0024] *; | [E]WO2013131778 (HALDOR TOPSOE AS [DK]) [E] 1-25 * claims 1,2,6-10,13-16 * * figures 1,6,7,10 * * page 17, line 20 - page 18, line 13 *; | [X] - JOHN B. HANSEN ET AL, "Production of Sustainable Fuels by Means of Solid Oxide Electrolysis", ECS TRANSACTIONS, (20110501), vol. 35, no. 1, doi:10.1149/1.3570293, ISSN 1938-5862, pages 2941 - 2948, XP055067864 [X] 1-25 * abstract * * figures 3,4 * * page 2944, paragraphs 3-4 * * page 2947, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.3570293 | [YD] - EBBESEN S D ET AL, "Electrolysis of carbon dioxide in Solid Oxide Electrolysis Cells", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER SA, CH, vol. 193, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JPOWSOUR.2009.02.093, ISSN 0378-7753, (20090319), pages 349 - 358, (20090319), XP026150424 [YD] 1-25 * abstract * * figures 1,2,4-6,8 * * table 2 * * page 349, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 350, column l, paragraph 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpowsour.2009.02.093 | Examination | US2006130647 | by applicant | US2007045125 | US2008023338 | US8138380 | US2012228150 | US8366902 | - MENG NI, MODELING OF A SOLID OXIDE ELECTROLYSIS CELL FOR CARBON DIOXIDE ELECTROLYSIS | - SUNE DALGAARD EBBESEN; MOGENS MOGENSEN, "Electrolysis of Carbon Dioxide in Solid Oxide Electrolysis Cells", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, (2009), vol. 193, pages 349 - 358 |