EP2812766 - METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY TRIGGERING A SELF-POSITIONING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.05.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robart GmbH Friedhofstrasse 4 4020 Linz / AT | [2014/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARTES, Harold c/o RobArt GmbH Friedhofstr. 4 4020 Linz / AT | 02 /
SEETHALER, Dominik c/o RobArt GmbH Friedhofstr. 4 4020 Linz / AT | 03 /
SCHAHPAR, Michael c/o RobArt GmbH Friedhofstr. 4 4020 Linz / AT | [2017/24] |
Former [2014/51] | 01 /
ARTES, Harold c/o RobArt GmbH Hamoderstraße 2 A-4020 Linz / AT | ||
02 /
SEETHALER, Dominik c/o RobArt GmbH Hamoderstraße 2 A-4020 Linz / AT | |||
03 /
SCHAHPAR, Michael c/o RobArt GmbH Hamoderstraße 2 A-4020 Linz / AT | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstrasse 79 81541 München / DE | [2020/25] |
Former [2017/24] | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Herzog-Wilhelm-Strasse 26 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/51] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Herzog-Wilhelm-Strasse 26 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13713066.2 | 08.02.2013 | [2017/24] | WO2013AT50031 | Priority number, date | DE201210201870 | 08.02.2012 Original published format: DE102012201870 | [2014/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013116887 | Date: | 15.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2812766 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2812766 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/24] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2812766 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, B25J5/00, B25J9/16, B25J11/00 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
G05D1/0274 (EP,US);
B25J9/1692 (US);
B25J11/0085 (US);
B25J5/00 (US);
B25J9/1664 (US);
Y10S901/01 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/51] | G05D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN AUSLÖSEN EINER SELBSTLOKALISIERUNG | [2014/51] | English: | METHOD FOR AUTOMATICALLY TRIGGERING A SELF-POSITIONING PROCESS | [2014/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCLENCHEMENT AUTOMATIQUE D'UNE AUTO-LOCALISATION | [2014/51] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 14.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Str. 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | 02
14.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Vorwerk & Co. Interholding GmbH Mühlenweg 17-37 42275 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Müller, Enno, et al, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Str. 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | ||
02
14.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Vorwerk & Co. Interholding GmbH Mühlenweg 17-37 42275 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Müller, Enno, et al, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | 26.03.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.08.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.11.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.12.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.12.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 06.05.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.02.2013 | AL | 14.06.2017 | CY | 14.06.2017 | CZ | 14.06.2017 | DK | 14.06.2017 | EE | 14.06.2017 | FI | 14.06.2017 | HR | 14.06.2017 | LT | 14.06.2017 | LV | 14.06.2017 | MC | 14.06.2017 | MK | 14.06.2017 | MT | 14.06.2017 | NL | 14.06.2017 | PL | 14.06.2017 | PT | 14.06.2017 | RO | 14.06.2017 | RS | 14.06.2017 | SE | 14.06.2017 | SI | 14.06.2017 | SK | 14.06.2017 | SM | 14.06.2017 | TR | 14.06.2017 | BG | 14.09.2017 | NO | 14.09.2017 | GR | 15.09.2017 | IS | 14.10.2017 | AT | 08.02.2018 | IE | 08.02.2018 | LU | 08.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | IT | 08.02.2020 | [2021/48] |
Former [2020/34] | HU | 08.02.2013 | |
AL | 14.06.2017 | ||
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MK | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
AT | 08.02.2018 | ||
IE | 08.02.2018 | ||
LU | 08.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/31] | HU | 08.02.2013 | |
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MK | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
AT | 08.02.2018 | ||
IE | 08.02.2018 | ||
LU | 08.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 08.02.2013 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
AT | 08.02.2018 | ||
IE | 08.02.2018 | ||
LU | 08.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
AT | 08.02.2018 | ||
IE | 08.02.2018 | ||
LU | 08.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
AT | 08.02.2018 | ||
IE | 08.02.2018 | ||
LU | 08.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 08.02.2018 | ||
LU | 08.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 08.02.2018 | ||
LU | 08.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
LU | 08.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US2003030398 (JACOBS STEPHEN [US], et al) [AD] 1-11 * paragraphs [0038] , [0044] - [0045] - [0058] , [0062] , [0071] , [0080] , [0093] , [0124] - [0126]; figures 1,3-8,11,15; claims 1,6,11,38,41,42 *; | [A]EP2256574 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0013] - [0014] - [0021] , [0022] , [0024] , [0027] , [0046] - [0049] - [0051] , [0053]; figures 1-2,11; claims 1,3 *; | [AD] - PATRIC JENSFELT ET AL, "Active Global Localization for a Mobile Robot Using Multiple Hypothesis Tracking", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION, IEEE INC, NEW YORK, US, (20011005), vol. 17, no. 5, ISSN 1042-296X, XP011053629 [AD] 1-11 * pages 748,750; figures 1,5a,5b,7 * * page 756 - page 758 * | Examination | US2005182518 | DE102007010979 | by applicant | US6667592 | US2009182464 | EP2287697 | - H. DURRANT-WHYTE; T. BAILEY, "Simultaneous Localization and Mapping (SLAM): Part I The Essential Algorithms", IEEE ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION MAGAZINE, (200606), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 99 - 110, XP055066899 | Opposition | US5995884 | US2003030398 | US2005182518 | KR20070027840 | DE102007010979 | EP2256398 | US2009281661 | WO2011013862 | - Primo Zingaretti et al., "Appearance based robotics", IEEE Robotics & Automation Magazine, (20060400), XP055471512 | - LINA M. PAZ et al., "Global localization in SLAM in bilinear time", Intelligent Robots and Systems, (20050802), pages 655 - 661, XP010857151 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IROS.2005.1545055 | - SEONGSOO LEE et al., "Vision-Based Kidnap Recovery with SLAM for Home Cleaning Robots", Journal of Intelligent & Robotic Systems, (20111215), vol. 67, no. 1, pages 7 - 24, XP035076954 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10846-011-9647-4 | - JINWOO CHOI et al., "Topological localization with kidnap recovery using sonar grid map matching in a home environment", Robotics and Computer-Integrated Manufacturing, (20111115), vol. 28, no. 3, pages 366 - 374, XP055477101 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.rcim.2011.10.008 | - SEWAN KIM, "Autonomous Cleaning Robot: Roboking System Integration and Overview", Proceedings of the 2004 IEEE International Conference on Robotics & Automation, New Orleans, LA, (20040400), pages 4437 - 4441, XP010768093 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ROBOT.2004.1302416 | - KURT KONOLIGE et al., "View Based Maps", The International Journal of Robotics Research, (20100506), vol. 29, no. 8, pages 1 - 17, XP055477128 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/0278364910370376 | - KURT KONOLIGE et al., "Towards Lifelong Visual Maps", The 2009 IEEE /RSJ International Conference on Intelligent Robots and Systems, St. Louis , USA, (20091011), pages 1156 - 1163, XP031580482 | - BENJAMIN STEWART et al., "The Revisiting Problem in Mobile Robot Map Building: A Hierarchical Bayesian Approach", UAI'03 Proceedings of the Nineteenth Conference on Uncer- tainty in Artificial Intelligence, (20020807), pages 551 - 558, XP055477131 | - PAZ et al., "Global Localization in SLAM in Bilinear Time", 2005 IEEE /RSJ International Conference on Intelligent Robots and Sys- tems, (20050802), XP010857151 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IROS.2005.1545055 | - SEONGSOO LEE et al., "Vision-Based Kidnap Recovery with SLAM for Home Cleaning Robots", Journal of Intelligent & Robotic Systems, (20111215), vol. 67, no. 1, pages 7 - 24 | - Se, S. et al, "Vision-based Global Localization and Mapping for Mobile Robots", IEEE Transactions on Robotics, (20050106), vol. 21, no. 3, pages 364 - 375 |