EP2836061 - GUIDE SYSTEM FOR THE PLUNGER OF A RECTANGULAR BALER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNH Industrial Belgium nv Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [2015/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIEBUYCK, Ronald Nachtegalenlaan 17 B-8630 Veurne / BE | [2015/08] | Representative(s) | CNH Industrial IP Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/08] | CNH Industrial IP Department Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 13713919.2 | 04.04.2013 | [2016/23] | WO2013EP57110 | Priority number, date | BE20120000241 | 10.04.2012 Original published format: BE 201200241 | [2015/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013152988 | Date: | 17.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2836061 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2836061 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/04, B30B15/04 | [2015/08] | CPC: |
A01F15/042 (EP,US);
A01F15/046 (US);
A01F15/08 (US);
B30B15/041 (EP);
B30B9/3021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSSYSTEM FÜR DEN KOLBEN EINER QUADERBALLENPRESSE | [2015/49] | English: | GUIDE SYSTEM FOR THE PLUNGER OF A RECTANGULAR BALER | [2015/08] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GUIDAGE POUR LE PISTON D'UNE PRESSE À BALLES QUARRÉES | [2015/49] |
Former [2015/08] | FÜHRUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINEN PRESSSTEMPEL EINER RECHTECKIGEN BALLENPRESSE | ||
Former [2015/08] | SYSTÈME GUIDE POUR LE PISTON D'UNE PRESSE À BALLES RECTANGULAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 26.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.04.2013 | AL | 08.06.2016 | AT | 08.06.2016 | BG | 08.06.2016 | CY | 08.06.2016 | CZ | 08.06.2016 | DK | 08.06.2016 | EE | 08.06.2016 | ES | 08.06.2016 | FI | 08.06.2016 | HR | 08.06.2016 | LT | 08.06.2016 | LV | 08.06.2016 | MC | 08.06.2016 | MK | 08.06.2016 | NL | 08.06.2016 | PL | 08.06.2016 | RO | 08.06.2016 | RS | 08.06.2016 | SE | 08.06.2016 | SI | 08.06.2016 | SK | 08.06.2016 | SM | 08.06.2016 | TR | 08.06.2016 | NO | 08.09.2016 | GR | 09.09.2016 | IS | 08.10.2016 | PT | 10.10.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 04.04.2013 | |
AL | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 04.04.2013 | |
AL | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 04.04.2013 | |
AL | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.04.2013 | |
AL | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 08.06.2016 | |
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
DK | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
ES | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 08.06.2016 | |
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 08.06.2016 | |
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 08.06.2016 | |
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 08.06.2016 | |
NO | 08.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB813393 (BAMFORDS LTD) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 * * page 2, lines 25-36 * * page 4, lines 8-42 *; | [A]GB846396 (BAMFORDS LTD) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 * * page 3, lines 50-61 * * page 3, lines 90-106 *; | [AD]US3059569 (NOLT EDWIN B) [AD] 1 * figures 1-9 * * column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 12 *; | [AD]GB1161650 (WELGER GEB [DE]) [AD] 1* figures 1-4 *; | [A]US3552307 (VENABLE PHILLIP G) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 42-48; figures 1-2 * | by applicant | US3059569 | GB1161650 |