EP2959237 - THERMOELECTRIC HEAT TRANSFERRING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZELISSEN, Marcus Jozef Gertrudis Rutgerstraat 46 5993 EG Maasbree / NL | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Verhees, Godefridus Josephus Maria Brabants Octrooibureau B.V. De Pinckart 54 5674 CC Nuenen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 13718415.6 | 25.02.2013 | [2016/01] | WO2013NL00006 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014129886 | Date: | 28.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2959237 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F25B21/02, F25B25/00 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
F25B21/02 (EP,US);
F25B21/04 (US);
H10N10/17 (EP,US);
F25B25/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Title | German: | THERMOELEKTRISCHES WÄRMETRANSFERSYSTEM | [2016/01] | English: | THERMOELECTRIC HEAT TRANSFERRING SYSTEM | [2016/01] | French: | SYSTÈME THERMOÉLECTRIQUE DE TRANSFERT DE CHALEUR | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 07.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2018 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.08.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 18.08.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.08.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2016 | 29.02.2020 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2020 | 28.02.2021 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.2021 | 28.02.2022 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2006137360 (GHOSHAL UTTAM [US]) [X] 1,4,6,22,30,38,44,45,47 * paragraphs [0009] - [0013] - [0037] , [0065] - paragraph [0074]; figures 6A,6B,14-18 * [I] 2,3,5; | [XI]US2007101748 (PHAM HUNG M [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6,27,38,44,45,47,53 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0029]; figure 1 *[I] 2,3,7,22,30,43,53; | [XI]DE102010021901 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,6,22,27,30,38,44,45,47 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0005] , [0010] , [0052] , [0054] , [0030] - paragraph [0043]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0068] * [I] 2,3,7,43,53 | by applicant | WO02086980 |