EP2845074 - ACCELEROMETER-CONTROLLED MASTER POWER SWITCH FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Analog Devices, Inc. One Technology Way Norwood, MA 02062-9106 / US | [2015/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIEN, Yu-Tsun 3108 Stearns Hill Rd. Waltham, Massachusetts 02451 / US | [2015/11] | Representative(s) | Thompson, Andrew John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/11] | Beck, Simon Antony, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13719215.9 | 23.04.2013 | WO2013US37722 | Priority number, date | US201213454607 | 24.04.2012 Original published format: US201213454607 | [2015/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013163135 | Date: | 31.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2845074 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/32 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
G06F1/3206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/11] | Title | German: | VON BESCHLEUNIGUNGSMESSER GESTEUERTER HAUPTNETZSCHALTER FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2015/11] | English: | ACCELEROMETER-CONTROLLED MASTER POWER SWITCH FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICES | [2015/11] | French: | INTERRUPTEUR D'ALIMENTATION MAÎTRE COMMANDÉ PAR ACCÉLÉROMÈTRE POUR DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRONIQUES | [2015/11] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 14.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/10] | 30.01.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.02.2017 | 01.02.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US6452494 (HARRISON EDWARD R [US]) [X] 1,3,4,7-11,13-18 * the whole document * [I] 2,12; | [I]US6037748 (YEE DAVID MOON [US], et al) [I] 1-4,8-14,16-18 * column 2, line 45 - column 5; figures 1,2 *; | [I]US6067044 (WHELAN TERRENCE WILLIAM [US], et al) [I] 1-5,11-14 * the whole document *; | [I]US2010235667 (MUCIGNAT ANDREA [US], et al) [I] 1-6,8-14,16-18 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0039]; paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0068]; figure 2 *; | [A]EP2315101 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [A] 7,15 * paragraph [0087] * |