EP2916971 - LIQUID EJECTION SYSTEM WITH NOZZLE HAVING TWO OUTLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfa Laval Corporate AB PO Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE | [2015/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KJELLBERG, Kim Hjortespringvej 67 DK-2730 Herlev / DK | 02 /
HJORSLEV, Leon Vibemosen 73 DK-2670 Greve / DK | [2015/38] | Representative(s) | Alfa Laval Attorneys Alfa Laval Corporate AB Group Patent P.O. Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/38] | Alfa Laval Attorneys Alfa Laval Corporate AB Patent Department P.O. Box 73 221 00 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 13726543.5 | 04.06.2013 | [2015/38] | WO2013EP61464 | Priority number, date | EP20120191805 | 08.11.2012 Original published format: EP 12191805 | [2015/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014072087 | Date: | 15.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2916971 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2916971 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B08B9/093, B05B3/06, B05B3/04, B05B13/06, B05B1/14 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
B08B9/0936 (EP,US);
B01F25/21 (US);
B05B1/14 (EP,US);
B05B13/0636 (EP,US);
B05B3/0445 (EP,US);
B05B3/06 (EP,US);
B05B3/1007 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/38] | B08B9/093, B05B1/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSAUSGABESYSTEM MIT DÜSE MIT ZWEI AUSLÄSSEN | [2015/38] | English: | LIQUID EJECTION SYSTEM WITH NOZZLE HAVING TWO OUTLETS | [2015/38] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉJECTION DE LIQUIDE AVEC BUSE ÉQUIPÉE DE DEUX SORTIES | [2020/14] |
Former [2015/38] | SYSTÈME D'ÉJECTION DE LIQUIDE COMPORTANT UNE BUSE PRÉSENTANT DEUX SORTIES | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/38] | 16.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2018 | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.06.2013 | AL | 08.07.2020 | AT | 08.07.2020 | CY | 08.07.2020 | CZ | 08.07.2020 | EE | 08.07.2020 | FI | 08.07.2020 | HR | 08.07.2020 | LT | 08.07.2020 | LV | 08.07.2020 | MC | 08.07.2020 | MK | 08.07.2020 | MT | 08.07.2020 | PL | 08.07.2020 | RO | 08.07.2020 | RS | 08.07.2020 | SI | 08.07.2020 | SK | 08.07.2020 | SM | 08.07.2020 | BG | 08.10.2020 | NO | 08.10.2020 | GR | 09.10.2020 | IS | 08.11.2020 | PT | 09.11.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 04.06.2013 | |
AL | 08.07.2020 | ||
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CY | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
MK | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 04.06.2013 | |
AL | 08.07.2020 | ||
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CY | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 04.06.2013 | |
AL | 08.07.2020 | ||
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 08.07.2020 | |
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 08.07.2020 | |
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2010144035 (SCANJET MARINE AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 4, line 28 - line 31 * * page 6, line 5 - line 8 * * page 7, line 3 - line 17 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE1237969 (NEUBECKER FA C A) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, line 21 - line 52 * * column 3, line 26 - line 37 * * figures 1,2 * * figures 4,5 *; | [A]GB2315106 (THAMES WATER UTILITIES [GB]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph 4 * * page 2, paragraph 7 * * page 4, paragraph 5 * * figure 1 *; | [A]BE525630 (SEITZ-WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 7 - line 20 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE19811421 (ALFA LAVAL LKM A S [DK]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 39 - line 44 * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 1 * * column 2, line 28 - line 33 * * column 3, line 56 - line 61 * * column 5, line 68 - column 6, line 5 * * figure 1 * * figure 3 * | Examination | WO2007090403 | by applicant | US2008142042 | WO2010117324 | WO9204994 |