|
08.04.2022 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
05.04.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.04.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2022 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.02.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2022 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.02.2022 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2022 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2022 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2022 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
8 |
|
10.02.2022 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.02.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.02.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.02.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.01.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2022 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.01.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2022 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2022 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.01.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
30.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2021 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2021 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.03.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.03.2021 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2021 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2021 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2020 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 008 |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2020 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2019 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.07.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2019 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
22.03.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2019 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2019 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.03.2019 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.2019 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.01.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2018 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.09.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2018 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2017 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.08.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2017 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
55 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
20.10.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.09.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.05.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
06.05.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
13.04.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.12.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2014 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.07.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.03.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2014 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
06.09.2013 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
25 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |