EP2904051 - METAL-FREE REACTIVE DYES, PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DyStar Colours Distribution GmbH Am Prime Parc 10-12 65479 Raunheim / DE | [2015/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUAN, Han 11-239, Block 239 Juron West Street 81 640847 Singapore / SG | 02 /
WONG, Xiao Tien 38-41, Block 28B Dover Crescent Singapore 132028 / SG | 03 /
KIM, Hyeong Kyu 03-188. Block 269 Bukit Batok East Avenue 4 / SG | 04 /
BARBIERU, Roxana 331C Pasir Panjang, Lynnsville Singapore 117468 / SG | [2015/33] | Application number, filing date | 13729019.3 | 13.06.2013 | [2015/33] | WO2013EP62198 | Priority number, date | EP20120004554 | 18.06.2012 Original published format: EP 12004554 | [2015/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013189814 | Date: | 27.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2904051 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C09B62/09, C09B62/25, C09B62/44, C09B62/513, D06P1/00, D06P3/00, C09B62/006, C09B62/02 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
C09B62/513 (EP);
C09B62/0061 (KR);
C09B62/0062 (KR);
C09B62/0064 (KR);
C09B62/09 (KR);
C09B62/4415 (EP,KR);
D06P1/38 (EP);
D06P3/148 (EP,KR);
D06P3/248 (EP);
D06P3/66 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] | Title | German: | METALLFREIE REAKTIVE FARBSTOFFE, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2015/33] | English: | METAL-FREE REACTIVE DYES, PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND THEIR USE | [2015/33] | French: | COLORANTS RÉACTIFS EXEMPTS DE MÉTAUX, LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2015/33] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/33] | 26.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 26.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/29] | 02.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/29] | Request for further processing for: | 01.06.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 01.06.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.07.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 01.06.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 01.06.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.07.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 01.06.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 01.06.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.07.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 01.06.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 01.06.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.07.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]EP2468822 (REX TONE IND LTD [IN]) [XP] 1-15 * page 18; compound 32 * * the whole document *; | [Y]CN101323710B (SHANGHAI ARGUS TEXTILE CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * Compounds of Formula (1), (2) and (3); page 6, paragraph 0009 * * page 9; compound Ic * | [XY] - BULEARCA M ET AL, "Synthesis of Reactive Dyes Based on Epychlorohydrine", SCIENTIFIC BULLETIN UNIVERSITY POLITEHNICA OF BUCHAREST.SERIES B, CHEMISTRY AND MATERIALS SCIENCE, UNIVERSITY POLITECHNICA OF BUCHAREST, BUCHAREST, BG, (20060101), vol. 68, no. 3, ISSN 1454-2331, pages 21 - 32, XP009172086 [X] 1,2 * page 21 * * page 23; compound XX * * the whole document * [Y] 1-15 | [X] - KOZHEVENNO-OBUVNAYA PROMYSHLENNOST', KOZHEVENNO-OBUVNAYA PROMYSHLENNOST', MOSCOW, RU, (20040101), no. 2, ISSN 0023-4354, pages 48 - 50, XP009172084 [X] 1,2 * page 48; compound 3W * * the whole document * | by applicant | US2003172476 |