EP2802204 - MODULATION OF PLANT BIOLOGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FBSciences Holdings, Inc. 153 North Main Street, Suite 100 Collierville, TN 38017 / US | [2014/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSON, Terry J. 12420 Schoolhouse Street Raleigh, North Carolina 27614 / US | 02 /
DAY, Kenneth Scott 22456 Broken Oak Lane Clovis, California 93619 / US | 03 /
STROMBERG, Johan Peter 153 N Main Street Suite 100 Collierville, Tennessee 38017 / US | [2015/39] |
Former [2014/47] | 01 /
HANSON, Terry J. 12420 Schoolhouse Street Raleigh, North Carolina 27614 / US | ||
02 /
DAY, Kenneth Scott 22456 Broken Oak Lane Clovis, California 93619 / US | |||
03 /
STROMBERG, Johan Peter 2675 Calkins Rd. Germantown, Tennessee 38139 / US | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2020/37] |
Former [2014/47] | Johnson, Yvonne Catherine Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13735635.8 | 11.01.2013 | [2020/37] | WO2013US21254 | Priority number, date | US201261585848P | 12.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261585848 P | [2014/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013106724 | Date: | 18.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2802204 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2802204 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.07.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01N61/00, A01G7/06, A01H3/04, A01C1/08, A01P21/00 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
A01N61/00 (EP,US);
A01N37/36 (US);
A01N25/28 (US);
A01N25/32 (US);
A01N57/00 (US);
A01N59/00 (US)
| C-Set: |
A01N61/00, A01N25/26, A01N59/08, A01N59/16, A01N2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/47] | A01G7/06, A01H3/04, A01C1/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULATION EINER PFLANZENBIOLOGIE | [2014/47] | English: | MODULATION OF PLANT BIOLOGY | [2014/47] | French: | MODULATION DE LA BIOLOGIE VÉGÉTALE | [2014/47] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/47] | 06.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2019 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 11.06.2019 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 21.02.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.02.2020 | 25.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20194818.9 / EP3763200 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.09.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 19.09.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.10.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.01.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 16.01.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.02.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.01.2013 | AL | 09.09.2020 | AT | 09.09.2020 | CY | 09.09.2020 | CZ | 09.09.2020 | EE | 09.09.2020 | HR | 09.09.2020 | LT | 09.09.2020 | LV | 09.09.2020 | MC | 09.09.2020 | PL | 09.09.2020 | RO | 09.09.2020 | RS | 09.09.2020 | SI | 09.09.2020 | SK | 09.09.2020 | SM | 09.09.2020 | BG | 09.12.2020 | GR | 10.12.2020 | IS | 09.01.2021 | IE | 11.01.2021 | LU | 11.01.2021 | PT | 11.01.2021 | BE | 31.01.2021 | CH | 31.01.2021 | LI | 31.01.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 11.01.2013 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
IE | 11.01.2021 | ||
LU | 11.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
IE | 11.01.2021 | ||
LU | 11.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
IE | 11.01.2021 | ||
LU | 11.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
LU | 11.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
LU | 11.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 09.09.2020 | |
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 09.09.2020 | |
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | HR | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/10] | HR | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | LT | 09.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2010216909 (BERG GEBERT ALEX [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * the claims and paragaphs 60-90 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]US2011053771 (GOODWIN BRIAN B [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * [Y] 1-15; | [XP]US2012196747 (GOODWIN BRIAN B [US]) [XP] 1-15 * the whole document; in particular: the claims and paragraphs 27-76; the experimental part and the methods *; | [I] - ÖNDER TÜRKMEN ET AL, "Calcium and humic acid affect seed germination, growth, and nutrient content of tomato ( Lycopersicon esculentum L .) seedlings under saline soil conditions", ACTA AGRICULTURAE SCANDINAVICA, SECTION B - SOIL & PLANT SCIENCE, (20040801), vol. 54, no. 3, doi:10.1080/09064710310022014, ISSN 0906-4710, pages 168 - 174, XP055185915 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/09064710310022014 | [I] - K Mesut Çimrin ET AL, "Phosphorus and humic acid application alleviate salinity stress of pepper seedling", African Journal of Biotechnology, Victoria Island, doi:10.5897/AJB10.384, (20100906), pages 5845 - 5851, URL: http://search.proquest.com/docview/1660133512, (20150424), XP055185913 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5897/AJB10.384 | [Y] - Vol 1231 Hortscience, "Humic Acid Seed and Substrate Treatments Promote Seedling Root Development", HORTSCIENCE, (20000101), pages 1231 - 1233, URL: http://hortsci.ashspublications.org/content/35/7/1231.full.pdf, (20150424), XP055185919 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - G. CACCO ET AL, "PLANT GROWTH REGULATOR ACTIVITY OF SOLUBLE HUMIC COMPLEXES", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF SOIL SCIENCE, (19840401), vol. 64, no. 2, doi:10.4141/cjss84-023, ISSN 0008-4271, pages 225 - 228, XP055185916 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4141/cjss84-023 | International search | [Y]US5939356 (WELLINGHOFF STEPHEN T [US]); | [A]EP1216976 (UNIV DEGLI STUDI UDINE [IT]); | [A]US2005220834 (WANG XIAO D [US], et al); | [X]US2011053771 (GOODWIN BRIAN B [US]); | [A]US2011078816 (GOODWIN BRIAN B [US]); | [A]US2011077155 (GOODWIN BRIAN B [US]) | by applicant | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 1175006-56-0 |