EP2812646 - BRAKE PANEL FOR A DETONATOR OR A PROJECTILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAE Systems Bofors AB 691 80 Karlskoga / SE | [2014/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETTERSSON, Thomas Bergsängsvägen 7 SE-691 45 Karlskoga / SE | 02 /
ENGMAN, Peter Stolpetorpsvägen 117 69154 Karlskoga / SE | 03 /
JOHANSSON, Björn Jordgubbsvägen 18 69147 Karlskoga / SE | [2014/51] | Representative(s) | Nobeli Business Support AB Hyttåsvägen 10 691 80 Karlskoga / SE | [2018/16] |
Former [2014/51] | Falk, Bengt Saab Bofors Support AB Patents and Trademarks 691 80 Karlskoga / SE | Application number, filing date | 13746181.0 | 28.01.2013 | [2018/16] | WO2013SE00011 | Priority number, date | SE20120030014 | 06.02.2012 Original published format: SE 1230014 | [2014/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013119163 | Date: | 15.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2812646 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2812646 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 15.08.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F42B10/50, F42C19/02 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
F42B10/50 (EP,SE,US);
F42C19/02 (EP,SE,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTBREMSE FÜR EINEN ZÜNDER ODER EIN GESCHOSS | [2017/45] | English: | BRAKE PANEL FOR A DETONATOR OR A PROJECTILE | [2014/51] | French: | AÉROFREIN POUR DÉTONATEUR OU PROJECTILE | [2017/45] |
Former [2014/51] | BREMSTAFEL FÜR EINEN ZÜNDER ODER EIN GESCHOSS | ||
Former [2014/51] | PANNEAU DE FREIN POUR DÉTONATEUR OU PROJECTILE | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 07.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2013 | AL | 18.04.2018 | AT | 18.04.2018 | CY | 18.04.2018 | DK | 18.04.2018 | EE | 18.04.2018 | LT | 18.04.2018 | LV | 18.04.2018 | MC | 18.04.2018 | MK | 18.04.2018 | NL | 18.04.2018 | RO | 18.04.2018 | SE | 18.04.2018 | SI | 18.04.2018 | SK | 18.04.2018 | SM | 18.04.2018 | BG | 18.07.2018 | GR | 19.07.2018 | IS | 18.08.2018 | PT | 20.08.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 28.01.2013 | |
AL | 18.04.2018 | ||
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CY | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
IS | 18.08.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CY | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
IS | 18.08.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CY | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 18.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR496912 (CHARLES LEOPOLD MAYER [FR]) [X] 1,3,5,7,8,10 * page 1, line 60 - page 2, line 19 * * figures 3-6 * [I] 4,9; | [XI]DE10005414 (RHEINMETALL W & M GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 4 * * figure 4 * [I] 4,9; | [XI]US2001039898 (BAR KLAUS [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0020] * * figure - * [I] 4,9; | [XI]US2003042356 (BAR KLAUS [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0014] * * figure - * [I] 4,8,9; | [XI]US2005258308 (BAR KLAUS [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,6-8 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0012] * * figure - *[I] 9 | International search | [A]US3188958 (BURKE JAMES D, et al); | [A]US6310335 (BONNET ALAIN [FR], et al); | [A]WO0214781 (CLAVERHAM LTD [GB], et al); | [A]US2003037665 (RUPERT JOHN G [US], et al) |