|
30.04.2019 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.04.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2019 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.12.2018 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2018 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.08.2018 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
01.08.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
31.07.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
09.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Appeal |
13 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2018 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2018 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.05.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2018 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
19.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.07.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.07.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2016 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
23.03.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
12.08.2013 |
Abstract |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2013 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.08.2013 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
12.08.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.08.2013 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
15 |
|
12.08.2013 |
Description |
Appeal |
15 |
|
12.08.2013 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
12.08.2013 |
Drawings |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.08.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |