EP2890321 - RENAL RF ABLATION SYSTEM WITH A MOVABLE VIRTUAL ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/28] | RENAL RF ABLATION SYSTEM WITH A MOVABLE VIRTUAL ELECTRODE AND RELATED METHODS OF USE | ||
[2016/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311-1566 / US | [2015/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Pu 9 Golf Ridge Drive Trabuco Canyon, CA 92679 / US | 02 /
WANG, Huisun 6275 Fernbrook Lane North Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | 03 /
CAO, Hong 17733 62nd Ct N Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | [2016/41] |
Former [2015/28] | 01 /
ZHOU, Pu 18960 95th Avenue North Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | ||
02 /
WANG, Huisun 6275 Fernbrook Lane North Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | |||
03 /
CAO, Hong 17733 62nd Ct N Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2015/28] | Application number, filing date | 13763134.7 | 28.08.2013 | [2016/41] | WO2013US57124 | Priority number, date | US201261694100P | 28.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261694100 P | [2015/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014036163 | Date: | 06.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2890321 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2890321 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14, A61B17/00, A61M25/00, A61M25/01, A61B18/00, A61M25/02 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B18/18 (US);
A61B2017/00305 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00469 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00279 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NIEREN-FUNKFREQUENZ-ABLATIONSSYSTEM MIT EINER BEWEGLICHEN VIRTUELLEN ELEKTRODE | [2016/18] | English: | RENAL RF ABLATION SYSTEM WITH A MOVABLE VIRTUAL ELECTRODE | [2016/18] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ABLATION RÉNALE PAR RF POURVU D'UNE ÉLECTRODE VIRTUELLE MOBILE | [2016/18] |
Former [2015/28] | NIEREN-FUNKFREQUENZ-ABLATIONSSYSTEM MIT EINER BEWEGLICHEN VIRTUELLEN ELEKTRODE UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2015/28] | RENAL RF ABLATION SYSTEM WITH A MOVABLE VIRTUAL ELECTRODE AND RELATED METHODS OF USE | ||
Former [2015/28] | SYSTÈME D'ABLATION RÉNALE PAR RF POURVU D'UNE ÉLECTRODE VIRTUELLE MOBILE ET SES PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/28] | 14.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16183287.8 / EP3123973 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2013 | AL | 12.10.2016 | AT | 12.10.2016 | BE | 12.10.2016 | CY | 12.10.2016 | CZ | 12.10.2016 | DK | 12.10.2016 | EE | 12.10.2016 | ES | 12.10.2016 | FI | 12.10.2016 | HR | 12.10.2016 | LT | 12.10.2016 | LV | 12.10.2016 | MC | 12.10.2016 | MK | 12.10.2016 | PL | 12.10.2016 | RO | 12.10.2016 | RS | 12.10.2016 | SE | 12.10.2016 | SI | 12.10.2016 | SK | 12.10.2016 | SM | 12.10.2016 | TR | 12.10.2016 | BG | 12.01.2017 | NO | 12.01.2017 | GR | 13.01.2017 | IS | 12.02.2017 | PT | 13.02.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
TR | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 12.10.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0245608 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2005070887 (TAIMISTO MIRIAM H [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2011130534 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012116382 (KU VINCENT [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |