EP2838158 - VARIABLE BEAM CONTROL ANTENNA FOR MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KMW Inc. 183-6, Yeongcheon-ro Dongtan-myeon Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-813 / KR | [2020/19] |
Former [2015/08] | For all designated states KMW Inc. 183-6, Yeongcheon-ro Dongtan-myeon Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-813 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOON, Young-Chan KMW INC. 183-6 Yeongcheon-ro Dongtan-myeon Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-813 / KR | 02 /
SO, Sung-Hwan KMW INC. 183-6 Yeongcheon-ro Dongtan-myeon Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-813 / KR | 03 /
KIM, In-Ho 302-703 Geumhwamaeul APT. Sanggal-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-760 / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Oh-Seog 880-604 Jayeon-n Desiang APT. Neung-dong Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-792 / KR | 05 /
YANG, Hyoung-Seok C-231 Daelim Acrotel Jeongja-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-826 / KR | [2015/08] | Representative(s) | Scheele, Friedrich, et al Scheele Wetzel Patentanwälte Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/19] | Scheele, Friedrich, et al Ratner Prestia Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/08] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13776004.7 | 08.04.2013 | [2020/19] | WO2013KR02917 | Priority number, date | KR20120038113 | 12.04.2012 Original published format: KR 20120038113 | [2015/08] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013154311 | Date: | 17.10.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2838158 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2838158 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q3/08, H01Q19/13, H01Q21/06, H01Q21/08, H01Q1/12, H01Q1/42, H01Q1/48, H01Q9/28 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
H01Q3/08 (EP,US);
H01Q3/32 (KR);
H01Q1/1264 (EP,US);
H01Q1/246 (EP,US);
H01Q1/42 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q1/48 (EP,US);
H01Q19/13 (EP,US);
H01Q21/062 (EP,US);
H01Q21/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/42] | H01Q3/32, H01Q1/42, H01Q1/18, H01Q1/12, H01Q1/48, H01Q9/28 | ||
Former IPC [2015/08] | H01Q3/32, H01Q1/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERANTENNE MIT VARIABLEM STRAHL FÜR EIN MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2015/08] | English: | VARIABLE BEAM CONTROL ANTENNA FOR MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2015/08] | French: | ANTENNE À COMMANDE DE FAISCEAU VARIABLE POUR SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE | [2015/08] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2014 | Translation filed | 16.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 16.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 31.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2019 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.04.2013 | AL | 06.05.2020 | AT | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | DK | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | ES | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | IT | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | NL | 06.05.2020 | PL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | RS | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | SM | 06.05.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | NO | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 08.04.2013 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | HR | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | HR | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | HR | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4379297 (CHEVALLIER RENE [FR]) [Y] 2 * page 1, column 1, line 39 - line 49 * * page 1, column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 37; figure 1 *; | [A]US4878062 (CRAVEN TYSON S [US], et al) [A] 9* figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5818385 (BARTHOLOMEW DARIN E [US]) [A] 8 * page 4, column 8, line 20 - line 34; figure 1B * * page 5, column 10, line 61 - line 62; figure 2A *; | [A]EP1014482 (SIEMENS INFORMATION AND [IT]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US2002101384 (BROOKER RALPH L [US], et al) [A] 2,3 * figure 9 *; | [A]CN1428014 (LIVADIOTTI EMMANUEL [FR]) [A] 2 * figures 1,3,4,7 *; | [A]US6640110 (SHAPIRA JOSEPH [IL], et al) [A] 7 * figure 8 *; | [XY]WO2008037051 (DRAGONWAVE INC [CA], et al) [X] 1 * figure 3 * * page 21, lines 9-18 * * page 22, line 29 - page 23, line 3 * * page 22, lines 19-22 * [Y] 2,7-9; | [Y]US2011032158 (RODGER DEREK [GB], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0033]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0035] , [ 0045] , [ 0057] * * paragraphs [0046] , [ 0048] , [ 0050] , [ 0051]; figures 6,7,9-11; claims 1, 2, 6 *; | [Y]US2011063183 (SANFORD JOHN R [US]) [Y] 9 * paragraphs [0007] , [ 0008] , [ 0039] , [ 0046] , [0047]; figures 1,2,3; claims 1,6 *; | [A]WO2011078565 (KMW INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]US8047518 (GRANGE MATTHIEU [CH], et al) [A] 2 * figures 4-5 *; | [Y] - "AET: Applied Electromagnetic Technology, LLC. - Universal Spherical Dipole Source (USDS)", (20081121), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20081121234634/http://www.appliedemtech.com/usdsantennas.html, (20150907), XP055211525 [Y] 8,9 * The two figures in the document * | International search | [A]JP2003060431 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]KR20070049459 (ACE ANTENNA CORP [KR]); | [A]JP2007180819 (PAAMU KK, et al); | [A]WO2009070623 (POWERWAVE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2010201590 (GIRARD GREGORY [FR], et al) | by applicant | KR20030095761 | US6864837 |