|
25.04.2023 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
25.04.2023 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
25 |
|
25.04.2023 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
25 |
|
27.03.2023 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.03.2023 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.03.2023 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.02.2023 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.02.2023 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.02.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.02.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
7 |
|
17.02.2023 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2023 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.02.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2023 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2023 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2022 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.10.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.10.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.10.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2022 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2022 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2022 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2022 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.10.2022 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.10.2022 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
16 |
|
30.09.2022 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2022 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2022 |
Request for a change of address - opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2021 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2020 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
28.08.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.08.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.08.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.08.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.08.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.08.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.08.2020 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
22.04.2020 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2020 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
15.04.2020 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
20.02.2020 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2020 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2020 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.01.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2019 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2019 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
16.12.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2019 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.2019 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2019 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.08.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
14.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2019 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.03.2019 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.03.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.12.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2018 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
95 |
|
06.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.09.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.09.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.09.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.09.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.09.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
69 |
|
06.09.2018 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
13.08.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2018 |
Rejection of request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2018 |
Rejection of request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2018 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
56 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
45 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
66 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
96 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
94 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
50 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
56 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
70 |
|
07.06.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.04.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.04.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
67 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
67 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2015 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2015 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2015 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.02.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.05.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
83 |
|
07.05.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
02.05.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
67 |
|
23.01.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
23.01.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.01.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
21.10.2013 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.10.2013 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
21.10.2013 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
54 |
|
21.10.2013 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
10 |