EP2800811 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR RNA-DIRECTED TARGET DNA MODIFICATION AND FOR RNA-DIRECTED MODULATION OF TRANSCRIPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2023 | Change: Date of oral proceedings | 04.07.2023 | Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | For all designated states University of Vienna Universitätsring 1 1010 Vienna / AT | For all designated states Charpentier, Emmanuelle Department Of Regulation in Infection Biology Max Planck Institute for Infection Biology Charitéplatz 1 10117 Berlin / DE | [2017/18] |
Former [2014/46] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | ||
For all designated states University of Vienna Universitätsring 1 1010 Vienna / AT | |||
For all designated states Charpentier, Emmanuelle Department "Regulation in Infection Biology" Helmholtz Centre for Infection Research Inhoffenstrasse 7 38124 Braunschweig / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JINEK, Martin 1846 Spruce Street Berkeley, California 94709 / US | 02 /
DOUDNA CATE, James Harrison 164 Vicente Road Berkeley, California / US | 03 /
LIM, Wendell 149 Collins Street San Francisco, California 94118 / US | 04 /
QI, Lei 730 Kinkead Way 302 Albany, California 94706 / US | 05 /
CHARPENTIER, Emmanuelle Department "Regulation in Infection Biology" Helmholtz Centre for Infection Research Inhoffenstrasse 7 38124 Braunschweig / DE | 06 /
CHYLINSKI, Krzysztof Simmeringer Hauptstrasse 45/8 1110 Vienna / AT | 07 /
DOUDNA, Jennifer A. 164 Vicente Road Berkeley, California 94705 / US | [2017/19] |
Former [2014/46] | 01 /
JINEK, Martin 1846 Spruce Street Berkeley, California 94709 / US | ||
02 /
DOUDNA CATE, James Harrison 164 Vicente Road Berkeley, California / US | |||
03 /
LIM, Wendell 149 Collins Street San Francisco, California 94118 / US | |||
04 /
QI, Lei 730 Kinkead Way 302 Albany, California 94706 / US | |||
05 /
CHARPENTIER, Emmanuelle Department "Regulation in Infection Biology" Helmholtz Centre for Infection Research Inhoffenstrasse 7 38124 Braunschweig / DE | |||
06 /
CHYLINSKI, Krysztof Simmeringer Hauptstrasse 45/8 1110 Vienna / AT | |||
07 /
DOUDNA, Jennifer A. 164 Vicente Road Berkeley, California 94705 / US | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/19] | Green, Katherine, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2014/46] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 13793997.1 | 15.03.2013 | [2017/19] | WO2013US32589 | Priority number, date | US201261652086P | 25.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261652086 P | US201261716256P | 19.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261716256 P | US201361757640P | 28.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361757640 P | US201361765576P | 15.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361765576 P | [2014/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013176772 | Date: | 28.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2800811 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2800811 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C12N15/63, C07K19/00, C12N15/10, C12N15/90 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
A61K38/465 (EP,IL,US);
C12N15/907 (GB,IL,KR,US);
C12N15/111 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
C12N15/102 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
A01H6/4684 (IL,US);
A01K67/027 (IL,US);
A61K48/00 (IL,US);
A61P31/00 (EP,IL);
A61P31/04 (EP,IL);
A61P31/12 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
C12N15/113 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
C12N15/63 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
C12N15/70 (IL,US);
C12N15/746 (IL,US);
C12N15/90 (GB,IL,KR,US);
C12N15/902 (IL,US);
C12N5/10 (IL,KR);
C12N9/22 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
C12Q1/686 (IL,US);
C12Y301/04 (EP,GB,IL,US);
H01L21/02312 (US);
H01L21/02365 (US);
H01L33/0075 (US);
C07K2319/71 (GB,IL);
C07K2319/85 (GB,IL);
C12N2310/11 (GB,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/13 (GB,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/14 (IL,US);
C12N2310/20 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2310/31 (IL,US);
C12N2310/32 (IL,US);
C12N2310/33 (IL,US);
C12N2310/3519 (EP,GB,IL,KR,US);
C12N2310/531 (EP,GB,IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/46] | C12N15/11, C12N15/63, C07K19/00, C12N5/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] |
Former [2014/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 14.10.2014 | ME | 14.10.2014 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR RNA-GERICHTETEN ZIEL-DNA-MODIFIKATION UND ZUR RNA-GERICHTETEN TRANSKRIPTIONSMODULATION | [2014/46] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR RNA-DIRECTED TARGET DNA MODIFICATION AND FOR RNA-DIRECTED MODULATION OF TRANSCRIPTION | [2014/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS PERMETTANT LA MODIFICATION DE L'ADN CIBLE DIRIGÉE PAR L'ARN ET LA MODULATION DE LA TRANSCRIPTION DIRIGÉE PAR L'ARN | [2014/46] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/46] | 05.12.2014 | Observations by third parties | 06.01.2015 | Observations by third parties | 03.02.2015 | Observations by third parties | 05.02.2015 | Observations by third parties | 24.07.2015 | Observations by third parties | 04.09.2015 | Observations by third parties | 14.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2016 | Observations by third parties | 12.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2016 | Observations by third parties | 24.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17163434.8 / EP3241902 | EP18152360.6 / EP3401400 | EP19157590.1 / EP3597749 | EP21207127.8 / EP4043564 | EP23187511.3 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2017
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Fünf Höfe Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | 02
12.05.2017
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Griebling, Onno Sportweg 10 5037 AC Tilburg / NL Opponent's representative Griebling, Onno Octrooibureau Griebling BV Sportweg 10 5037 AC Tilburg / NL | 03
08.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE TL Brand & Co Ltd 17 Hannover Square London W1S 1BN / GB Opponent's representative Sharp, Christopher William Pinsent Masons LLP 30 Crown Place Earl Street London EC2A 4ES / GB | 04
09.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB Opponent's representative HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | 05
09.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Jones Day 901 Lakeside Avenue Cleveland, OH 44114 / US Opponent's representative Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | 06
11.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited Clonshaugh Industrial Estate Coolock Dublin 17 / IE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | 07
12.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Truscott, Glyn, John Elkington & Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London Greater London EC1N 2HA / GB Opponent's representative Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2017
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molina & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
02
12.05.2017
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Griebling, Onno Sportweg 10 5037 AC Tilburg / NL Opponent's representative Griebling, Onno Octrooibureau Griebling BV Sportweg 10 5037 AC Tilburg / NL | |||
03
08.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE TL Brand & Co Ltd 17 Hannover Square London W1S 1BN / GB Opponent's representative Sharp, Christopher William Pinsent Masons LLP 30 Crown Place Earl Street London EC2A 4ES / GB | |||
04
09.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB Opponent's representative HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | |||
05
09.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Jones Day 901 Lakeside Avenue Cleveland, OH 44114 / US Opponent's representative Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | |||
06
11.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited Clonshaugh Industrial Estate Coolock Dublin 17 / IE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | |||
07
12.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Truscott, Glyn, John Elkington & Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London Greater London EC1N 2HA / GB Opponent's representative Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | |||
Former [2020/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2017
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molina & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
02
12.05.2017
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Griebling, Onno Sportweg 10 5037 AC Tilburg / NL Opponent's representative Griebling, Onno Octrooibureau Griebling BV Sportweg 10 5037 AC Tilburg / NL | |||
03
08.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE TL Brand & Co Ltd 17 Hannover Square London W1S 1BN / GB Opponent's representative Sharp, Christopher William Pinsent Masons LLP 30 Crown Place Earl Street London EC2A 4ES / GB | |||
04
09.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE HGF 1 City Walk Leeds Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB Opponent's representative HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | |||
05
09.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Jones Day 901 Lakeside Avenue Cleveland, OH 44114 / US Opponent's representative Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | |||
06
11.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited Clonshaugh Industrial Estate Coolock Dublin 17 / IE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | |||
07
12.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Truscott, Glyn, John Elkington & Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London Greater London EC1N 2HA / GB Opponent's representative Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | |||
Former [2020/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2017
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molina & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
02
12.05.2017
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Griebling, Onno Sportweg 10 5037 AC Tilburg / NL Opponent's representative Griebling, Onno Octrooibureau Griebling BV Sportweg 10 5037 AC Tilburg / NL | |||
03
08.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE TL Brand & Co Ltd 17 Hannover Square London W1S 1BN / GB Opponent's representative Sharp, Christopher William Pinsent Masons LLP 30 Crown Place Earl Street London EC2A 4ES / GB | |||
04
09.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB Opponent's representative HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds West Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB | |||
05
09.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Jones Day 901 Lakeside Avenue Cleveland, OH 44114 / US Opponent's representative Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | |||
06
11.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited Clonshaugh Industrial Estate Coolock Dublin 17 / IE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | |||
07
12.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Truscott, Glyn, John Elkington & Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London Greater London EC1N 2HA / GB Opponent's representative Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | |||
Former [2018/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2017
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molina & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
02
12.05.2017
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Griebling, Onno Sportweg 10 5037 AC Tilburg / NL Opponent's representative Griebling, Onno Octrooibureau Griebling BV Sportweg 10 5037 AC Tilburg / NL | |||
03
08.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE TL Brand & Co Ltd 17 Hannover Square London W1S 1BN / GB Opponent's representative Sharp, Christopher William Pinsent Masons LLP 30 Crown Place Earl Street London EC2A 4ES / GB | |||
04
09.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB Opponent's representative HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds West Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB | |||
05
09.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Jones Day 901 Lakeside Avenue Cleveland, OH 44114 / US Opponent's representative Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | |||
06
11.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited Clonshaugh Industrial Estate Coolock Dublin 17 / IE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | |||
07
12.02.2018
05.03.2018
ADMISSIBLE Truscott, Glyn, John Elkington & Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London Greater London EC1N 2HA / GB Opponent's representative Elkington & Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | |||
Former [2018/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molina & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
02
12.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE Griebling, Onno Sportweg 10 5037 AC Tilburg / NL Opponent's representative Griebling, Onno Octrooibureau Griebling BV Sportweg 10 5037 AC Tilburg / NL | |||
03
08.02.2018
ADMISSIBLE TL Brand & Co Ltd 17 Hannover Square London W1S 1BN / GB Opponent's representative Sharp, Christopher William Pinsent Masons LLP 30 Crown Place Earl Street London EC2A 4ES / GB | |||
04
09.02.2018
HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB Opponent's representative HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds West Yorkshire LS11 9DX / GB | |||
05
09.02.2018
ADMISSIBLE Jones Day 901 Lakeside Avenue Cleveland, OH 44114 / US Opponent's representative Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | |||
06
11.02.2018
ADMISSIBLE Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited Clonshaugh Industrial Estate Coolock Dublin 17 / IE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | |||
07
12.02.2018
Truscott, Glyn, John Elkington & Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London Greater London EC1N 2HA / GB Opponent's representative Truscott, Glyn John Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | |||
Former [2017/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2017
Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molina & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
02
12.05.2017
Griebling, Onno Sportweg 10 5037 AC Tilburg / NL Opponent's representative Griebling, Onno Octrooibureau Griebling BV Sportweg 10 5037 AC Tilburg / NL | |||
Former [2017/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2017
Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molina & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | 16.02.2018 | No. 03: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 20.02.2018 | No. 03: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 16.03.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.10.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.05.2020 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | Appeal following opposition | 23.06.2020 | Appeal received No. T1087/20 | 16.09.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.03.2020 | Appeal received No. T1087/20 | 16.09.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.02.2020 | Appeal received No. T1087/20 | 16.09.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.07.2020 | Appeal received No. T1087/20 | 15.09.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.05.2020 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | 07.10.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SM | 10.05.2017 | [2018/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2014065596 (TOOLGEN INC [KR]) [E] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [T]WO2014089290 (SIGMA ALDRICH CO LLC [US], et al) [T] * figure 4; examples 2-4; table 4 *; | [E]WO2014093661 (BROAD INST INC [US], et al) [E] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2014093712 (BROAD INST INC [US], et al) [E] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2014099744 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [E] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [XPI] - M. JINEK ET AL, "A Programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity (Supplementary Material)", SCIENCE, US, (20120628), vol. 337, no. 6096, doi:10.1126/science.1225829, ISSN 0036-8075, page 821, XP055067747 [XP] 1,2,9,13,18 * the whole document * [I] 1-21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829 | [XPI] - L. CONG ET AL, "Multiplex Genome Engineering Using CRISPR/Cas Systems", SCIENCE, (20130215), vol. 339, no. 6121, doi:10.1126/science.1231143, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 819 - 823, XP055067741 [XP] 1-20 * the whole document * [I] 1-21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143 | [XPI] - L. CONG ET AL, "Supplementary Material to : Multiplex Genome Engineering Using CRISPR/Cas Systems", SCIENCE, (20130103), vol. 339, no. 6121, doi:10.1126/science.1231143, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 819 - 823, XP055067744 [XP] 1-20 * the whole document * [I] 1-21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143 | [XPI] - P. MALI ET AL, "RNA-Guided Human Genome Engineering via Cas9", SCIENCE, (20130103), vol. 339, no. 6121, doi:10.1126/science.1232033, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 823 - 826, XP055111247 [XP] 1-20 * the whole document * [I] 1-21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033 | [XPI] - MARTIN JINEK ET AL, "RNA-programmed genome editing in human cells", E-LIFE, SAM LTD, GB, vol. 2, doi:10.7554/ELIFE.00471, ISSN 2050-084X, (20130129), pages e00471 - 1, (20130628), XP002699851 [XP] 1-20 * the whole document * [I] 1-21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471 | [IP] - PHILIPPE HORVATH ET AL, "RNA-guided genome editing à la carte", CELL RESEARCH, (20130312), vol. 23, no. 6, doi:10.1038/cr.2013.39, ISSN 1001-0602, pages 733 - 734, XP055184973 [IP] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cr.2013.39 | International search | [A]US2010076057 (SONTHEIMER ERIK J [US], et al); | [A]US2011189776 (TERNS REBECCA [US], et al); | [X] - SASHITAL, DIPALI G. ET AL., "Mechanism of foreign DNA selection in a bacterial adaptive immune system", MOLECULAR CELL, (20120419), vol. 46, no. 5, pages 606 - 615, XP028522142 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcel.2012.03.020 | [A] - WIEDENHEFT, BLAKE ET AL., "RNA-guided genetic silencing systems in bacteria and archaea", NATURE, (20120215), vol. 482, no. 7385, pages 331 - 338, XP055116249 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature10886 | [A] - HALE, CARYN R. ET AL., "RNA-guided RNA cleavage by a CRISPR RNA-Cas protein complex", CELL, (20091125), vol. 139, no. 5, pages 945 - 956, XP055038712 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2009.07.040 | [XP] - JINEK, MARTIN ET AL., "A programmable dual-RNA-guided DNA endonuclease in adaptive bacterial immunity", SCIENCE, (20120817), vol. 337, no. 6096, pages 816 - 821, XP055067747 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829 | Examination | WO2011072246 | - R. SAPRANAUSKAS ET AL, "The Streptococcus thermophilus CRISPR/Cas system provides immunity in Escherichia coli", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, GB, (20110803), vol. 39, no. 21, doi:10.1093/nar/gkr606, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 9275 - 9282, XP055265024 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkr606 | - HÉLÈNE DEVEAU ET AL, "Phage response to CRISPR-Encoded resistance in Streptococcus thermophilus", vol. 190, no. 4, doi:10.1128/JB.01412-07, ISSN 0021-9193, (20080201), pages 1390 - 1400, JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, URL: http://jb.asm.org/content/190/4/1390, (20071207), XP002679468 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.01412-07 | - F. J. M. Mojica ET AL, "Short motif sequences determine the targets of the prokaryotic CRISPR defence system", Microbiology, (20090301), vol. 155, no. 3, doi:10.1099/mic.0.023960-0, ISSN 1350-0872, pages 733 - 740, XP055118366 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/mic.0.023960-0 | - P. Horvath ET AL, "CRISPR/Cas, the Immune System of Bacteria and Archaea", Science, (20100107), vol. 327, no. 5962, doi:10.1126/science.1179555, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 167 - 170, XP055016971 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1179555 | - MAKAROVA KIRA S ET AL, "Evolution and classification of the CRISPR-Cas systems", NATURE REVIEWS. MICROBIOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20110601), vol. 9, no. 6, ISSN 1740-1526, pages 467 - 477, XP009155547 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrmicro2577 | - Elitza Deltcheva ET AL, "CRISPR RNA maturation by trans-encoded small RNA and host factor RNase III", NATURE, United Kingdom, (20110331), vol. 471, no. 7340, doi:10.1038/nature09886, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 602 - 607, XP055308803 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09886 | other | - DELTCHEVA et al., "CRISPR RNA maturation by trans-encoded small RNA and host factor RNase III", Nature, (20110000), vol. 471, doi:doi:10.1038/nature09886, pages 602 - 607, XP055308803 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09886 | - LEENAY et al., "Identifying and visualizing functional PAM diversity across CRISPR-Cas systems", Molecular Cell, (20160000), vol. 62, pages 1 - 11 | - DELTCHEVAETAL., "CRISPR RNA maturation by trans-encodedsmall RNA and host factor RNase III", Nature, (20110000), vol. 471, pages 602 - 607 | Opposition | WO2014089290 | WO2014093661 | WO2014099744 | WO2014065596 | WO2014093712 | WO2014093655 | WO2014093635 | WO2014093622 | WO2014093701 | WO2014093709 | WO2014093595 | WO2014093718 | US2015344912 | US2016298134 | US7691995 | WO2013176772 | US4952496 | US6583336 | WO2011072246 | EP3071695 | - J INEK et al., "A Programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity", Science, (20120628), vol. 337, no. 6096, pages 816 - 821, XP055067740 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829 | - CONG et al., "Multiplex Genome Engineering Using CRISPR/Cas Systems", Science, (20130215), vol. 339, no. 6121, pages 819 - 823, XP055181426 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143 | - MALI et al., "RNA-Guided Human Genome Engineering via Cas9", Science, (20130103), vol. 339, no. 6121, pages 823 - 826, XP055111247 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033 | - JINEK et al., "RNA-programmed genome editing in human cells", eLIFE, (20130129), vol. 2, pages 1 - 9, XP055245475 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471 | - Robert Sanders, "Cheap and easy technique to snip DNA could revolutionize gene therapy", Berkeley News, (20130107), URL: http://news.berkeley.edu/2013/01/07/cheap-and-easy-technique-to-snip-dna-could-revolutionize-gene-therapy/, XP055206730 | - T KACHENKO et al., "Cellular Trajectories of Peptide-Modified Gold Particle Complexes: Comparison of Nuclear Localization Signals and Peptide Transduction Domains", Bioconjugate Chem., (20040000), vol. 15, pages 482 - 490, XP055463097 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc034189q | - URNOV et al., "Genome editing with engineered zinc finger nucleases", Nat. Rev. Gen., (20100000), vol. 11, no. 9, pages 636 - 646, XP008150557 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrg2842 | - MILLER et al., "A Tale nuclease architecture for efficient genome editing (includes Online Methods)", Nature Biotech., (20110000), vol. 29, pages 143 - 148,2pp, XP055285157 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.1755 | - CAMPEAU et al., "A Versatile Viral System for Expression and Depletion of Proteins in Mammalian Cells.", PLoS ONE, (20090331), vol. 4, no. 8, pages 1 - 18, XP055251120 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0006529 | - DELTCHEVA et al., "CRISPR RNA maturation by trans-encoded small RNA and host factor RNase III", Nature, (20110331), vol. 471, no. 7340, pages 602 - 607, XP055308803 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09886 | - KUNIN et al., "Evolutionary conservation of sequence and secondary structures in CRISPR repeats", Genome Biol., (20070418), vol. 8, no. 4, pages R61.1 - R61.7, XP021027392 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/gb-2007-8-4-r61 | - FOO et al., "Mutation of outer-shell residues modulates metal ion co-ordination strength in a metalloenzyme", Biochem. J., (20100715), vol. 429, pages 313 - 321, XP055427594 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/BJ20100233 | - BRODKIN et al., "Prediction of distal residue participation in enzyme catalysis", Protein Science, (20150128), vol. 24, pages 762 - 778, XP055427601 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pro.2648 | - JINEK, M et al., "A Programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity", Science, (20120000), vol. 337, no. 6096, pages 816 - 821, XP055067740 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829 | - DELTCHEVA, E., "CRISPR RNA maturation by trans-encoded small RNA and host factor RNase III", Nature, (20110331), vol. 471, no. 7340, pages 602 - 607, XP055308803 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09886 | - SAPRANAUSKAS, R., "The Streptococcus thermophilus CRISPR/Cas system provides immunity in Escherichia coli", Nucleic Acids Research, (20111100), vol. 39, no. 21, pages 9275 - 9282, XP055011535 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkr606 | - CONG, L., "Multiplex Genome Engineering Using CRISPR/Cas Systems", Science, (20130215), vol. 339, no. 6121, pages 819 - 823, XP055181426 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143 | - MALI, P., "RNA Guided Human Genome Engineering via Cas9", Science, (20130000), vol. 339, no. 6121, pages 823 - 826, XP055111247 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033 | - JINEK, M., "RNA-programmed genome editing in human cells", eLife, (20130129), vol. 2013, no. 2, pages e00471-1 - e00471-9, XP055245475 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471 | - HWANG W.Y., "Efficient genome editing in zebrafish using a CRISPR-Cas system", Nat Biotechnol., (20130129), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 227 - 229, XP055086625 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2501 | - DICARLO, J. E. et al., "Genome engineering in Saccharomyces cerevisiae using CRISPR-Cas systems", Nucleic Acids Research, (20130400), vol. 41, no. 7, pages 4336 - 4343, XP055086617 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkt135 | - HSU, P. S., "DNA targeting specificity of RNA-guided Cas9 nucleases", Nature Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 31, no. 9, pages 827 - 832, XP055219420 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2647 | - HSU et al., "Supplementary Information to DNA targeting specificity of RNA-guided Cas9 nuclease", Nature Biotechnology, vol. 31, no. 9, pages 1 - 26, XP002718605 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2647 | - MAKAROVA et al., "Evolution and classification of the CRISPR-Cas systems", Nature Reviews Microbiology, (20110600), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 467 - 477, XP009155547 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrmicro2577 | - GASIUNAS, G., "Cas9- crRNA ribonucleoprotein complex mediates specific DNA cleavage for adaptive immunity in bacteria", Proc. Nat. Acad. Sci., (20120925), vol. 109, no. 39, pages E2579 - E2586, XP055068588 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1208507109 | - RICHTER, C., "Function and Regulation of Clustered Regularly Interspaced Short Palindromic Repeats (CRISPR) / CRISPR Associated (Cas) Systems", Viruses, (20121019), vol. 4, no. 12, pages 2291 - 2311, XP055299758 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/v4102291 | - MEI, YUE et al., "Recent Progress in CRISPR/Cas9 Technology", Genomics, (20160118), vol. 43, no. 2, pages 63 - 72, XP029434259 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jgg.2016.01.001 | - CHO, S. W., "Targeted genome engineering in human cells with the Cas9 RNA-guided endonuclease (includes Supplementary information)", Nature Biotech, (20130000), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 230 - 232,1-11, XP002699850 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2507 | - ISHINO Y et al., "Nucleotide sequence of the iap gene , responsible for alkaline phosphatase isozyme conversion in Escherichia coli, and identification of the gene product", Journal of Bacteriology, (19871200), vol. 169, no. 12, pages 5429 - 5433, XP055463130 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/jb.169.12.5429-5433.1987 | - MOJICA, F.J. et al., "Intervening sequences of regularly spaced prokaryotic repeats derive from foreign genetic elements.", J. Mol. Evol., (20050000), vol. 60, no. 2, pages 174 - 182, XP019363173 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00239-004-0046-3 | - BOLOTIN, A. et al., "Clustered regularly interspaced short palindrome repeats (CRISPRs) have spacers of extrachromosomal origin", Microbiology, (20050800), vol. 151, pages 2551 - 2561, XP002424872 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/mic.0.28048-0 | - POURCEL, C. et al., "CRISPR elements in Yersinia pestis acquire new repeats by preferential uptake of bacteriophage DNA, and provide additional tools for evolutionary studies", Microbiology, (20050300), vol. 151, pages 653 - 663, XP002460396 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/mic.0.27437-0 | - BARRANGOU, R. et al., "CRISPR provides acquired resistance against viruses in prokaryotes", Science, (20070000), vol. 315, no. 5819, pages 1709 - 1712, XP002428071 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1138140 | - BROUNS, S. J. J. et al., "Small CRISPR RNAs Guide Antiviral Defense in Prokaryotes", Science, (20080815), vol. 321, pages 960 - 964, XP002559962 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1159689 | - MARRAFFINI, L.A. et al., "CRISPR interference limits horizontal gene transfer in Staphylococci by targeting DNA", NIH Public Access Author Manuscript, (20080000), vol. 322, pages 1 - 7, XP055463182 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1165771 | - MAKAROVA, K.S. et al., "An Updated Evolutionary Classification of CRISPR- Cas Systems", Nature, (20151100), vol. 13, pages 722 - 736, XP055271841 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrmicro3569 | - GARNEAU, J. E., "The CRISPR/Cas bacterial immune system cleaves bacteriophage and plasmid DNA", Nature, (20101104), vol. 468, no. 7320, pages 67 - 71, XP055181397 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09523 | - CARROLL, D. et al., "A CRISPR Approach to Gene Targeting", Molecular Therapy, (20120900), vol. 20, no. 9, pages 1658 - 1660, XP055106489 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2012.171 | - BARRANGOU, R., "RNA-mediated programmable DNA cleavage", Nat. Biotechnology, (20120000), vol. 30, no. 9, pages 836 - 838, XP055118675 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2357 | - NISHIMASU et al., "Crystal structure of Cas9 in complex with Guide RNA and Target DNA", Cell, (20140000), vol. 156, no. 5, pages 935 - 949, XP055423859 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2014.02.001 | - FONFARA et al., "Phylogeny of Cas9 determines functional exchangeability of dual-RNA and Cas9 among orthologous type II CRISPR-cas systems", Nucleic Acids Research, (20140201), vol. 42, no. 4, pages 2577 - 2590, XP055399937 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkt1074 | - WIEDENHAFT et al., "RNA-guided genetic silencing systems in bacteria and arachaea", Nature, (20120215), vol. 482, no. 7385, pages 331 - 338, XP055116249 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature10886 | - OTTO-WILHELM MERTEN et al., Viral Vectors for Gene Therapy Methods and Protocols, Humana Press, (20110000), ISBN 161779094X | - LEENAY et al., "Identifying and Visualizing Functional PAM Diversity across CRISPR- Cas Systems", Mol. Cell, (20160000), vol. 62, pages 1 - 11, XP029496719 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcel.2016.02.031 | - GASIUNAS et al., "Cas9-crRNA ribonucleoprotein complex mediates specific DNA cleavage for adaptive immunity in bacteria", PNAS, vol. 109, no. 39, (20120900), pages E2579 - E2586, URL: www.pnas.orq/cgi/doi/10.1073/pnas.1208507109, XP055068588 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1208507109 | - ENYEART et al., "Biotechnological applications of mobile group II introns and their reverse transcriptases: gene targeting, RNA-seq, and non-coding RNA analysis", Mob DNA, (20140000), vol. 5, no. 1, page 2, XP021175117 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1759-8753-5-2 | - MINTON, "How can biochemical reactions within cells differ from those in test tubes?", J. Cell . Sci., (20060000), vol. 119, pages 2863 - 2869, XP055464107 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/jcs.03063 | - HALL et al., "Effects of inert volume-excluding macromolecules on protein fiber formation . I. Equilibrium models", Biophys. Chem., (20020000), vol. 98, pages 93 - 104, XP055464108 | - HALL et al., "Effects of inert volume-excluding macromolecules on protein fiber formation. II. Kinetic models for nucleated fiber growth", Biophys. Chem., (20040000), vol. 107, pages 299 - 316, XP055464109 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bpc.2003.09.016 | - MARTIN, "Requirement for GroEL/GroES-Dependent Protein Folding under Nonpermissive Conditions of Macromolecular Crowdin", Biochemistry, (20020000), vol. 41, pages 5050 - 5055, XP055464111 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi015925l | - VAN DEN BERG et al., "Effects of macromolecular crowding on protein folding and aggregation", EMBO J., (19990000), vol. 18, no. 24, pages 6827 - 6933, XP055464113 | - JINEK et al., "A programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity", Science, (20120000), vol. 337, pages 816 - 821, XP055299674 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829 | - RAN et al., "In vivo gene editing using Staphylococcus aureus Cas9", Nature, (20150000), vol. 520, pages 186 - 191, XP055206733 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature14299 | - MOHR et al., "Rules for DNA target-site recognition by a lactococcal group II intron enable retargeting of the intron to specific DNA sequences", Genes & Development, (20000000), vol. 14, pages 559 - 573, XP055464117 | - GRYLLOS et al., "The CsrR/CsrS two-component system of group A Streptococcus responds to environmental Mg2+", PNAS, (20030000), vol. 100, no. 7, pages 4227 - 4232, XP055464121 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0636231100 | - NEEF et al., "Deletion of a cation transporter promotes lysis in Streptococcus pneumoniae", Infection and immunity, (20110000), vol. 79, no. 6, pages 2314 - 2323, XP055464123 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.00677-10 | - LACASSE et al., "Nuclear localization signals overlap DNA- or RNA-binding domains in nucleic acid-bindin proteins", Nucleic Acids Research, (19950000), vol. 23, no. 10, pages 1647 - 1656, XP055464125 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/23.10.1647 | - KIMCHI-SARFATY et al., "A 'Silent' Polymorphism in the MDR1 Gene Changes Substrate Specificity", Science, (20070000), vol. 315, pages 525 - 528, XP055464126 | - MAERTENS et al., "Gene optimization mechanisms: a multi- gene study reveals a high success rate of full-length human proteins expressed in Escherichia coli", Protein Sci., (20100000), vol. 19, pages 1312 - 26, XP055441307 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pro.408 | - MAURO et al., "A critical analysis of codon optimization in human therapeutics", Trends Mol Med., (20140000), vol. 20, no. 11, pages 604 - 613, XP055391316 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molmed.2014.09.003 | - AGUIRRE et al., "Genomic Copy Number Dictates a Gene -Independent Cell Response to CRISPR/Cas9 Targeting", Cancer Discovery, (20160000), vol. 6, pages 914 - 929, XP055464135 | - IHRY et al., "P53 toxicity is a hurdle to CRISPR/CAS9 screening and engineering human pluripotent stem cells", bioRxiv, (20170000), pages 1 - 51, XP055464138 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/168443 | - JIANG et al., "Successful transient expression of Cas9 and single guide RNA genes in Chlamydomonas reinhardtii", Eukaryot Cell, (20140000), vol. 13, pages 1465 - 1469, XP055435460 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/EC.00213-14 | - MASTROIANNI et al., "Group II Intron-Based Gene Targeting Reactions in Eukaryotes", PLoS One, (20080000), vol. 3, no. 9, page e 3121, XP055149290 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0003121 | - PANDIKA, Jennifer Doudna, CRISPR code killer, (20140000), URL: www.ozy.com/rising- stars/jennifer-doudna-crisr-code-killer/4690 | - GAJ et al., "ZFN, TALEN, and CRISPR/Cas-based methods for genome engineering", Trends in Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 31, no. 7, pages 397 - 405, XP028571313 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2013.04.004 | - FIECK et al., "Modifications of the E.coli Lac repressor for expression in eukaryotic cells: effects of nuclear signal sequences on protein activity and nuclear accumulation", Nucl. Acids Res., (19920000), vol. 29, no. 7, pages 1785 - 1791, XP002095852 | - CHO et al., "Targeted genome engineering in human cells with the Cas9 RNA- guided endonuclease", Nat. Biotechnol., (20130000), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 230 - 232, XP002699850 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2507 | - CONG et al., "Multiplex Genome Engineering Using CRISPR/Cas Systems", Science, (20130000), vol. 339, pages 819 - 823, XP055067741 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143 | - MALI et al., "RNA-Guided Human Genome Engineering via Cas9", Science, (20130000), vol. 339, pages 823 - 826, XP055111247 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033 | - HWANG et al., "Efficient In Vivo Genome Editing Using RNA-Guided Nucleases", Nat. Biotechnol., (20130000), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 227 - 229, XP055086625 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2501 | - JINEK et al., "RNA-programmed genome editing in human cells", eLife, (20130000), vol. 2, page e00471, XP002699851 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471 | - SANDERS, "Cheap and easy technique to snip DNA could revolutionize gene therapy", Berkeley News,, (20130107), URL: http://news.berkeley.edu/ 2013/01/07 /cheap-and-easy-technique-to-snip-dna-could- revolution ize-ene-therapy, XP055206730 | - "The CRISPR Revolution", Catalyst Magazine, (20140000), vol. 9, no. 1 | - CARROLL, "A CRISPR Approach to Gene Targeting", Molecular Therapy, (20120000), vol. 20, no. 9, pages 1658 - 60, XP055106489 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2012.171 | - BARRANGOU, "RNA-mediated programmable DNA cleavage", Nat. Biotechnol., (20120000), vol. 30, no. 9, pages 836 - 838, XP055118675 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2357 | - JINEK et al., eLife, (20130000), vol. 2, page e00471 | - DELTCHEVA et al., "CRISPR RNA maturation by trans-encoded small RNA and host factor RNase III", Nature, (20110000), vol. 471, pages 602 - 607, XP055068535 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09886 | - PADDISON et al., "Short hairpin RNAs (shRNAs) induce sequence-specific silencing in mammalian cells", Genes & Development, (20020000), vol. 16, pages 948 - 958, XP002204653 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gad.981002 | - JINEK, M. et al., "A Programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity", Science, (20120628), vol. 337, page 816, XP055299674 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829 | - MALI, P. et al., "RNA-GUIDED HUMAN GENOME ENGINEERING VIA CAS9", Science, (20130103), vol. 339, pages 823 - 826, XP055111247 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033 | - LE CONG et al., "SUPPLEMENTARY MATERIAL TO : MULTIPLEX GENOME ENGINEERING USING CRISPR/CAS SYSTEMS", Science, (20130103), vol. 339, pages 819 - 823, XP002730884 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143 | - JINEK, M. et al., "RNA-PROGRAMMED GENOME EDITING IN HUMAN CELLS", eLife 2013, (20130107), vol. 2, page e00471, XP002699851 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471 | - SANDERS, R. et al., "Cheap and easy technique to snip DNA could revolutionize gene therapy", Media Relations, (20130107), XP055206730 | - DELTCHEVA, E. et al., "CRISPR RNA maturation by trans-encoded small RNA and host factor RNase III", Nature, (20110000), vol. 471, pages 602 - 607, XP055308803 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09886 | - SAPRANAUSKAS, R. et al., "THE STREPTOCOCCUS THERMOPHILUS CRISPR/CAS SYSTEM PROVIDES IMMUNITY IN ESCHERICHIA COLI", Nucleic Acids Research, (20110000), vol. 39, no. 21, pages 9275 - 9282, XP055067807 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkr606 | - HORVATH, P. et al., "CRISPR/Cas, the Immune System of Bacteria and Archae", Science, (20100000), vol. 327, pages 167 - 170, XP055016971 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1179555 | - DEVEAU, H. et al., "Phage response to CRISPR-Encoded resistance in Streptococcus thermophilus", Journal of Bacteriology, (20080000), vol. 190, no. 4, pages 1390 - 1400, XP002679468 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.01412-07 | - MOJICA, F.J.M. et al., "Short motif sequences determine the targets of the prokaryotic CRISPR defence system", Microbiology, (20090000), vol. 155, pages 733 - 740, XP055118366 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/mic.0.023960-0 | - CHEN. B. et al., "Dynamic Imaging of Genomic Loci in Living Human Cells by an Optimized CRISPR/Cas System", Cell, (20130000), vol. 155, pages 1479 - 1491, XP055181416 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.12.001 | - RAN et al., "In vivo genome editing using Staphylococcus aureus Cas9", Nature, (20150000), vol. 520, pages 186 - 191, XP055206733 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature14299 | - MAKAROVA, K. S. et al., "Evolution and classification of the CRISPR-Cas systems", Nature Reviews Microbiology, (20110000), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 467 - 477, XP009155547 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrmicro2577 | - BARRANGOU, R. et al., "RNA-mediated programmable DNA cleavage", Nature Biotechnology, (20120910), vol. 30, pages 836 - 838, XP055118675 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2357 | - GARNEAU et al., "The CRISPR/Cas bacterial immune system cleaves bacteriophage and plasmid DNA", Nature, (20101104), vol. 468, pages 67 - 71, XP055181397 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09523 | - PADDISON et al., "Short hairpin RNAs (shRNAs) induce sequence-specific silencing in mammalian cells", Genes & Development, (20020000), vol. 16, no. 8, pages 948 - 958, XP002204653 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gad.981002 | - JINEK M et al., "A Programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity", Science, (20120628), vol. 337, no. 6096, pages 816 - 821, XP055549487 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829 | - CONG L et al., "Multiplex Genome Engineering Using CRISPR/Cas Systems", Science, (20130103), pages 819 - 823, XP055067741 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143 | - MALI P et al., "RNA-Guided Human Genome Engineering via Cas9", Science, (20130103), pages 823 - 826, XP055111247 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033 | - JINEK M et al., "RNA-programmed genome editing in human cells (includes supplementary information)", eLife, (20130129), pages 1 - 9, 3pp, XP055285239 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.00471 | - DELTCHEVA et al., "CRISPRRNA maturation by trans-encoded small RNA and host factor RNase III", Nature, (602), vol. 471, pages 602 - 607+2pp, XP055068535 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09886 | - Deltcheva et al., "Supplementary Information to CRISPR RNA maturation by trans-encoded small RNA and host factor RNase III", Nature, (20110331), vol. 471, pages 1 - 35, XP055458423 | - MOJICA et al., "Intervening Sequences of Regularly Spaced Prokaryotic Repeats Derive from Foreign Genetic Elements", J Mol Evolution, (20050000), vol. 60, pages 174 - 182, XP019363173 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00239-004-0046-3 | - POURCEL et al., "- CRISPR elements in Yersinia pestis acquire new repeats by preferential uptake of bacteriophage DNA, and provide additional tools for evolutionary studies", Microbiology, (20050000), vol. 151, pages 653 - 663, XP002460396 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/mic.0.27437-0 | - BARRANGOU et al., "CRISPR provides acquired resistance against viruses in prokaryotes", Science, (20070000), vol. 315, pages 1709 - 1712, XP002428071 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1138140 | - BROUNS et al., "Small CRISPR RNAs guide antiviral defense in prokaryotes", Science, (20080000), vol. 321, pages 960 - 964, XP002559962 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1159689 | - MARRAFFINI et al., "CRISPR Interference Limits Horizontal Gene Transfer in Staphylococci by Targeting DNA", Science, (20080000), vol. 322, no. 5909, pages 1843 - 1845, XP055613684 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1165771 | - MAKAROVA et al., "Evolution and classification of the CRISPR-Cas systems", Nature Reviews Microbiology, (20110000), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 467 - 477, XP009155547 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrmicro2577 | - SAPRANAUSKAS et al., "The Streptococcus thermophilus CRISPR/Cas system provides immunity in Escherichia coli", Nucleic Acid Research, (20110000), vol. 39, no. 21, pages 9275 - 9282, XP055265024 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkr606 | - KUNIN, V et al., "Evolutionary conservation of sequence and secondary structures in CRISPR repeats", Genome biology, (20070000), vol. 8, pages R61.1 - R61.7, XP021027392 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/gb-2007-8-4-r61 | - OLKE C. UHLENBECK, "Tetraloops and RNA folding", Nature, (19900816), vol. 346, page 613, XP055613699 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/346613a0 | - HENDRIX et al., "RNA structural motifs: building blocks of a modular biomolecule", Quarterly Reviews of Biophysics, (20050000), vol. 38, no. 3, pages 221 - 243, XP009098023 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/S0033583506004215 | - VARANI, "Exceptionally Stable Nucleic Acid Hairpins", Annu. Rev. Biophys. Biomol. Struct., (19950000), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 379 - 404, XP055613701 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.bb.24.060195.002115 | - LAMBOWITZ et al., Group I/ Introns: Mobil Ribozymes that Invade DNA, (20110000), vol. 3, no. 8, pages 1 - 19, XP055514471 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/cshperspect.a003616 | - MAKAROVA et al., "Unification of Cas protein families and a simple scenario for the origin and evolution of CRISPR-Cas systems", Biology Direct, (20110000), vol. 6, pages 1 - 27, XP055054113 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1745-6150-6-38 | - GARNEAU et al., "The CRISPR/Cas bacterial immune system cleaves bacteriophage and plasmid DNA", Nature, (20100000), vol. 468, no. 7320, doi:10.1038/nature09523, pages 67 - 71, XP055181397 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09523 | - Yu et al., "RNA interference by expression of short-interfering RNAs and hairpin RNAs in mammalian cells", PNAS, (20020000), vol. 99, no. 9, pages 6047 - 6052, XP002204654 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.092143499 | - MASTROIANNI et al., "Group II Intron-Based Gene Targeting Reactions in Eukaryotes", PLoS ONE, (20080000), vol. 3, no. 9, pages 1 - 15, XP055149290 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0003121 | - ZIMMERLY et al., "Group I/ Intron Mobility Occurs by Target DNA-Primed Reverse Transcription", Cell, (19950000), vol. 82, doi:10.1016/0092-8674(95)90027-6, pages 545 - 554, XP002911793 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(95)90027-6 | - YANG et al., "Efficient integration of an intron RNA into double-stranded DNA by reverse splicing", Nature, (19960000), vol. 381, doi:10.1038/381332a0, pages 332 - 335, XP002918949 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/381332a0 | - ROMANI et al., "Hormonal regulation of Mg2+ transport and homeostasis in eukaryotic cells", BioMetals, (20020000), vol. 15, pages 271 - 283, XP055613801 | - O'NEILL et al., "Nucleosome Arrays Inhibit Both Initiation and Elongation of Transcripts by Bacteriophage T7 RNA Polymerase", J. Mol. Biol., (19920000), vol. 223, doi:10.1016/0022-2836(92)90716-W, pages 67 - 78, XP024018312 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(92)90716-W | - WIRTZ et al., "Regulated processive transcription of chromatin by T7 RNA polymerase in Trypanosoma brucei", Nucleic Acids Res., (19980000), vol. 26, no. 20, doi:10.1093/nar/26.20.4626, pages 4626 - 4634, XP000872845 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/26.20.4626 | - MCCALL et al., "Probes of chromatin accessibility in the Drosophila bithorax complex respond differently to Polycomb-mediated repression", EMBO J., (19960201), vol. 15, no. 3, pages 569 - 580, XP055613797 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/j.1460-2075.1996.tb00389.x | - JENUWEIN et al., "The immunoglobulin µ enhancer core establishes local factor access in nuclear chromatin independent of transcriptional stimulation", Genes & Dev., (19930000), vol. 7, doi:10.1101/gad.7.10.2016, pages 2016 - 2032, XP055336949 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gad.7.10.2016 | - KOSEKI et al., "Factors governing the activity in vivo of ribozymes transcribed by RNA polymerase III", J. Virology, (19990000), vol. 73, pages 1868 - 1877, XP001027031 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.73.3.1868-1877.1999 | - LINK et al., "Engineering ligand-responsive gene -control elements: lessons learned from natural riboswitches", Gene Therapy, (20090000), vol. 16, doi:10.1038/gt.2009.81, pages 1189 - 1201, XP008148752 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/gt.2009.81 | - Sternberg et al., "Bacteriophage P1 site-specific recombination. I. Recombination between loxP sites", J. Mol. Biol., (19810000), vol. 150, pages 467 - 486, XP024013080 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(81)90375-2 | - STERNBERG et al., "Bacteriophage P1 site-specific recombination. II. Recombination between loxP and the bacterial chromosome", J. Mol. Biol., (19810000), vol. 150, pages 487 - 507, XP024013081 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(81)90376-4 | - SAUER et al., "Site-specific DNA recombination in mammalian cells by the Cre recombinase of bacteriophage P1", Proc. Nat'l Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, doi:10.1073/pnas.85.14.5166, pages 5166 - 5170, XP000615552 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.85.14.5166 | - LOONSTRA et al., "Growth inhibition and DNA damage induced by Cre recombinase in mammalian cells", Proc. Nat'l Acad. Sci. USA, (20010000), vol. 98, pages 9209 - 9214, XP055613805 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.161269798 | - HEIDMANN et al., "Reduction of Cre recombinase toxicity in proliferating Drosophila cells by estrogen-dependent activity regulation", Dev. Genes & Evolution, (20010000), vol. 211, pages 458 - 465, XP055613807 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s004270100167 | - SCHMIDT et al., "Illegitimate Cre-dependent chromosome rearrangements in transgenic mouse spermatids", Proc. Nat'l Acad. Sci. USA, (20000000), vol. 97, doi:10.1073/pnas.240471297, pages 13702 - 13707, XP002607632 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.240471297 | - COPPOOLSE et al., "Cre recombinase expression can result in phenotypic aberrations in plants", Plant Molecular Biology, (20030000), vol. 51, doi:10.1023/A:1021174726070, pages 263 - 279, XP019262394 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1021174726070 | - RAYMOND et al., "High-efficiency FLP and phiC31 site-specific recombination in mammalian cells", PLOS ONE, (20070000), vol. 2, no. 1, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0000162, pages 1 - 4, XP055069825 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0000162 | - CARROLL, "A CRISPR approach to gene targeting", Molecular Therapy, (20120000), vol. 20, no. 9, doi:10.1038/mt.2012.171, pages 1658 - 1660, XP055181397 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09523 | - REISS et al., "RecA protein stimulates homologous recombination in plants", PNAS, (19960400), vol. 93, pages 3094 - 3098, XP002113813 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.7.3094 | - ANDERS et al., "Structural basis of PAM-dependent target DNA recognition by the Cas9 endonuclease", Nature, (20140900), vol. 513, doi:10.1038/nature13579, pages 569 - 573, XP055240929 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature13579 | - CHO SW et al., "Targeted genome engineering in human cells with the Cas9 RNA-guided endonuclease (includes Supplementary information)", Nat Biotechnol., (20130300), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 230 - 232, 1-11, XP002699850 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2507 | - HWANG WY et al., "Efficient In Vivo Genome Editing Using RNA-Guided Nucleases", HHS Public Access Author Manuscript, (20130300), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 1 - 12, XP055538294 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2501 | - PANDIKA, "Rising Stars: Jennifer Doudna, CRISPR Code Killer", (20140107), OZY, URL: http://www.ozy.com/rising-stars/jennifer-doudna-crispr-code-killer/4690, XP055613817 | - SANDERS, "Cheap and easy technique to snip DNA could revolutionize gene therapy", (20130107), Berkeley News, URL: http://news.berkeley.edu/2013/01/07/cheap-and-easy-technique-to-snip-dna-could-revolutionize-gene-therapy, XP055543406 | - Jennifer Doudna, "The CRISPR Revolution", Berkeley, (20140709), pages 1 - 4, CATALYST MAGAZINE, URL: http://catalyst.berkeley.edu/slideshow/the-crisprrevolution/19/12/2014, XP003032028 | - VAN DER OOST, "New Tool for Genome Surgery", Science, (20130215), vol. 339, no. 6121, pages 768 - 770, XP055185006 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1234726 | - GOTTESMAN, "Dicing defence in bacteria", Nature, (20110331), vol. 471, pages 588 - 589, XP055613828 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/471588a | - HORVATH et al., "RNA-guided genome editing à la carte", Cell Research, (20130000), vol. 23, no. 6, pages 733 - 734, XP055184973 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cr.2013.39 | - K JOUNG, BioTechniques, (20120600), vol. 52, no. 6, page 351, XP055613839 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2144/000113870 | - DAVIES et al., "Site Specific Mutation of the Zic2 Locus by Microinjection of TALEN mRNA in Mouse CD1, C3H and C57BL/6J Oocytes", PLOS ONE, (20130000), vol. 8, pages 1 - 7, XP055159248 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0060216 | - KIM et al., "In vivo genome editing with a small Cas9 orthologue derived from Campylobacter jejuni", Nature Communications, (20170000), vol. 8, pages 1 - 12, XP055435850 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms14500 | - XU et al., "Accuracy and efficiency define Bxb1 integrase as the best of fifteen candidate serine recombinases for the integration of DNA into the human genome", BMC Biotechnology, (20130000), vol. 13, pages 1 - 17, XP021171155 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1472-6750-13-87 | - ROBERTSON HD et al., "Purification and Properties of a Specific Escherichia coli Ribonuclease which Cleaves a Tyrosine Transfer Ribonucleic Acid Precursor", J Biol Chem., (19720825), vol. 247, no. 16, pages 5243 - 5251, XP055613873 | - GUERRIER-TAKADA C. et al., "The RNA moiety of ribonuclease P is the catalytic subunit of the enzyme", Cell, (19831200), vol. 35, pages 849 - 857, XP026994532 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(83)90117-4 | - MCCLAIN WH et al., "Model substrates for an RNA enzyme", Science, (19871023), vol. 238, no. 4826, pages 527 - 530, XP055613876 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.2443980 | - FORSTER AC et al., "External Guide Sequences for an RNA Enzyme", Science, (19900817), vol. 249, no. 4970, pages 783 - 786, XP055613881 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1697102 | - LI Y. et al., "Targeted cleavage of mRNA in vitro by RNase P from Escherichia coli (external guide sequence/model substrates)", Proc Natl Acad Sci U SA., (19920415), vol. 89, no. 8, pages 3185 - 3189, XP055613884 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.8.3185 | - LIU F et al., "Inhibition of viral gene expression by the catalytic RNA subunlt o[ RNase P from Escherichia coli", Genes Dev., (19950215), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 471 - 480, XP055181397 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09523 | - PLEHN-DUJOWICH D. et al., "Effective inhibition of influenza virus production in cultured cells by external guide sequences and ribonuclease P", Proc Natl Acad Sci U S A., (19980623), vol. 95, no. 13, pages 7327 - 7332, XP002939541 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.13.7327 | - KIM K et al., "Inhibition of gene expression in human cells using RNase P-derived ribozymes and external guide sequences", Biochimica et Biophysica Acta, (20070000), vol. 1769, pages 603 - 612, XP022349461 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbaexp.2007.09.001 | - YUAN et al., "Selection of guide sequences that direct efficient cleavage of mRNA by human ribonuclease P", Science, (19940304), vol. 263, no. 5151, pages 1269 - 1273, XP002104825 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.8122108 | - KILANI AF et al., "RNase P Ribozymes Selected in Vitro to Cleave a Viral mRNA Effectively Inhibit Its Expression in Cell Culture", J Biol Chem., (20000407), vol. 275, no. 14, pages 10611 - 10622, XP055613895 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.275.14.10611 | - ZHOU T et al., "In Vitro Selection of External Guide Sequences for Directing RNase P-mediated Inhibition of Viral Gene Expression(includes supplemental data)", J Biol Chem., (20020816), vol. 277, no. 33, pages 30112 - 30120,2-3, XP055613897 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M200183200 | - COX MM., "The FLP protein of the yeast 2-eum plasmid: Expression of a eukaryotic genetic recombination system in Escherichia coli", Proc Natl Acad Sci US A., (19830700), vol. 80, no. 14, pages 4223 - 4227, XP055613907 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.80.14.4223 | - BABINEAU D. et al., "The FLP Protein of the 2-micron Plasmid of Yeast PURIFICATION OF THE PROTEIN FROM ESCHERICHIA COLI CELLS EXPRESSING THE CLONED FLP GENE", J Biol Chem., (19851005), vol. 260, no. 22, pages 12313 - 12319, XP055613910 | - O'GORMAN S. et al., "Recombinase-mediated gene activation and site-specific integration in mammalian cells", Science, (19910315), vol. 251, no. 4999, pages 1351 - 1355, XP002914719 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1900642 | - BUCHHOLZ F. et al., "Different Thermostabilities of FLP and Cre Recombinases: Implications for Applied Site-Specific Recombination", Nucleic Acids Res., (19961101), vol. 24, no. 21, pages 4256 - 62, XP001004622 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/24.21.4256 | - BUCHHOLZ et al., "Improved properties of FLP recombinase evolved by cycling mutagenesis", Nature Biotechnology, (19980000), vol. 16, no. 7, doi:10.1038/nbt0798-657, pages 657 - 662, XP000775868 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0798-657 | - RODRIGUEZ CI. et al., "High-efficiency deleter mice show that FLPe is an alternative to Cre-loxP", Nat Genet., (20000600), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 139 - 40, XP003034016 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/75973 | - LEENAY et al., "Identifying and Visualizing Functional PAM Diversity across CRISPR-Cas Systems", Molecular Cell, (20160000), vol. 62, no. 1, pages 137 - 147, XP029496719 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcel.2016.02.031 |