EP2852473 - SHAPED ABRASIVE PARTICLES AND METHODS OF FORMING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics Inc. One New Bond Street Worcester, Massachusetts 01615-0138 / US | [2015/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUER, Ralph 6913 Cumberland Court Niagara Falls, Ontario L2H 4R6 / CA | 02 /
BARNES, Martin 1178 Cain Road Youngstown, New York 14174 / US | 03 /
DEMERS, Rene G. 8184 Alpine Drive Niagra Falls, Ontario L2H 3C1 / CA | 04 /
SKOWRON, Margaret L. 557 74th Street Niagara Falls, New York 14304 / US | [2015/14] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2020/52] |
Former [2015/14] | Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13794295.9 | 23.05.2013 | [2020/52] | WO2013US42502 | Priority number, date | US201261650673P | 23.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261650673 P | [2015/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013177446 | Date: | 28.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2852473 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2852473 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B24D3/14, C09K3/14, C09C1/68, B01J2/22, B29B9/10 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
C09K3/1409 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B24D3/14 (KR);
B01J2/20 (US);
B01J2/22 (EP,US);
C04B35/10 (US);
C04B35/624 (US);
C09K3/1427 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (US);
C04B2235/6021 (US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/14] | B24D3/14, C09K3/14, C09C1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEFORMTE SCHLEIFPARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2015/14] | English: | SHAPED ABRASIVE PARTICLES AND METHODS OF FORMING SAME | [2015/14] | French: | PARTICULES ABRASIVES MISES EN FORME ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FORMATION | [2015/14] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/14] | 02.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20216595.7 / EP3834988 | EP23208044.0 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2018 | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.05.2013 | AL | 23.12.2020 | CY | 23.12.2020 | CZ | 23.12.2020 | DK | 23.12.2020 | EE | 23.12.2020 | ES | 23.12.2020 | HR | 23.12.2020 | IT | 23.12.2020 | LT | 23.12.2020 | LV | 23.12.2020 | MC | 23.12.2020 | RO | 23.12.2020 | RS | 23.12.2020 | SI | 23.12.2020 | SK | 23.12.2020 | SM | 23.12.2020 | BG | 23.03.2021 | NO | 23.03.2021 | GR | 24.03.2021 | IS | 23.04.2021 | PT | 23.04.2021 | IE | 23.05.2021 | LU | 23.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 23.05.2013 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
IE | 23.05.2021 | ||
LU | 23.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
IE | 23.05.2021 | ||
LU | 23.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
IE | 23.05.2021 | ||
LU | 23.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
IE | 23.05.2021 | ||
LU | 23.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
LU | 23.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
LU | 23.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
LU | 23.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
ES | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HR | 23.12.2020 | |
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HR | 23.12.2020 | |
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | HR | 23.12.2020 | |
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | LV | 23.12.2020 | |
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | LV | 23.12.2020 | |
RS | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | RS | 23.12.2020 | |
NO | 23.03.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009165394 (CULLER SCOTT R [US], et al) [A] 11-15* the whole document *; | [X]US2010146867 (BODEN JOHN T [US], et al) [X] 11-15 * claims 1,10 * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraphs [0074] , [0086] * * figures 3,4 *; | [XAI]WO2011139562 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [X] 11-13 * claims 1,2,3,5 * * page 6, line 16 - line 19 * * page 14, line 12 - line 17 * [A] 15 [I] 14 | International search | [A]US2005022457 (CHEN ZHENG [US], et al); | [A]US2010151195 (CULLER SCOTT R [US], et al); | [X]US2011146509 (WELYGAN DENNIS G [US], et al); | [A]WO2012018903 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al); | [A]WO2012061033 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) |