EP2959270 - SENSOR SYSTEM COMPRISING A CERAMIC HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Electronics AG Rosenheimer Strasse 141e 81671 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/47] | For all designated states TDK Electronics AG Rosenheimer Strasse 141 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2018/15] | For all designated states Epcos AG Rosenheimer Strasse 141e 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states Epcos AG St. Martin Str. 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IHLE, Jan Quellenweg 4 A-8071 Grambach / AT | 02 /
OSTRICK, Bernhard Mahlower Str. 171a 14513 Teltow / DE | 03 /
SCHREIBER-PRILLWITZ, Wolfgang Auf der Freiheit 7 58730 Fröndenberg / DE | [2016/49] |
Former [2016/01] | 01 /
IHLE, Jan Quellenweg 4 A-8071 Grambach / AT | ||
02 /
OSTRICK, Bernhard Mahlower Str. 171a 14513 Teltow / DE | |||
03 /
SCHREIBER-PRILLWITZ, Wolfgang Königsberger Str. 26 12207 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2016/01] | Application number, filing date | 13799504.9 | 20.11.2013 | [2016/01] | WO2013EP74300 | Priority number, date | DE201310101732 | 21.02.2013 Original published format: DE102013101732 | [2016/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014127861 | Date: | 28.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2959270 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01D11/24, B81B7/00, G01D11/30 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
G01D11/245 (EP,US);
H01L23/291 (US);
B81B7/0048 (EP,US);
B81C1/0023 (US);
G01D11/30 (EP,US);
H01L21/56 (US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Title | German: | SENSORSYSTEM MIT KERAMISCHEM GEHÄUSE | [2016/01] | English: | SENSOR SYSTEM COMPRISING A CERAMIC HOUSING | [2016/01] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CAPTEUR COMPORTANT UN BOÎTIER CÉRAMIQUE | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 29.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.08.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE4307600 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 2-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1520841 (SCHOTT AG [DE]) [Y] 2-15 * page 7, paragraphs 8,25 *; | [Y]WO2005042426 (INOCERMIC GES FUER INNOVATIVE [DE], et al) [Y] 2-15 * page 5, line 3 - line 7 ** page 6, line 1 - page 8, line 9 *; | [XY]EP1837303 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES SENSONOR [NO]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] , [0021] - [0027] * [Y] 2-15; | [XY]DE102008015709 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0014] - [0029] - [0 38]; figures 1-8 * [Y] 2-15; | [Y]WO2010016598 (NIKKO KK [JP], et al) [Y] 2-15 * page 7, line 12 - line 19 * * page 12, line 15 - page 13, line 17 *; | [XY]US2012112368 (GORAI YUKIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0017] - [0032]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2-15; | [Y]DE102011003481 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 2-15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0024] , [0032] , [0033] * | Examination | EP2056087 |