EP3043703 - MPI APPARATUS WITH FAST FIELD OF VIEW MOTION. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | [2016/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAHMER, Jürgen, Erwin c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
GLEICH, Bernhard c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/29] | Representative(s) | Claveau, Olivier Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/29] | Application number, filing date | 13799675.7 | 11.09.2013 | [2016/29] | WO2013IB58456 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015036814 | Date: | 19.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3043703 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/05 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
A61B5/0515 (EP,US);
G01R33/56509 (US);
G01R33/1276 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] | Title | German: | MPI-VORRICHTUNG MIT SCHNELLER SICHTFELDBEWEGUNG | [2016/29] | English: | MPI APPARATUS WITH FAST FIELD OF VIEW MOTION. | [2016/29] | French: | APPAREIL D'IMAGERIE MPI AVEC MOUVEMENT RAPIDE DU CHAMP DE VISION | [2016/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 02.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2012046157 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 5,16,17 * page 18, lines 15-21 * [A] 3,4,6-9,11,12,14; | [XAI] - RAHMER J ET AL, "Fast continuous motion of the field of view in magnetic particle imaging", MAGNETIC PARTICLE IMAGING (IWMPI), 2013 INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, (20130323), doi:10.1109/IWMPI.2013.6528353, ISBN 978-1-4673-5520-9, page 1, XP032424295 [X] 1,15,17 * the whole document * [A] 3,4,6-9,11,12,14 [I] 2,5,10,13,16,17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IWMPI.2013.6528353 | [A] - GRUETTNER M ET AL, "1D-image reconstruction for magnetic particle imaging using a hybrid system function", NUCLEAR SCIENCE SYMPOSIUM AND MEDICAL IMAGING CONFERENCE (NSS/MIC), 2011 IEEE, IEEE, (20111023), doi:10.1109/NSSMIC.2011.6152687, ISBN 978-1-4673-0118-3, pages 2545 - 2548, XP032116947 [A] 3,4,6-9,11,12,14 * page 2546 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NSSMIC.2011.6152687 | by applicant | EP1224542 | DE10151778 | WO2004091386 | WO2004091390 | WO2004091394 | WO2004091395 | WO2004091396 | WO2004091397 | WO2004091398 | WO2004091408 | WO2010067248 | WO2010067264 | - GLEICH, B.; WEIZENECKER, J., "Tomographic imaging using the nonlinear response of magnetic particles", NATURE, (2005), vol. 435, doi:doi:10.1038/nature03808, pages 1214 - 1217, XP002368326 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature03808 | - J. RAHMER ET AL., "Results on Rapid 3D Magnetic Particle Imaging with a Large Field of View", PROC. ISMRM, (2011), vol. 19, page 629 |