blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2858593

EP2858593 - INTRAOCULAR GAS INJECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.08.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.08.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.08.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.07.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.03.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcon Inc.
Rue Louis-d'Affry 6
1701 Fribourg / CH
[2020/08]
Former [2019/14]For all designated states
Alcon Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Rue Louis-d'Affry 6
Case Postale
1701 Fribourg / CH
Former [2015/16]For all designated states
Altaviz LLC
2 Park Plaza Suite 450
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
Inventor(s)01 / AULD, Jack R.
28282 El Sur
Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US
02 / HUCULAK, John C.
25551 Aria Dr.
Mission Viejo, CA 92692 / US
03 / McCOLLAM, Christopher L.
1036 Oak Glen
Irvine, CA 92618 / US
 [2015/16]
Representative(s)Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25-26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2020/40]Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
Former [2015/16]Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date13803578.712.06.2013
[2020/40]
WO2013US45515
Priority number, dateUS201261658765P12.06.2012         Original published format: US 201261658765 P
US201361799840P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361799840 P
[2015/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2013188595
Date:19.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2858593
Date:15.04.2015
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2015/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2858593
Date:30.09.2020
Language:EN
[2020/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR19.12.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2016
ClassificationIPC:A61M5/315, A61M5/31, A61F9/007
[2020/07]
CPC:
A61F9/00727 (EP,CN,US); A61F9/007 (RU,US); A61M5/3145 (EP,US);
A61M5/31553 (EP,US); A61M5/3156 (EP,US); A61M5/31596 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3128 (EP,US); A61M2202/02 (EP,US); A61M2210/0612 (EP,US);
A61M5/3158 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2015/16]A61D1/02, A61D7/00, A61F9/007
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:INTRAOKULARER GASINJEKTOR[2015/16]
English:INTRAOCULAR GAS INJECTOR[2015/16]
French:INJECTEUR DE GAZ INTRA-OCULAIRE[2015/16]
Entry into regional phase19.11.2014National basic fee paid 
19.11.2014Search fee paid 
19.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/16]
12.08.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.07.2020Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
13.07.2020Fee for grant paid
13.07.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.08.2020Information about intention to grant a patent
25.08.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP20195203.3  / EP3766455
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.09.2018
Opposition(s)01.07.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
15.06.2020Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.06.2013
AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CY30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
MK30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
IE12.06.2021
LU12.06.2021
BE30.06.2021
[2024/22]
Former [2023/30]HU12.06.2013
AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CY30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
IE12.06.2021
LU12.06.2021
BE30.06.2021
Former [2023/29]HU12.06.2013
AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
IE12.06.2021
LU12.06.2021
BE30.06.2021
Former [2022/34]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
IE12.06.2021
LU12.06.2021
BE30.06.2021
Former [2022/23]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
IE12.06.2021
LU12.06.2021
Former [2022/21]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
IE12.06.2021
LU12.06.2021
Former [2022/18]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
LU12.06.2021
Former [2022/10]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2022/08]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/49]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/37]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/28]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/25]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/24]AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/23]CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/22]CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/21]FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/20]FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
Former [2021/10]FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
Former [2021/08]FI30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
Former [2021/07]FI30.09.2020
NO30.12.2020
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5334163  (SINNETT KEVIN B [US]) [X] 1,4,9 * column 1, lines 7-13 * * page 3, line 40 - page 4, line 34 * * column 4, line 64 * * column 5, line 9 - column 9, line 64; figures 1-3; claim 2 *[I] 2,3,5-8,10-15;
 [XI]US2009118680  (GOLDBRUNNER PETER [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,9-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0020] , [0023] - [0029]; figures 1,5,6; claim 1 * [I] 2,3,5-8,14,15
International search[A]US4498904  (TURNER ROBERT C [GB], et al);
 [X]US5334163  (SINNETT KEVIN B [US]);
 [A]US2004035491  (CASTELLANO THOMAS P [US]);
 [A]US2010087776  (WARREN TIM J [US]);
 [A]US2011196232  (KIM DUCKSOO [US], et al)
ExaminationWO2011011423
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.