EP2929127 - RADIAL CLAMPING/SEALING SYSTEM AND DRILLING SYSTEM PROVIDED THEREWITH FOR (SEMI)-CONTINUOUS DRILLING A BOREHOLE, DRILLING RIG COMPRISING SUCH SYSTEM, AND METHOD THERE FOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CDS-IP B.V. Delftechpark 26 2628 XH Delft / NL | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOORDSTRAND, Alexander Michaël Kazernestraat 48G NL-2514 CV 's-Gravenhage / NL | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Verdijck, Gerardus, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2015/42] | Application number, filing date | 13808263.1 | 05.12.2013 | [2015/42] | WO2013NL50876 | Priority number, date | NL20122009935 | 05.12.2012 Original published format: NL 2009935 | [2015/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014088417 | Date: | 12.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2929127 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E21B33/08, E21B19/06, E21B19/10, E21B19/16 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
E21B19/06 (EP,US);
E21B19/10 (EP,US);
E21B19/16 (EP,US);
E21B19/24 (US);
E21B3/022 (EP,US);
E21B33/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Title | German: | RADIALES KLEMM-/DICHTUNGSSYSTEM UND BOHRSYSTEM DAMIT ZUR (HALB)KONTINUIERLICHEN BOHRUNG EINES BOHRLOCHS, BOHRGESTELL MIT SOLCH EINEM SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2015/42] | English: | RADIAL CLAMPING/SEALING SYSTEM AND DRILLING SYSTEM PROVIDED THEREWITH FOR (SEMI)-CONTINUOUS DRILLING A BOREHOLE, DRILLING RIG COMPRISING SUCH SYSTEM, AND METHOD THERE FOR | [2015/42] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SERRAGE/SCELLEMENT RADIAL ET SYSTÈME DE FORAGE LE COMPORTANT POUR LE FORAGE (SEMI)-CONTINU D'UN TROU DE FORAGE, PLATEFORME DE FORAGE COMPRENANT UN TEL SYSTÈME, ET PROCÉDÉ POUR CEUX-CI | [2015/42] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 22.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 18.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]US6315051 (AYLING LAURENCE JOHN [GB]) [XD] 1,2,5,12,13,17* column 6, line 47 - column 7, line 11; figures 1,7; claim 1 *; | [X]WO0236928 (COUPLER DEVELOPMENTS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,5,12,13,17 * page 1; figures 1-15 *; | [XI]WO2011093716 (WEST DRILLING PRODUCTS AS [NO]) [X] 1,2,5,12,13,17 * page 8, line 23 - page 13, line 2; figures 1-7 * [I] 3,4,6-11,14-16,18-21 | by applicant | US2739790 | US5178215 | WO9951852 | US6315051 | US6591916 | WO2011093716 |