EP2771468 - ENGINEERING OF SYSTEMS, METHODS AND OPTIMIZED GUIDE COMPOSITIONS FOR SEQUENCE MANIPULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2020 | Revocation of patent | published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Broad Institute, Inc. 415 Main Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | For all designated states President and Fellows of Harvard College 17 Quincy Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [2018/16] |
Former [2015/40] | For all designated states The Broad Institute, Inc. 415 Main Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | ||
For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge MA 02142 / US | |||
For all designated states President and Fellows of Harvard College 17 Quincy Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | |||
Former [2014/36] | For all designated states The Broad Institute, Inc. 7 Cambridge Center Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | ||
For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge MA 02142 / US | |||
For all designated states President and Fellows of Harvard College 17 Quincy Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Feng 100 Pacific Street Apt. 11 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
CONG, Le 100 Memorial Dr Apt 8-21B Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 03 /
HSU, Patrick 37 Kirkland St., Apt. B1 Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | 04 /
RAN, Fei 30 Clarendon Street Boston, MA 02116 / US | [2015/39] |
Former [2014/36] | 01 /
ZHANG, Feng 100 Pacific Street Apt. 11 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | ||
02 /
CONG, Le 1200 Massachusetts Ave., Apt. 33E Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | |||
03 /
HSU, Patrick 37 Kirkland St., Apt. B1 Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | |||
04 /
RAN, Fei 129 St. Botolph St., Apt. 2 Boston, MA 02115 / US | Representative(s) | De Clercq, Ann G. Y., et al De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/36] | Williams, Gareth Owen Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13818570.7 | 12.12.2013 | WO2013US74819 | Priority number, date | US201261736527P | 12.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261736527 P | US201361748427P | 02.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361748427 P | US201361758468P | 30.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361758468 P | US201361769046P | 25.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361769046 P | US201361791409P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361791409 P | US201361802174P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361802174 P | US201361806375P | 28.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361806375 P | US201361814263P | 20.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361814263 P | US201361819803P | 06.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361819803 P | US201361828130P | 28.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361828130 P | US201361835931P | 17.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361835931 P | US201361836127P | 17.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361836127 P | [2014/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014093712 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2771468 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2771468 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/63 | [2014/36] | CPC: |
C12N9/22 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61K48/00 (IL);
C12N9/16 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61K48/005 (EP,IL);
C12N15/01 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C12N15/102 (EP,IL);
C12N15/1082 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C12N15/113 (EP,IL);
C12N15/52 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C12N15/63 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C12N15/79 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C12N15/85 (IL,RU,US);
C12N15/86 (IL,RU,US);
C12N15/902 (IL,RU,US);
C12N15/907 (EP,IL,US);
C12Q1/6806 (IL,RU,US);
C12Y301/00 (EP,IL,RU,US);
G16B20/00 (EP,IL);
G16B20/20 (EP,IL);
G16B20/30 (EP,IL);
G16B20/50 (EP,IL);
G16B30/00 (EP,IL);
G16B30/10 (EP,IL);
C12N2310/10 (EP,IL);
C12N2310/20 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2320/11 (EP,IL);
C12N2320/30 (EP,IL);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON SYSTEMEN, VERFAHREN UND OPTIMIERTEN FÜHRUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR SEQUENZMANIPULATION | [2014/36] | English: | ENGINEERING OF SYSTEMS, METHODS AND OPTIMIZED GUIDE COMPOSITIONS FOR SEQUENCE MANIPULATION | [2014/36] | French: | FABRICATION DE SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS DE GUIDE OPTIMISÉES POUR LA MANIPULATION DE SÉQUENCES | [2014/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 11.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2014 | Observations by third parties | 07.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.11.2019 | Observations by third parties | Divisional application(s) | EP14170383.5 / EP2784162 | EP15154539.9 / EP2896697 | EP15154565.4 / EP2940140 | EP15154566.2 / EP2921557 | EP16194919.3 / EP3144390 | EP20158349.9 / EP3702463 | EP23193042.1 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.10.2015
29.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Schlich, George 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton Sussex BN17 5HS / GB Opponent's representative Schlich, George, et al, et al Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | 02
10.11.2015
20.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Grund, Dr., Martin Nikolaistr. 15 80802 Munich / DE Opponent's representative Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | 03
10.11.2015
23.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Regimbeau 20, Rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR Opponent's representative Bezzubova, Olga Jones Day Prinzregentenstraße 11 80538 München / DE | 04
10.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE CRISPR Therapeutics AG Baarerstrasse 14 6300 Zug / CH Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | 05
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
WITHDRAWN Storz, Dr. Ulrich Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstrasse 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | 06
11.11.2015
29.08.2019
WITHDRAWN Novozymes A/S Krogshøjvej 36 2880 Bagsværd / DK Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | 07
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited Homefield 133 Woodnesborough Road Sandwich Kent CT13 0BA / GB Opponent's representative Patent Boutique LLP 10A Printing House Yard Hackney Road London E2 7PR / GB | 08
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP 19-21 Chapel Street Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB Opponent's representative Teuten, Andrew John Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow SL7 1YL / GB | 09
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Adams, Harvey Vaughan John Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB Opponent's representative Wilding, James Roger Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.10.2015
29.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Schlich, George 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton Sussex BN17 5HS / GB Opponent's representative Schlich, George, et al, et al Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | ||
02
10.11.2015
20.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Grund, Dr., Martin Nikolaistr. 15 80802 Munich / DE Opponent's representative Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB Nikolaistrasse 15 80802 München / DE | |||
03
10.11.2015
23.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Regimbeau 20, Rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR Opponent's representative Bezzubova, Olga Jones Day Prinzregentenstraße 11 80538 München / DE | |||
04
10.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE CRISPR Therapeutics AG Baarerstrasse 14 6300 Zug / CH Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | |||
05
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
WITHDRAWN Storz, Dr. Ulrich Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstrasse 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
06
11.11.2015
29.08.2019
WITHDRAWN Novozymes A/S Krogshøjvej 36 2880 Bagsværd / DK Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | |||
07
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited Homefield 133 Woodnesborough Road Sandwich Kent CT13 0BA / GB Opponent's representative Patent Boutique LLP 10A Printing House Yard Hackney Road London E2 7PR / GB | |||
08
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP 19-21 Chapel Street Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB Opponent's representative Teuten, Andrew John Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow SL7 1YL / GB | |||
09
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Adams, Harvey Vaughan John Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB Opponent's representative Wilding, James Roger Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | |||
Former [2018/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.10.2015
29.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Schlich, George 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton Sussex BN17 5HS / GB Opponent's representative Schlich, George, et al, et al Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | ||
02
10.11.2015
20.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Grund, Dr., Martin Nikolaistr. 15 80802 Munich / DE Opponent's representative Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB Nikolaistrasse 15 80802 München / DE | |||
03
10.11.2015
23.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Regimbeau 20, Rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR Opponent's representative Bezzubova, Olga Jones Day Prinzregentenstraße 11 80538 München / DE | |||
04
10.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE CRISPR Therapeutics AG Baarerstrasse 14 6300 Zug / CH Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | |||
05
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
WITHDRAWN Storz, Dr. Ulrich Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstrasse 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
06
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Novozymes A/S Krogshøjvej 36 2880 Bagsværd / DK Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | |||
07
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited Homefield 133 Woodnesborough Road Sandwich Kent CT13 0BA / GB Opponent's representative Patent Boutique LLP 10A Printing House Yard Hackney Road London E2 7PR / GB | |||
08
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP 19-21 Chapel Street Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB Opponent's representative Teuten, Andrew John Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | |||
09
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Adams, Harvey Vaughan John Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB Opponent's representative Wilding, James Roger Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | |||
Former [2018/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.10.2015
29.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Schlich, George 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton Sussex BN17 5HS / GB Opponent's representative Schlich, George, et al, et al Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | ||
02
10.11.2015
20.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Grund, Dr., Martin Nikolaistr. 15 80802 Munich / DE Opponent's representative Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | |||
03
10.11.2015
23.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Regimbeau 20, Rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR Opponent's representative Bezzubova, Olga Jones Day Prinzregentenstraße 11 80538 München / DE | |||
04
10.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE CRISPR Therapeutics AG Baarerstrasse 14 6300 Zug / CH Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | |||
05
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
WITHDRAWN Storz, Dr. Ulrich Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstrasse 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
06
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Novozymes A/S Krogshøjvej 36 2880 Bagsværd / DK Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | |||
07
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited Homefield 133 Woodnesborough Road Sandwich Kent CT13 0BA / GB Opponent's representative Patent Boutique LLP 10A Printing House Yard Hackney Road London E2 7PR / GB | |||
08
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP 19-21 Chapel Street Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB Opponent's representative Teuten, Andrew John Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | |||
09
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Adams, Harvey Vaughan John Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB Opponent's representative Wilding, James Roger Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | |||
Former [2018/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.10.2015
29.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Schlich, George 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton Sussex BN17 5HS / GB Opponent's representative Schlich, George, et al, et al Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | ||
02
10.11.2015
20.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Grund, Dr., Martin Nikolaistr. 15 80802 Munich / DE Opponent's representative Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | |||
03
10.11.2015
23.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Regimbeau 20, Rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR Opponent's representative Bezzubova, Olga Jones Day Prinzregentenstraße 11 80538 München / DE | |||
04
10.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE CRISPR Therapeutics AG Baarerstrasse 14 6300 Zug / CH Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | |||
05
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Storz, Dr. Ulrich Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstrasse 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
06
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Novozymes A/S Krogshøjvej 36 2880 Bagsværd / DK Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | |||
07
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited Homefield 133 Woodnesborough Road Sandwich Kent CT13 0BA / GB Opponent's representative Patent Boutique LLP 10A Printing House Yard Hackney Road London E2 7PR / GB | |||
08
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP 19-21 Chapel Street Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB Opponent's representative Teuten, Andrew John Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | |||
09
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Adams, Harvey Vaughan John Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB Opponent's representative Wilding, James Roger Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | |||
Former [2017/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.10.2015
29.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Schlich, George 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton Sussex BN17 5HS / GB Opponent's representative Schlich, George, et al, et al Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | ||
02
10.11.2015
20.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Grund, Dr., Martin Nikolaistr. 15 80802 Munich / DE Opponent's representative Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | |||
03
10.11.2015
23.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Regimbeau 20, Rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR Opponent's representative Bezzubova, Olga Jones Day Prinzregentenstraße 11 80538 München / DE | |||
04
10.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE CRISPR Therapeutics AG Aeschenvorstadt 36 4051 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | |||
05
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Storz, Dr. Ulrich Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstrasse 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
06
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Novozymes A/S Krogshøjvej 36 2880 Bagsværd / DK Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | |||
07
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited Homefield 133 Woodnesborough Road Sandwich Kent CT13 0BA / GB Opponent's representative Patent Boutique LLP Aldgate Tower 2 Leman Street London E1 8FA / GB | |||
08
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP 19-21 Chapel Street Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB Opponent's representative Teuten, Andrew John Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | |||
09
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Adams, Harvey Vaughan John Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB Opponent's representative Wilding, James Roger Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | |||
Former [2017/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.10.2015
29.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Schlich, George 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton Sussex BN17 5HS / GB Opponent's representative Schlich, George, et al, et al Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | ||
02
10.11.2015
20.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Grund, Dr., Martin Nikolaistr. 15 80802 Munich / DE Opponent's representative Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | |||
03
10.11.2015
23.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Regimbeau 20, Rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR Opponent's representative Bezzubova, Olga Jones Day Prinzregentenstraße 11 80538 München / DE | |||
04
10.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE CRISPR Therapeutics AG Aeschenvorstadt 36 4051 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | |||
05
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Storz, Dr. Ulrich Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstrasse 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
06
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Novozymes A/S Krogshøjvej 36 2880 Bagsværd / DK Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | |||
07
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited Homefield 133 Woodnesborough Road Sandwich Kent CT13 0BA / GB Opponent's representative Boxall, Sarah Jane Boxall IPM Ltd 9 King Street Sandwich Kent CT13 9BT / GB | |||
08
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP 19-21 Chapel Street Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB Opponent's representative Teuten, Andrew John Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | |||
09
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Adams, Harvey Vaughan John Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB Opponent's representative Wilding, James Roger Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | |||
Former [2016/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.10.2015
29.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Schlich, George 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton Sussex BN17 5HS / GB Opponent's representative Schlich, George, et al, et al Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | ||
02
10.11.2015
20.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Grund, Dr., Martin Nikolaistr. 15 80802 Munich / DE Opponent's representative Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | |||
03
10.11.2015
23.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Regimbeau 20, Rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR Opponent's representative Bezzubova, Olga Jones Day Prinzregentenstraße 11 80538 München / DE | |||
04
10.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE CRISPR Therapeutics AG Aeschenvorstadt 36 4051 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | |||
05
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Storz, Dr. Ulrich Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstrasse 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
06
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Novozymes A/S Krogshøjvej 36 2880 Bagsværd / DK Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | |||
07
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited Homefield 133 Woodnesborough Road Sandwich Kent CT13 0BA / GB Opponent's representative Boxall, Sarah Jane Boxall IPM Ltd 9 King Street Sandwich Kent CT13 9BT / GB | |||
08
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP 19-21 Chapel Street Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB Opponent's representative Teuten, Andrew John Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | |||
09
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Adams, Harvey Vaughan John Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB Opponent's representative Wilding, James Roger Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | |||
Former [2016/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.10.2015
29.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Schlich, George 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton Sussex BN17 5HS / GB Opponent's representative Schlich, George, et al, et al Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | ||
02
10.11.2015
20.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Grund, Dr., Martin Nikolaistr. 15 80802 Munich / DE Opponent's representative Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | |||
03
10.11.2015
23.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Regimbeau 20, Rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR Opponent's representative HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | |||
04
10.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE CRISPR Therapeutics AG Aeschenvorstadt 36 4051 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | |||
05
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Storz, Dr. Ulrich Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstrasse 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
06
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Novozymes A/S Krogshøjvej 36 2880 Bagsværd / DK Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | |||
07
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited Homefield 133 Woodnesborough Road Sandwich Kent CT13 0BA / GB Opponent's representative Boxall, Sarah Jane Boxall IPM Ltd 9 King Street Sandwich Kent CT13 9BT / GB | |||
08
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP 19-21 Chapel Street Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB Opponent's representative Teuten, Andrew John Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | |||
09
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Adams, Harvey Vaughan John Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB Opponent's representative Wilding, James Roger Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | |||
Former [2016/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.10.2015
29.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Schlich, George 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton Sussex BN17 5HS / GB Opponent's representative Schlich, George, et al, et al Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | ||
02
10.11.2015
20.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Grund, Dr., Martin Nikolaistr. 15 80802 Munich / DE Opponent's representative Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | |||
03
10.11.2015
23.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Regimbeau 20, Rue de Chazalles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR Opponent's representative Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | |||
04
10.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE CRISPR Therapeutics AG Aeschenvorstadt 36 4051 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | |||
05
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Storz, Dr. Ulrich Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstrasse 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
06
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Novozymes A/S Krogshøjvej 36 2880 Bagsværd / DK Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | |||
07
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Boxall Intellectual Property Management Limited Homefield 133 Woodnesborough Road Sandwich Kent CT13 0BA / GB Opponent's representative Boxall, Sarah Jane Boxall IPM Ltd 9 King Street Sandwich Kent CT13 9BT / GB | |||
08
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Sagittarius Intellectual Property LLP 19-21 Chapel Street Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 3HN / GB Opponent's representative Teuten, Andrew John Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | |||
09
11.11.2015
24.11.2015
ADMISSIBLE Adams, Harvey Vaughan John Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB Opponent's representative Wilding, James Roger Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | |||
Former [2015/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.10.2015
29.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Schlich, George 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton Sussex BN17 5HS / GB Opponent's representative Schlich, George, et al, et al Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | ||
02
10.11.2015
Grund, Dr., Martin Nikolaistr. 15 80802 Munich / DE Opponent's representative Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | |||
Former [2015/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.10.2015
29.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Schlich, George 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton Sussex BN17 5HS / GB Opponent's representative Schlich, George, et al, et al Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | 22.12.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.06.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.01.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.03.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 16.01.2020 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/53] | Appeal following opposition | 28.03.2018 | Appeal received No. T0844/18 | 01.08.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.07.2019 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M03) [2019/31] | 05.11.2019 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2019/45] | 16.01.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 13.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.01.2020 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.12.2013 | AL | 11.02.2015 | BG | 11.02.2015 | CY | 11.02.2015 | HR | 11.02.2015 | LT | 11.02.2015 | LV | 11.02.2015 | MC | 11.02.2015 | MK | 11.02.2015 | MT | 11.02.2015 | RO | 11.02.2015 | RS | 11.02.2015 | SI | 11.02.2015 | SM | 11.02.2015 | GR | 12.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 12.12.2013 | |
BG | 11.02.2015 | ||
CY | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
MK | 11.02.2015 | ||
MT | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
SM | 11.02.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 12.12.2013 | |
BG | 11.02.2015 | ||
CY | 11.02.2015 | ||
HR | 11.02.2015 | ||
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
MT | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HR | 11.02.2015 | |
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
MC | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | HR | 11.02.2015 | |
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
SI | 11.02.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | HR | 11.02.2015 | |
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
RO | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | HR | 11.02.2015 | |
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
LV | 11.02.2015 | ||
RS | 11.02.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | HR | 11.02.2015 | |
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
GR | 12.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | HR | 11.02.2015 | |
LT | 11.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 11.02.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XPA] - L. CONG ET AL, "Multiplex Genome Engineering Using CRISPR/Cas Systems", SCIENCE, (20130215), vol. 339, no. 6121, doi:10.1126/science.1231143, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 819 - 823, XP055102030 [XP] 1-16,20-22,37-46,48-53 * abstract * * page 820, column l * [A] 17-19,23-36,47 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143 | [P] - L. CONG ET AL, "Supplementary Material to : Multiplex Genome Engineering Using CRISPR/Cas Systems", SCIENCE, (20130103), vol. 339, no. 6121, doi:10.1126/science.1231143, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 819 - 823, XP055067744 [P] * figures S1, S8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143 | [XI] - M. JINEK ET AL, "A Programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity", SCIENCE, (20120817), vol. 337, no. 6096, doi:10.1126/science.1225829, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 816 - 821, XP055067740 [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-16,20-22,36-46,49,51-53 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829 | [ ] - M. JINEK ET AL, "A Programmable Dual-RNA-Guided DNA Endonuclease in Adaptive Bacterial Immunity (Supplementary Material)", SCIENCE, (20120628), vol. 337, no. 6096, doi:10.1126/science.1225829, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 816 - 821, XP055067747 [ ] * figures S7, S8, S11; table S1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829 | [A] - G. GASIUNAS ET AL, "PNAS Plus: Cas9-crRNA ribonucleoprotein complex mediates specific DNA cleavage for adaptive immunity in bacteria", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20120925), vol. 109, no. 39, doi:10.1073/pnas.1208507109, ISSN 0027-8424, pages E2579 - E2586, XP055068588 [A] 1-53 * abstract * * page E2579 * * page E2583 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1208507109 | [AP] - JIANG WENYAN ET AL, "RNA-guided editing of bacterial genomes using CRISPR-Cas systems", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY,, (20130129), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 233 - 239, XP002699849 [AP] 1-53 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2508 | [A] - BLAKE WIEDENHEFT ET AL, "RNA-guided genetic silencing systems in bacteria and archaea", NATURE, (20120215), vol. 482, no. 7385, doi:10.1038/nature10886, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 331 - 338, XP055116249 [A] 1-53 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature10886 | [A] - ELITZA DELTCHEVA ET AL, "CRISPR RNA maturation by trans-encoded small RNA and host factor RNase III", NATURE, (20110331), vol. 471, no. 7340, doi:10.1038/nature09886, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 602 - 607, XP055068535 [A] 1-53 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09886 | [A] - MICHAEL P TERNS ET AL, "CRISPR-based adaptive immune systems", CURRENT OPINION IN MICROBIOLOGY, (20110601), vol. 14, no. 3, doi:10.1016/j.mib.2011.03.005, ISSN 1369-5274, pages 321 - 327, XP055097823 [A] 1-53 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mib.2011.03.005 | [IP] - GAJ THOMAS ET AL, "ZFN, TALEN, and CRISPR/Cas-based methods for genome engineering", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20130701), vol. 31, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.TIBTECH.2013.04.004, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 397 - 405, XP028571313 [IP] 1-53 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2013.04.004 | [IP] - WANG HAOYI ET AL, "One-Step Generation of Mice Carrying Mutations in Multiple Genes by CRISPR/Cas-Mediated Genome Engineering", CELL, (20130509), vol. 153, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.CELL.2013.04.025, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 910 - 918, XP028538358 [IP] 1-53 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.04.025 | [IP] - LUKE A. GILBERT ET AL, "CRISPR-Mediated Modular RNA-Guided Regulation of Transcription in Eukaryotes", CELL, (20130701), vol. 154, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.cell.2013.06.044, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 442 - 451, XP055115843 [IP] 1-53 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2013.06.044 | [IP] - KRZYSZTOF CHYLINSKI ET AL, "The tracrRNA and Cas9 families of type II CRISPR-Cas immunity systems", RNA BIOLOGY, (20130501), vol. 10, no. 5, doi:10.4161/rna.24321, ISSN 1547-6286, pages 726 - 737, XP055116068 [IP] 1-53 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/rna.24321 | by applicant | US4186183 | US4217344 | US4235871 | US4261975 | US4485054 | US4501728 | EP0264166 | US4774085 | US4797368 | US4837028 | US4873316 | US4897355 | US4946787 | US5049386 | WO9116024 | WO9117424 | US5173414 | WO9324641 | US2003087817 | US6603061 | US2009100536 | US7868149 | US2011059502 | - GOEDDEL, GENE EXPRESSION TECHNOLOGY: METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1990), vol. 185 | - BOSHART ET AL., CELL, (1985), vol. 41, pages 521 - 530 | - MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1988), vol. 8, no. L, pages 466 - 472 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1981), vol. 78, no. 3, pages 1527 - 31 | - SMITH; JOHNSON, GENE, (1988), vol. 67, pages 31 - 40 | - AMRANN ET AL., GENE, (1988), vol. 69, pages 301 - 315 | - STUDIER ET AL., GENE EXPRESSION TECHNOLOGY: METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1990), vol. 185, pages 60 - 89 | - BALDARI ET AL., EMBO J., (1987), vol. 6, pages 229 - 234 | - KUIJAN; HERSKOWITZ, CELL, (1982), vol. 30, pages 933 - 943 | - SCHULTZ ET AL., GENE, (1987), vol. 54, pages 113 - 123 | - SMITH ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1983), vol. 3, pages 2156 - 2165 | - LUCKLOW; SUMMERS, VIROLOGY, (1989), vol. 170, pages 31 - 39 | - SEED, NATURE, (1987), vol. 329, page 840 | - KAUFMAN ET AL., EMBO J., (1987), vol. 6, pages 187 - 195 | - PINKERT ET AL., GENES DEV., (1987), vol. 1, pages 268 - 277 | - CALAME; EATON, ADV. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 43, pages 235 - 275 | - WINOTO; BALTIMORE, EMBO J., (1989), vol. 8, pages 729 - 733 | - BANEIJI ET AL., CELL, (1983), vol. 33, pages 729 - 740 | - QUEEN; BALTIMORE, CELL, (1983), vol. 33, pages 741 - 748 | - BYRNE; RUDDLE, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 5473 - 5477 | - EDLUND ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 230, pages 912 - 916 | - KESSEL; GRUSS, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 374 - 379 | - CAMPES; TILGHMAN, GENES DEV., (1989), vol. 3, pages 537 - 546 | - ISHINO ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1987), vol. 169, pages 5429 - 5433 | - NAKATA ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1989), vol. 171, pages 3553 - 3556 | - GROENEN ET AL., MOL. MICROBIOL., (1993), vol. 10, pages 1057 - 1065 | - HOE ET AL., EMERG. INFECT. DIS., (1999), vol. 5, pages 254 - 263 | - MASEPOHL ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1996), vol. 1307, pages 26 - 30 | - MOJICA ET AL., MOL. MICROBIOL., (1995), vol. 17, pages 85 - 93 | - JANSSEN ET AL., OMICS J. INTEG. BIOL., (2002), vol. 6, pages 23 - 33 | - MOJICA ET AL., MOL. MICROBIOL., (2000), vol. 36, pages 244 - 246 | - VAN EMBDEN ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (2000), vol. 182, pages 2393 - 2401 | - JANSEN ET AL., MOL. MICROBIOL., (2002), vol. 43, pages 1565 - 1575 | - NAKAMURA, Y. ET AL., "Codon usage tabulated from the international DNA sequence databases: status for the year 2000", NUCL. ACIDS RES., (2000), vol. 28, doi:doi:10.1093/nar/28.1.292, page 292, XP002941557 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/28.1.292 | - ZUKER; STIEGLER, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1981), vol. 9, pages 133 - 148 | - A.R. GRUBER ET AL., CELL, (2008), vol. 106, no. 1, pages 23 - 24 | - PA CARR; GM CHURCH, NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2009), vol. 27, no. 12, pages 1151 - 62 | - ANDERSON, SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 256, pages 808 - 813 | - NABEL; FELGNER, TIBTECH, (1993), vol. 11, pages 211 - 217 | - MITANI; CASKEY, TIBTECH, (1993), vol. 11, pages 162 - 166 | - DILLON, TIBTECH, (1993), vol. 11, pages 167 - 175 | - MILLER, NATURE, (1992), vol. 357, pages 455 - 460 | - VAN BRUNT, BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, no. 10, pages 1 149 - 1154 | - VIGNE, RESTORATIVE NEUROLOGY AND NEUROSCIENCE, (1995), vol. 8, pages 35 - 36 | - KREMER; PERRICAUDET, BRITISH MEDICAL BULLETIN, (1995), vol. 51, no. 1, pages 31 - 44 | - YU ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 1, pages 13 - 26 | - CRYSTAL, SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 270, pages 404 - 410 | - BLAESE, CANCER GENE THER, (1995), vol. 2, pages 291 - 297 | - BEHR ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1994), vol. 5, pages 382 - 389 | - REMY ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1994), vol. 5, pages 647 - 654 | - GAO ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1995), vol. 2, pages 710 - 722 | - AHMAD ET AL., CANCER RES., (1992), vol. 52, pages 4817 - 4820 | - BUCHSCHER ET AL., J. VIROL., (1992), vol. 66, pages 2731 - 2739 | - JOHANN ET AL., J. VIROL., (1992), vol. 66, pages 1635 - 1640 | - SOMMNERFELT ET AL., VIROL, (1990), vol. 176, pages 58 - 59 | - WILSON ET AL., J. VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 2374 - 2378 | - MILLER ET AL., J. VIROL., (1991), vol. 65, pages 2220 - 2224 | - WEST ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1987), vol. 160, pages 38 - 47 | - KOTIN, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 5, pages 793 - 801 | - MUZYCZKA, J. CLIN. INVEST., (1994), vol. 94, page 1351 | - TRATSCHIN ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL, (1985), vol. 5, pages 3251 - 3260 | - TRATSCHIN ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1984), vol. 4, pages 2072 - 2081 | - HERMONAT; MUZYCZKA, PNAS, (1984), vol. 81, pages 6466 - 6470 | - SAMULSKI ET AL., J. VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 03822 - 3828 | - MORRELL ET AL., "Crop genomics:advances and applications", NAT REV GENET, (20111229), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 85 - 96 | - MCLVOR EL; POLAK U; NAPIERALA M., "New insights into repeat instability: role of RNA?DNA hybrids", RNA BIOL., (201009), vol. 7, no. 5, pages 551 - 8 | - TANGRI S ET AL., "Rationally engineered therapeutic proteins with reduced immunogenicity", J IMMUNOL., (20050315), vol. 174, no. 6, pages 3187 - 96 | - GRUBER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2008), vol. 36, page W70 | - SAPRANAUSAKS, CUCLEIC ACIS RESEARCH, (2011), vol. 39, page 9275 | - GASIUNAS, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2012), vol. 109, page E2579 | - JINEK ET AL., SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 337, page 816 | - MAKAROVA ET AL., NAT REV MICROBIOL, (2011), vol. 9, page 467 | - URNOV, F.D.; REBAR, E.J.; HOLMES, M.C.; ZHANG, H.S.; GREGORY, P.D., "Genome editing with engineered zinc finger nucleases", NAT. REV. GENET, (2010), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1038/nrg2842, pages 636 - 646, XP008150557 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrg2842 | - BOGDANOVE, A.J.; VOYTAS, D.F. TAL EFFECTORS: CUSTOMIZABLE PROTEINS FOR DNA TARGETING, SCIENCE, (2011), vol. 333, pages 1843 - 1846 | - STODDARD, B.L., "Homing endonuclease structure and function.", Q. REV. BIOPHYS, (2005), vol. 38, doi:doi:10.1017/S0033583505004063, pages 49 - 95, XP008065807 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/S0033583505004063 | - BAE, T.; SCHNEEWIND, O., "Allelic replacement in Staphylococcus aureus with inducible counter-selection.", PLASMID, (2006), vol. 55, doi:doi:10.1016/j.plasmid.2005.05.005, pages 58 - 63, XP024939950 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.plasmid.2005.05.005 | - SUNG, C.K.; LI, H.; CLAVERYS, J.P.; MONISON, D.A., "An rpsL cassette, janus, for gene replacement through negative selection in Streptococcus pneumoniae", APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (2001), vol. 67, pages 5190 - 5196 | - SHARAN, S.K.; THOMASON, L.C.; KUZNETSOV, S.G.; COURT, D.L., "Recombineering: a homologous recombination-based method of genetic engineering", NAT. PROTOC., (2009), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1038/nprot.2008.227, pages 206 - 223, XP001525689 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nprot.2008.227 | - JINEK, M. ET AL., "A programmable dual-RNA-guided DNA endonuclease in adaptive bacterial immunity.", SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 337, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1225829, pages 816 - 821, XP055229606 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829 | - DEVEAU. H.; GARNEAU, J.E.; MOINEAU, S., "CRISPR-Cas system and its role in phage- bacteria interactions", ANNU. REV. MICROBIOL, (2010), vol. 64, doi:doi:10.1146/annurev.micro.112408.134123, pages 475 - 493, XP055067789 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.micro.112408.134123 | - HORVATH, P.; BARRANGOU, R., "CRISPR-Cas, the immune system of bacteria and archaea", SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 327, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1179555, pages 167 - 170, XP055016971 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1179555 | - TERNS, M.P.; TERNS, R.M., "CRISPR-based adaptive immune systems.", CURR. OPIN. MICROBIOL., (2011), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1016/j.mib.2011.03.005, pages 321 - 327, XP055097823 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mib.2011.03.005 | - VAN DER OOST, J.; JORE, M.M.; WESTRA, E.R.; LUNDGREN, M.; BROUNS, S.J., "CRISPR-based adaptive and heritable immunity in prokaryotes", TRENDS. BIOCHEM. SCI, (2009), vol. 34, doi:doi:10.1016/j.tibs.2009.05.002, pages 401 - 407, XP002559963 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibs.2009.05.002 | - BROUNS, S.J. ET AL., "Small C'RISPR RNAs guide antiviral defense in prokaryotes", SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 321, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1159689, pages 960 - 964, XP002559962 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1159689 | - CARTE, J.; WANG, R.; LI, H.; TERNS, R.M.; TERNS, M.P., "Cas6 is an endoribonuclease that generates guide RNAs for invader defense in prokaryotes", GENES DEV., (2008), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1101/gad.1742908, pages 3489 - 3496, XP055054069 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gad.1742908 | - DELTCHEVA, E. ET AL., "CRISPR RNA maturation by trans-encoded small RNA and host factor RNase III.", NATURE, (2011), vol. 471, doi:doi:10.1038/nature09886, pages 602 - 607, XP055068535 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09886 | - HATOUM-ASLAN, A.; MANIV, I.; MARRAFFINI, L.A., "Mature clustered, regularly interspaced, short palindromic repeats RNA (crRNA) length is measured by a ruler mechanism anchored at the precursor processing site", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2011), vol. 108, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.1112832108, pages 21218 - 21222, XP055250498 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1112832108 | - HAURWITZ, R.E.; JINEK, M.; WIEDENHEFT, B.; ZHOU, K.; DOUDNA, J.A., "Sequence- and structure-specific RNA processing by a CRISPR endonuclease", SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 329, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1192272, pages 1355 - 1358, XP055244668 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1192272 | - DEVEAU, H. ET AL., "Phage response to CRISPR-encoded resistance in Streptococcus thermophilus", J. BACTERIOL, (2008), vol. 190, doi:doi:10.1128/JB.01412-07, pages 1390 - 1400, XP002679468 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.01412-07 | - MAKAROVA, K.S.; ARAVIND, L.; WOLF, Y.I.; KOONIN, E.V., "Unification of Cas protein families and a simple scenario for the origin and evolution of CRISPR-Cas systems", BIOL. DIRECT., (2011), vol. 6, page 38 | - BARRANGOU, R., "RNA-mediated programmable DNA cleavage", NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2012), vol. 30, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt.2357, pages 836 - 838, XP055118675 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2357 | - BROUNS, S.J., "MoLecular biology. A Swiss army knife of immunity", SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 337, pages 808 - 809 | - CARROLL, D., "A CRISPR Approach to Gene Targeting", MOL. THER., (2012), vol. 20, doi:doi:10.1038/mt.2012.171, pages 1658 - 1660, XP055106489 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2012.171 | - BIKARD, D.; HATOUM-ASLAN, A.; MUCIDA, D.; MARRAFFINI, L.A., "CRISPR interference can prevent natural transformation and virulence acquisition during in vivo bacterial infection", CELL HOST MICROBE, (2012), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1016/j.chom.2012.06.003, pages 177 - 186, XP028934538 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chom.2012.06.003 | - ZAHNER, D.; HAKENBECK, R., "The Streptococcus pneumoniae beta-galactosidase is a surface protein.", J. BACTERIOL., (2000), vol. 182, doi:doi:10.1128/JB.182.20.5919-5921.2000, pages 5919 - 5921, XP002529681 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.182.20.5919-5921.2000 | - MARRAFFINI, L.A.; DEDENT, A.C.; SCHNEEWIND, O., "Sortases and the art of anchoring proteins to the envelopes of gram-positive bacteria.", MICROBIOL. MOL. BIOL. REV., (2006), vol. 70, doi:doi:10.1128/MMBR.70.1.192-221.2006, pages 192 - 221, XP002459580 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MMBR.70.1.192-221.2006 | - MOTAMEDI, M.R.; SZIGETY, S.K.; ROSENBERG, S.M., "Double-strand-break repair recombination in Escherichia coli: physical evidence for a DNA replication mechanism in vivo", GENES DEV., (1999), vol. 13, pages 2889 - 2903 | - HOSAKA, T. ET AL., "The novel mutation K87E in ribosomal protein S12 enhances protein synthesis activity during the late growth phase in Escherichia coli.", MOL. GENET. GENOMICS, (2004), vol. 271, pages 317 - 324 | - COSTANTINO, N.; COURT, D.L., "Enhanced levels of lambda Red-mediated recombinants in mismatch repair mutants", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2003), vol. 100, pages 15748 - 15753 | - EDGAR, R.; QIMRON, U., "The Escherichia coli CRISPR system protects from lambda lysogenization, lysogens, and prophage induction", J. BACTERIOL., (2010), vol. 192, pages 6291 - 6294 | - MARRAFFINI, L.A.; SONTHEIMER, E.J., "Self versus non-self discrimination during CRISPR RNA-directed immunity", NATURE, (2010), vol. 463, doi:doi:10.1038/nature08703, pages 568 - 571, XP055118462 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature08703 | - FISCHER, S. ET AL., "An archaeal immune system can detect multiple Protospacer Adjacent Motifs (PAMs) to target invader DNA..I.", BIOL. CHEM., (2012), vol. 287, pages 33351 - 33363 | - GUDBERGSDOTTIR, S. ET AL., "Dynamic properties of the Sulfolobus CRISPR-Cas and CRISPR/Cmr systems when challenged with vector-borne viral and plasmid genes and protospacers.", MOL. MICROBIOL., (2011), vol. 79, pages 35 - 49 | - WANG, H.H. ET AL., "Genome-scale promoter engineering by coselection MAGE", NAT METHODS, (2012), vol. 9, pages 591 - 593 | - HOSKINS, J. ET AL., "Genome of the bacterium Streptococcus pneumoniae strain R6", J. BACTERIOL, (2001), vol. 183, doi:doi:10.1128/JB.183.19.5709-5717.2001, pages 5709 - 5717, XP002231307 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.183.19.5709-5717.2001 | - HAVARSTEIN, L.S.; COOMARASWAMY, G.; MORRISON, D.A., "An unmodified heptadecapeptide pheromone induces competence for genetic transformation in Streptococcus pneumoniae.", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1995), vol. 92, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.92.24.11140, pages 11140 - 11144, XP000892151 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.92.24.11140 | - HORINOUCHI, S.; WEISBLUM, B., "Nucleotide sequence and functional map of pC194, a plasmid that specifies inducible chloramphenicol resistance", J. BACTERIOL., (1982), vol. 150, pages 815 - 825 | - HORTON, R.M., "In Vitro Recombination and Mutagenesis of DNA : SOEing Together Tailor-Made Genes.", METHODS MOL. BIOL, (1993), vol. 15, pages 251 - 261 | - PODBIELSKI, A.; SPELLERBERG, B.; WOISCHNIK, M.; POHL, B.; LUTTICKEN, R., "Novel series of plasmid vectors for gene inactivation and expression analysis in group A streptococci (GAS", GENE, (1996), vol. 177, doi:doi:10.1016/0378-1119(96)84178-3, pages 137 - 147, XP004043388 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(96)84178-3 | - HUSMANN, L.K.; SCOTT, J.R.; LINDAHL, G.; STENBERG, L., "Expression of the Arp protein, a member of the M protein family, is not sufficient to inhibit phagocytosis of Streptococcus pyogenes.", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (1995), vol. 63, pages 345 - 348 | - GIBSON. D.G. ET AL., "Enzymatic assembly of DNA molecules up to several hundred kilobases", NAT METHODS, (2009), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1038/nmeth.1318, pages 343 - 345, XP055224105 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.1318 | WO1994US05700 | other | WO2014093661 | - JINEK M. ET AL, "A PROGRAMMABLE DUAL-RNA-GUIDED DNA ENDONUCLEASE IN ADAPTIVE BACTERIAL IMMUNITY (SUPPLEMENTARY MATERIAL)", SCIENCE, vol. 337, no. 6096, doi:10.1126/SCIENCE.1225829, pages 816 - 821, XP055067740 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1225829 | - CONG L. ET AL, "MULTIPLEX GENOME ENGINEERING USING CRISPR/CAS SYSTEMS", SCIENCE, (20130215), vol. 339, no. 6121, pages 819 - 823, XP055102030 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1231143 | - MALI P. ET AL, "RNA-GUIDED HUMAN GENOME ENGINEERING VIA CAS9", SCIENCE, (20130215), vol. 339, no. 6121, doi:10.1126/SCIENCE.1232033, pages 823 - 826, XP055111247 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033 | - WOONG Y HWANG ET AL, "EFFICIENT GENOME EDITING IN ZEBRAFISH USING A CRISPR-CAS SYSTEM", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (201303), vol. 31, no. 3, doi:10.1038/NBT.2501, pages 227 - 229, XP055086625 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2501 | Opposition | WO2014093694 | - Rainer Schulte, "Applicant deemed to be entitled", Rainer Schulte, Rainer Schulte, Patentgesetz mit Europäischem Patentübereinkommen, 9. Auflage, (20140000), page 376, XP055340142 | - "Voraussetzungen für die Inanspruchnahme der Unionspriorität", WIECZOREK. et al., Die Unionspriorität im Patentrecht Patentrecht - Grundfragen des Artikels 4 der Pariser Verbandsübereinkunft, (19750000), pages 128 - 149, ISBN 978-3-452-17822-0, XP055340146 | - SAUER, "Site-specific DNA recombination in mammalian cells by the Cre recombinase of bacteriophage P1.", PNAS, (19880000), vol. 85, no. 14, pages 5166 - 70, XP000615552 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.85.14.5166 | - REISS, "RecA protein stimulates homologous recombination in plants", PNAS, (19960000), vol. 93, pages 3094 - 98, XP002113813 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.7.3094 | - RAYMOND, "High-Efficiency FLP and ΦC31 Site-Specific Recombination in Mammalian Cells", Plos One, (20070000), vol. 2, no. 1, page e162, XP055069998 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0000162 | - CARNEY, "Induction of DNA Double-Strand Breaks by Electroporation of Restriction Enzymes into Mammalian Cells", CARNEY, Henderson Daryl S., DNA Repair Protocols, (19990000), vol. 113, pages 465 - 71, ISBN 978-1-59259-675-1, XP055340155 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1385/1-59259-675-4:465 | - MORGAN, "INDUCIBLE EXPRESSION AND CYTOGENETIC EFFECTS OF THE ECORI RESTRICTION ENDONUCLEASE IN CHINESE HAMSTER OVARY CELLS", Cell Biol, (19880000), vol. 8, no. 10, pages 4204 - 11, XP008014767 | - HARCK et al., Unionsprioritat, (20020700), pages 1 - 44, XP055340157 | - BREMI., "Traps when transferring priority rights, or When in Rome do as the Romans do: A discussion of some recent European and national case law and its practical implications", Institute of Professional Representatives before the European Patent Office, (20100100), pages 17 - 24, XP055340164 | - LIEBER, "The mechanism of double-strand DNA break repair by the nonhomologous DNA end-joining pathway.", Annu Rev Biochem, (20100000), vol. 79, no. 1, pages 181 - 211, XP055340167 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.biochem.052308.093131 | - JENSEN, "An update on targeted gene repair in mammalian cells: methods and mechanisms", Journal of Biomedical Science, (20110000), vol. 18, no. 1, pages 1 - 14, XP021085735 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1423-0127-18-10 | - DAVIS, "Zinc Finger Nucleases for Genome Editing", Genetic Engineering and Biotechnology News, (20100000), vol. 30, no. 13, XP055340181 | - MUSSOLINO., "A novel TALE nuclease scaffold enables high genome editing activity in combination with low toxicity", Nucleic Acid Res, (20110000), vol. 39, no. 21, pages 9283 - 9293, XP055021128 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkr597 | - YARRIS, "Programmable DNA Scissors Found for Bacterial Immune System", Berkeley Lab, (20120628), URL: http://newscenter.lbl.gov/2012/06/28/programmable-dna.scissors/, XP055340187 | - GOLIC, "RNA-Guided Nucleases: A New Era for Engineering the Genomes of Model and Nonmodel Organisms", Genetics, (20130000), vol. 195, no. 2, pages 303 - 308, XP055340188 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.113.155093 | - XU, "The Next Generation Biotechnology for Apple Improvement and Beyond: The CRISPR/Cas9 Story", New York Fruit Quarterly, (20130000), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 19 - 22, XP055340191 | - CHO, "Heritable Gene Knockout in Caenorhabditis elegans by Direct Injection of Cas9-sgRNA Ribonucleoproteins", Genetics, (20131100), vol. 195, no. 3, pages 1177 - 1180, XP055102693 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1534/genetics.113.155853 | - CARROLL, "Progress and prospects: Zinc-finger nucleases as gene therapy agents", Gene Therapy, (20081101), vol. 15, no. 22, pages 1463 - 1468, XP055041104 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/gt.2008.145 | - REYON et al., "FLASH assembly of TALENs for high-throughput genome editing", Nature Biotech, (20120408), vol. 30, no. 5, pages 460 - 465, XP055171169 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/0471142727.mb1216s103 |