EP2941439 - HUMAN SERUM ALBUMIN BINDING COMPOUNDS AND FUSION PROTEINS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covagen AG Gubelstrasse 34 6300 Zug / CH | [2016/07] |
Former [2015/46] | For all designated states Covagen AG Wagistrasse 25 8952 Zürich-Schlieren / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BULLER, Fabian Gubelstrasse34 CH-6300 Zug / CH | 02 /
WÜLLNER, Ulrich Gubelstrasse 34 CH-6300 Zug / CH | 03 /
ZBINDEN, Irene "-" deceased / CH | 04 /
ATTINGER-TOLLER, Isabella Gubelstrasse 34 CH-6300 Zug / CH | 05 /
VON DER BEY, Ulrike Gubelstrasse 34 CH-6300 Zug / CH | 06 /
KÖNIG-FRIEDRICH, Susann Gubelstrasse 34 CH-6300 Zug / CH | 07 /
BERTSCHINGER, Julian Gubelstrasse 34 CH-6300 Zug / CH | 08 /
GRABULOVSKI, Dragan Gubelstrasse 34 CH-6300 Zug / CH | 09 /
HENNE, Patricia Gubelstrasse 34 CH-6300 Zug / CH | [2018/04] |
Former [2015/46] | 01 /
BULLER, Fabian Hohenklingenallee 3 8049 Zürich / CH | ||
02 /
WÜLLNER, Ulrich Dorfstrasse 49b 8102 Oberengstringen / CH | |||
03 /
ZBINDEN, Irene Landenbergweg 18 8488 Turbenthal / CH | |||
04 /
ATTINGER-TOLLER, Isabella Stettbachstrasse 50 8051 Zürich / CH | |||
05 /
VON DER BEY, Ulrike Neue Halde 3/1 78359 Orsingen-Nenzingen / DE | |||
06 /
KÖNIG-FRIEDRICH, Susann Hauptstrasse 28 78244 Gottmadingen / DE | |||
07 /
BERTSCHINGER, Julian Am Tobelbach 17 8913 Ottenbach / CH | |||
08 /
GRABULOVSKI, Dragan Riedhofstrasse 57 8049 Zürich / CH | |||
09 /
HENNE, Patricia Kirchenstrasse 35 8957 Spreitenbach / CH | Representative(s) | Verhage, Richard Abraham, et al Janssen Vaccines & Prevention B.V. Archimedesweg 4-6 2333 CN Leiden / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2018/05] | Verhage, Richard Abraham, et al Janssen Vaccines & Prevention B.V. IP Department Archimedesweg 4-6 2333 CN Leiden / NL | ||
Former [2015/46] | Verhage, Richard Abraham, et al Crucell Holland B.V. IP Department Archimedesweg 4-6 2333 CN Leiden / NL | Application number, filing date | 13821463.0 | 18.12.2013 | [2015/46] | WO2013EP77227 | Priority number, date | EP20130150171 | 03.01.2013 Original published format: EP 13150171 | [2015/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014106583 | Date: | 10.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2941439 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2941439 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/765, C07K14/47, C12N1/21, C12N1/15, C12N5/10, C07K16/18 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
C12N9/12 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C07K14/765 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/46] | C07K14/765, C07K14/47, C12N1/21, C12N1/15, C12N5/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HUMANE SERUMALBUMIN BINDENDE VERBINDUNGEN UND FUSIONSPROTEINE DARAUS | [2017/35] | English: | HUMAN SERUM ALBUMIN BINDING COMPOUNDS AND FUSION PROTEINS THEREOF | [2015/46] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE LIAISON D'ALBUMINE DE SÉRUM HUMAIN ET LEURS PROTÉINES DE FUSION | [2017/35] |
Former [2015/46] | HUMANSERUMALBUMINBINDENDE VERBINDUNGEN UND FUSIONSPROTEINE DARAUS | ||
Former [2015/46] | COMPOSÉS LIANT L'ALBUMINE SÉRIQUE HUMAINE ET PROTÉINES DE FUSION CORRESPONDANTES | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/46] | 08.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.12.2013 | AL | 31.01.2018 | AT | 31.01.2018 | CY | 31.01.2018 | CZ | 31.01.2018 | DK | 31.01.2018 | EE | 31.01.2018 | ES | 31.01.2018 | FI | 31.01.2018 | HR | 31.01.2018 | IT | 31.01.2018 | LT | 31.01.2018 | LV | 31.01.2018 | MC | 31.01.2018 | MK | 31.01.2018 | NL | 31.01.2018 | PL | 31.01.2018 | PT | 31.01.2018 | RO | 31.01.2018 | RS | 31.01.2018 | SE | 31.01.2018 | SI | 31.01.2018 | SK | 31.01.2018 | SM | 31.01.2018 | TR | 31.01.2018 | BG | 30.04.2018 | NO | 30.04.2018 | GR | 01.05.2018 | IS | 31.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PT | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | ES | 31.01.2018 | |
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | ES | 31.01.2018 | |
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [ID]EP1892248 (EIDGENOESS TECH HOCHSCHULE [CH]) [ID] 1-15 * Whole document, especially example 2 and figure 5 *; | [A]EP2524927 (COVAGEN AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * Whole document, especially claim 1 *; | [A] - LEE C-H ET AL, "A single amino acid in the SH3 domain of Hck determines its high affinity and specificity in binding to HIV-1 Nef protein", EMBO JOURNAL, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (19950101), vol. 14, no. 20, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 5006 - 5015, XP002236097 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [AD] - ERPEL T ET AL, "Mutational analysis of the Src SH3 domain: the same residues of the ligand binding surface are important for intra- and intermolecular interactions.", THE EMBO JOURNAL 1 MAR 1995, (19950301), vol. 14, no. 5, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 963 - 975, XP002696729 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9101743 | WO0145746 | WO02076489 | WO2004041865 | EP2054432 | US6080560 | US4946778 | EP0239400 | WO9007861 | - DENNIS MS ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2002), vol. 277, no. 38, pages 35035 - 35043 | - JONSSON A. ET AL., PROTEIN ENG DES SEL, (2008), vol. 21, no. 8, pages 515 - 527 | - HOLT L. J. ET AL., PROTEIN ENG DES SEL, (2008), vol. 21, pages 283 - 288 | - WALKER, A. ET AL., PROTEIN ENG DES SE, (2010), vol. 123, pages 271 - 278 | - SKERRA A., J. MOL. RECOGNIT., (2000), vol. 13, pages 167 - 187 | - GEBAUER M; SKERRA A., CURR OPINION IN CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (2009), vol. 13, pages 245 - 255 | - BERTSCHINGER J. ET AL., PROTEIN ENG DES SEL, (2007), vol. 20, no. 2, pages 57 - 68 | - WEBB MILLER; DAVID J. LIPMAN, "Gapped BLAST and PSI-BLAST: a new generation of protein database search programs", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - SANGASTINO ET AL., BLOOD, (2012), vol. 120, no. 12, pages 2405 - 2411 | - MUSACCHIO ET AL., PROG. BIOPHYS. MOL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 61, pages 283 - 297 | - MUSACCHIO A., ADVANCES IN PROTEIN CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 61, pages 211 - 268 | - REN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 259, pages 1157 - 1161 | - KARKKAINEN ET AL., EMBO REP., (2006), vol. 7, pages 186 - 191 | - KOYAMA ET AL., CELL, (1993), vol. 72, no. 6, pages 945 - 952 | - LARSON ET AL., PROTEIN SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 9, pages 2170 - 2180 | - ERPEL ET AL., "Mutational analysis of the Src SH3 domain: the same residues of the ligand binding surface are important for intra- and intermolecular interactions", EMBO J., (1995), vol. 14, no. 5, pages 963 - 75 | - GRABULOVSKI ET AL., JBC, (2007), vol. 282, pages 3196 - 3204 | - HOLT ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, DESIGN & SELECTION, (2008), vol. 21, no. 5, pages 283 - 288 | - DENNIS ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2002), vol. 277, no. 38, pages 35035 - 35043 | - ALBERTS ET AL., Molecular Biology of the Cell, GARLAND SCIENCE, pages 518 - 519 | - STROHL W., CURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL, (2009), vol. 20, pages 685 - 691 | - BAEUERLE PA ET AL., CURR OPIN MOL THER., (2003), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 413 - 419 | - WOLF E. ET AL., DRUG DISCOV TODAY, (2005), vol. 10, no. 18, pages 1237 - 1244 | - BAUERLE PA; REINHARDT C., CANCER RES, (2009), vol. 69, no. 12, pages 4941 - 4944 | - FRIEDRICH M. ET AL., MOL CANCER THER., (2012), vol. 11, pages 2664 - 2673 | - BRAASCH; COREY, CHEMISTRY & BIOLOGY, (2001), vol. 8, pages 1 - 7 | - OWENS, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 1471 - 1476 | - GHAHROUDI ET AL., FEBS LETTERS, (1997), vol. 414, pages 521 - 526 | - SCHLATTER ET AL., MABS, (2012), vol. 4, no. 4, pages 497 - 50 | - GRABULOVSKI D. ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2007), vol. 282, pages 3196 - 3204 | - VITI, F. ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (2000), vol. 326, pages 480 - 505 | - BERTSCHINGER ET AL., PROTEIN ENG DES SEL, (2007), vol. 20, no. 2, pages 57 - 68 | - DREIER, INT. J. CANCER, (2002), vol. 100, pages 690 - 697 |