EP2941885 - CONDITIONAL SIGNALING OF PICTURE ORDER COUNT TIMING INFORMATION FOR VIDEO TIMING IN VIDEO CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2015/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Ye-Kui 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | [2016/44] |
Former [2015/46] | 01 /
WANG, Ye-Kui c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | Representative(s) | Richardson, Julie Kate Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/46] | Richardson, Julie Kate Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 13821600.7 | 20.12.2013 | [2015/46] | WO2013US77267 | Priority number, date | US201361749866P | 07.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361749866 P | US201314061130 | 23.10.2013 Original published format: US201314061130 | [2015/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014107360 | Date: | 10.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2941885 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2941885 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/85, H04N19/70, H04N19/44, H04N19/46, H04N19/149 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
H04N19/70 (EP,EA,US);
H04N19/149 (EP,EA,US);
H04N19/44 (EP,EA,US);
H04N19/46 (EP,EA,US);
H04N19/513 (EA,US);
H04N19/85 (EP,EA,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/46] | H04N19/70, H04N19/149, H04N19/44, H04N19/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEDINGTE SIGNALISIERUNG VON BILDORDNUNGSZAHL (POC) TIMING INFORMATION FÜR VIDEO TIMING IN DER VIDEOKODIERUNG | [2016/21] | English: | CONDITIONAL SIGNALING OF PICTURE ORDER COUNT TIMING INFORMATION FOR VIDEO TIMING IN VIDEO CODING | [2015/46] | French: | SIGNALISATION CONDITIONNÉE DE COMPTE D'ORDRE D'IMAGE (POC) SIGNAL D'HORLOGE POUR LA SYNCHRONISATION VIDEO EN CODAGE VIDÉO | [2016/21] |
Former [2015/46] | BEDINGTE SIGNALISIERUNG VON BILDORDNUNGSZAHL-TIMING-INFORMATIONEN FÜR VIDEOTIMING IN EINER VIDEOCODIERUNG | ||
Former [2015/46] | SIGNALISATION CONDITIONNELLE D'INFORMATIONS DE SYNCHRONISATION DE NUMÉRO D'ORDRE D'IMAGE POUR SYNCHRONISATION VIDÉO EN CODAGE VIDÉO | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/46] | 10.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.11.2016 | CY | 02.11.2016 | EE | 02.11.2016 | HR | 02.11.2016 | LT | 02.11.2016 | LV | 02.11.2016 | MC | 02.11.2016 | MK | 02.11.2016 | RS | 02.11.2016 | SK | 02.11.2016 | SM | 02.11.2016 | LU | 20.12.2016 | MT | 20.12.2016 | BG | 02.02.2017 | IS | 02.03.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2018/43] | CY | 02.11.2016 | |
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
LU | 20.12.2016 | ||
MT | 20.12.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/32] | CY | 02.11.2016 | |
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
LU | 20.12.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | EE | 02.11.2016 | |
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
LU | 20.12.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | EE | 02.11.2016 | |
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | EE | 02.11.2016 | |
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | HR | 02.11.2016 | |
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 02.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [I] - BROSS B ET AL, "High Efficiency Video Coding (HEVC) text specification draft 9 (SoDIS) - version v1", 11. JCT-VC MEETING; 102. MPEG MEETING; 10-10-2012 - 19-10-2012; SHANGHAI; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20121021), no. JCTVC-K1003, XP030113269 [I] 1-46 * paragraph [7.3.2.1] * * paragraph [7.3.2.2] * * paragraph [7.4.2.1] * * paragraph [7.4.2.2] * * paragraph [Annex E1.1] * * paragraph [Annex E1.2] * * paragraph [Annex C] * | [I] - HAQUE M ET AL, "Simplifications of HRD parameters for Temporal Scalability", 10. JCT-VC MEETING; 101. MPEG MEETING; 11-7-2012 - 20-7-2012; STOCKHOLM; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120703), no. JCTVC-J0272, XP030112634 [I] 1-46 * the whole document * | [I] - HAQUE (SONY) M ET AL, "AHG10: VUI and HRD syntax designs agreed by the BoG on VPS and NUH", 10. JCT-VC MEETING; 101. MPEG MEETING; 11-7-2012 - 20-7-2012; STOCKHOLM; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120714), no. JCTVC-J0548, XP030112910 [I] 1-46 * the whole document * | [I] - Y-K WANG (QUALCOMM), "AHG9: On fixed_pic_rate_flag", 10. JCT-VC MEETING; 101. MPEG MEETING; 11-7-2012 - 20-7-2012; STOCKHOLM; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120715), no. JCTVC-J0570, XP030112932 [I] 1-46 * the whole document * | [AP] - SACHIN DESHPANDE ET AL, "An improved hypothetical reference decoder for HEVC", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, (20130221), vol. 8666, doi:10.1117/12.2009907, ISSN 0277-786X, page 866608, XP055093190 [AP] 1-46 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.2009907 | [A] - JENNIFER L H WEBB, "HRD Conformance for Real-time H.264 Video Encoding", IMAGE PROCESSING, 2007. ICIP 2007. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PI, (20070901), ISBN 978-1-4244-1436-9, pages V - 305, XP031158546 [A] 1-46 * the whole document * | [A] - CHOU P A ET AL, "A generalized hypothetical reference decoder for H.264/AVC", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20030701), vol. 13, no. 7, doi:10.1109/TCSVT.2003.814965, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 674 - 687, XP011099259 [A] 1-46 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2003.814965 | [A] - CHEN Y ET AL, "3D-HLS: Video parameter set for 3D-HEVC", 1. JCT-3V MEETING; 101. MPEG MEETING; 16-7-2012 - 20-7-2012; STOCKHOLM; (THE JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON 3D VIDEO CODING EXTENSION DEVELOPMENT OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://PHENIX.INT-EVRY.FR/JCT2/,, (20120711), no. JCT3V-A0099, XP030130098 [A] 1-46 * the whole document * | [A] - Y-K WANG ET AL, "AHG9: On video parameter set", 11. JCT-VC MEETING; 102. MPEG MEETING; 10-10-2012 - 19-10-2012; SHANGHAI; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20121001), no. JCTVC-K0125, XP030113007 [A] 1-46 * the whole document * | by applicant | - BROSS ET AL., "Proposed editorial improvements for High Efficiency Video Coding (HEVC) text specification draft 9 (SoDIS", JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING (JCT-VC) OF ITU-T SG 16 WP 3 AND ISO/IEC JTC 1/SC 29/WG 11, (20130107), URL: http://phenix.int- evry.fr/jct/doc_end_user/documents/12_Geneva/wg11/JCTVC-L0030-vl.zip | - BROSS ET AL., "High efficiency video coding (HEVC) text specification draft 10 (for FDIS & Last Call", JCTVC-L1003V34, (20130114), URL: http://phenix.int- evry.fr/jct/doc_end_user/documents/12_Geneva/wg11/JCTVC-L1003-v34.zip |