EP2882809 - METHOD FOR IMPROVING ADHESION OF POLYURETHANE ADHESIVE TO POLYESTER BASED LAMINATE WITHOUT SURFACE PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel IP & Holding GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2015/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAH, Jayesh P. 401 casa grande 12 Boat Club Road Riverside Estate Bund Garden Pune Maharastra 411001 / IN | 02 /
GOVINDARAJAN, Sankar 1/97 Puliyur Arasampatti Krishnagiri Tamil Nadu 635201 / IN | [2015/25] | Representative(s) | Henkel IP Department c/o Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/25] | Hemme, Wilhelm Ludger Henkel AG & Co. KGaA CLI Patente Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 13827138.2 | 16.07.2013 | WO2013US50587 | Priority number, date | US201261681919P | 10.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261681919 P | [2015/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014025499 | Date: | 13.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2882809 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.02.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/06, C08K5/10, C08K5/05, B32B27/36, B32B7/12, B32B27/08, B32B27/20, B32B27/40, B32B37/12, C08F283/01, C08K5/00, C09J133/06 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
B32B27/36 (EP,KR,US);
C08L67/06 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/20 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/40 (EP,KR,US);
B32B37/12 (KR,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/20 (KR);
C08F283/01 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/0025 (EP,KR,US);
C09J133/066 (KR,US);
B32B2255/10 (KR,US);
B32B2255/26 (KR,US);
B32B2262/101 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/54 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F283/01, C08F220/20 (US,EP);
C08K5/0025, C08L67/06 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2015/25] | C08L67/06, C08K5/10, C08K5/05, B32B27/36, B32B7/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER HAFTUNG VON POLYURETHANKLEBSTOFF AN POLYESTERBASIERTEM LAMINAT OHNE OBERFLÄCHENVORBEREITUNG | [2015/25] | English: | METHOD FOR IMPROVING ADHESION OF POLYURETHANE ADHESIVE TO POLYESTER BASED LAMINATE WITHOUT SURFACE PREPARATION | [2015/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR AMÉLIORER L'ADHÉSION D'ADHÉSIF DE POLYURÉTHANE À UN STRATIFIÉ À BASE DE POLYESTER SANS PRÉPARATION DE SURFACE | [2015/25] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2015 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/25] | 08.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/28] | 02.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5416159 (JUDAY THOMAS W [US]) [X] 1-14* the whole document *; | [X]WO9845343 (C O I M S P A CHIMICA ORGANICA [IT], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2013120249 (DEUCHEM SHANGHAI CHEMICAL CO LTD [CN], et al) [E] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5508111 (SCHMUCKER ARDEN E [US]); | [A]US2003062124 (FOUQUAY STEPHANE [FR], et al); | [X]US2004170850 (NAVA HILDEBERTO [US]); | [A]US2008076588 (PETERS DAVID D [US], et al); | [Y]US2009229747 (OLSON DANIEL ROBERT [US], et al) |