EP2934788 - MOLD MATERIAL MIXTURES CONTAINING METAL OXIDES OF ALUMINUM AND ZIRCONIUM IN PARTICULATE FORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASK Chemicals GmbH Reisholzstrasse 16-18 40721 Hilden / DE | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DETERS, Heinz Scheidtstrasse 5 40239 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
ZUPAN, Henning Gosenburg 49 42289 Wuppertal / DE | 03 /
OBERLEITER, Martin Vennhauser Allee 73 40229 Düsseldorf / DE | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Schellerdamm 19 21079 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Schellerdamm 19 21079 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 13830178.3 | 20.12.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013DE00814 | Priority number, date | DE201210113074 | 22.12.2012 Original published format: DE102012113074 | [2015/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014094722 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2934788 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2934788 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/09] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2934788 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B22C1/18 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
B22C1/188 (EP,US);
C04B35/109 (US);
B22C1/162 (EP,US);
B22C1/18 (RU);
B22C9/02 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FORMSTOFFMISCHUNGEN ENTHALTEND METALLOXIDE DES ALUMINIUMS UND ZIRKONIUMS IN PARTIKULÄRER FORM | [2015/44] | English: | MOLD MATERIAL MIXTURES CONTAINING METAL OXIDES OF ALUMINUM AND ZIRCONIUM IN PARTICULATE FORM | [2015/44] | French: | MÉLANGE DE MATIÈRES À MOULER CONTENANT DES OXYDES MÉTALLIQUES DE L'ALUMINIUM ET DU ZIRCONIUM SOUS FORME PARTICULAIRE | [2018/33] |
Former [2015/44] | MÉLANGES DE MATIÈRES À MOULER CONTENANT DES OXYDES MÉTALLIQUES DE L'ALUMINIUM ET DU ZIRCONIUM SOUS FORME PARTICULAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 05.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 22.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.11.2019
29.11.2019
ADMISSIBLE Reinsicht GmbH Ringstrasse 138 70839 Gerlingen / DE Opponent's representative Eberle, Michael Patentanwaltskanzlei Cartagena PartG Klement, Eberle mbB Urbanstraße 53 DE-70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/02] | 11.12.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.04.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.07.2021 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2022/01] | 20.07.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.08.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.08.2021 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 27.02.2019 | CY | 27.02.2019 | DK | 27.02.2019 | EE | 27.02.2019 | FI | 27.02.2019 | HR | 27.02.2019 | LT | 27.02.2019 | LV | 27.02.2019 | MC | 27.02.2019 | MK | 27.02.2019 | MT | 27.02.2019 | PL | 27.02.2019 | RO | 27.02.2019 | RS | 27.02.2019 | SM | 27.02.2019 | BG | 27.05.2019 | NO | 27.05.2019 | GR | 28.05.2019 | IS | 27.06.2019 | PT | 27.06.2019 | IE | 20.12.2019 | LU | 20.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
MT | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
IE | 20.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
IE | 20.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
IE | 20.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
IE | 20.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 27.02.2019 | |
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XPI]WO2013159762 (ASK CHEMICALS GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1,5-8,10,16-30 * the whole document *[I] 2-4,9,11-15 | Opposition | EP0188688 | DE102004042535 |