EP2894853 - IMAGE ENCODING METHOD, IMAGE DECODING METHOD, IMAGE ENCODING DEVICE, IMAGE DECODING DEVICE, AND IMAGE ENCODING AND DECODING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2023 | Change: Date of oral proceedings | 22.09.2023 | Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Patent Trust 450 Lexington Avenue, 38th Floor New York, NY 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/33] | For all designated states Sun Patent Trust 450 Lexington Avenue, 38th Floor New York NY 10017 / US | ||
Former [2015/29] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200 Torrance, CA 90503 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERADA, Kengo C/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co. Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
SHIBAHARA, Youji C/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co. Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
TANIKAWA, Kyoko C/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co. Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
SASAI, Hisao C/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co. Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
SUGIO, Toshiyasu C/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co. Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
MATSUNOBU, Toru C/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co. Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/29] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/29] | Application number, filing date | 13835357.8 | 08.08.2013 | WO2013JP04794 | Priority number, date | US201261697330P | 06.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261697330 P | [2015/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014038130 | Date: | 13.03.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2894853 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.03.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/463, // H04N19/70 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
H04N19/463 (EP,RU,US);
H04N19/196 (US);
G06T9/00 (RU);
H04N19/124 (RU,US);
H04N19/136 (US);
H04N19/176 (US);
H04N19/18 (US);
H04N19/70 (EP,RU,US);
H04N19/90 (RU,US);
H04N7/12 (RU)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/29] | H04N19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] | Title | German: | BILDCODIERUNGSVERFAHREN, BILDDECODIERUNGSVERFAHREN, BILDCODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDDECODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG SOWIE BILDCODIERUNGS- UND -DECODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2015/29] | English: | IMAGE ENCODING METHOD, IMAGE DECODING METHOD, IMAGE ENCODING DEVICE, IMAGE DECODING DEVICE, AND IMAGE ENCODING AND DECODING DEVICE | [2015/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE D'IMAGE, DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE D'IMAGE, DISPOSITIF DE DÉCODAGE D'IMAGE, ET DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE ET DE DÉCODAGE D'IMAGE | [2015/29] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2015 | Translation filed | 05.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2015 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 07.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 27.05.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Appeal following examination | 03.08.2021 | Appeal received No. T1341/21 | 04.08.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 03.08.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.10.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.08.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CA2815985 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0079] * * figures 1,2,4,5 *; | [Y] - BROSS B ET AL, "High Efficiency Video Coding (HEVC) text specification draft 8", 10. JCT-VC MEETING; 101. MPEG MEETING; 11-7-2012 - 20-7-2012; STOCKHOLM; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120723), no. JCTVC-J1003, XP030112947 [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [7.3.2.2] - paragraph [7.3.2.5] * * page 68, line 22 - line 33 * * page 71, paragraph l - page 72, line 2 * * paragraph [7.4.2.4] - paragraph [7.4.2.5] * | [XP] - sasai; Kazushi S, "#762 default value for ScalingList", (20121030), JCTVC-HEVC, URL: https://hevc.hhi.fraunhofer.de/trac/hevc/ticket/762, (20160429), XP002757152 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * | [XP] - Zhou, "#787 Scaling lists undefined when scaling_list_enable_flag = 1 and sps_scaling_list_data_presetnt_flag = 0", (20120929), JCTVC-HEVC, URL: https://hevc.hhi.fraunhofer.de/trac/hevc/ticket/787, (20160429), XP002757153 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - MORIGAMI Y ET AL, "On Transform Skip", 10. JCT-VC MEETING; 101. MPEG MEETING; 11-7-2012 - 20-7-2012; STOCKHOLM; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/, (20120702), no. JCTVC-J0184, XP030112546 [A] 2,8 * sections 2.1-2.2 * | [A] - KIM H Y ET AL, "QM bypass for transform skip mode", 10. JCT-VC MEETING; 101. MPEG MEETING; 11-7-2012 - 20-7-2012; STOCKHOLM; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/, (20120702), no. JCTVC-J0201, XP030112563 [A] 2,8 * sections 1 and 2 * | [A] - JUNICHI TANAKA ET AL, "Quantization matrix for HEVC", 20110310, (20110310), no. JCTVC-E073, ISSN 0000-0007, XP030008579 [A] 4,10 * section 1 * * section 2.3.2.1 * | International search | [Y]JP2006262004 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2007520165 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.) |