EP2926770 - INTRAOCULAR LENS INSERTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kowa Company, Ltd. 6-29, Nishiki 3-chome, Naka-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 460-8625 / JP | [2024/01] |
Former [2015/41] | For all designated states Kowa Company, Ltd. 6-29, Nishiki 3-chome, Naka-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 460-8625 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Kenichi c/o KOWA COMPANY LTD. IOL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT DEPT. 7-10 Toyoda 2-chome Minami-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 457-0841 / JP | [2015/41] | Representative(s) | Ribeiro, James Michael Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2024/01] |
Former [2015/41] | Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13858851.2 | 29.11.2013 | [2015/41] | WO2013JP82183 | Priority number, date | JP20120260423 | 29.11.2012 Original published format: JP 2012260423 | [2015/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014084355 | Date: | 05.06.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2926770 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2926770 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/16 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
A61F2/167 (EP,US);
A61F2/1678 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INSTRUMENT ZUM EINSETZEN VON INTRAOKULARLINSEN | [2015/41] | English: | INTRAOCULAR LENS INSERTION DEVICE | [2015/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INSERTION DE LENTILLE INTRAOCULAIRE | [2015/41] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2015 | Translation filed | 27.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/41] | 13.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1832247 (HOYA CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * figures 4,6 * [Y] 2-4; | [XY]EP2161005 (HOYA CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0139] - paragraph [0146]; figures 36-41 * [Y] 2-4; | [XY]EP2343029 (NIDEK KK [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document *[Y] 2-4; | [XY]WO2012081421 (KOWA CO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2-4 | International search | WO9962436 [ ] (ALCON LAB INC [US]); | CA2299462 [ ] (ALCON LAB INC [US]); | AU3753199 [ ] (ALCON LAB INC); | [A]US6010510 (BROWN KYLE [US], et al); | EP0980230 [ ] (ALCON LAB INC [US]); | AU730447B [ ] (ALCON LAB INC); | ATE211375T [ ] (ALCON LAB INC [US]); | DE69900737D [ ] (ALCON LAB INC [US]); | JP2002516709 [ ]; | DE69900737T [ ] (ALCON LAB INC [US]); | US2007173860 [ ] (IWASAKI TAKUYA [JP]); | [Y]WO2007087104 (ALCON MFG LTD [US], et al); | EP1857075 [ ] (CANON STAAR CO INC [JP]); | CN101073518 [ ] (CANON STAAR CO INC [JP]); | US2007270881 [ ] (HISHINUMA YASUHIRO [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2007307082 (CANON STAR KK); | [A]JP2008012016 (HOYA CORP); | EP2343029 [ ] (NIDEK KK [JP]); | [A]JP2012050713 (NIDEK KK); | [Y]WO2012086797 (KOWA CO [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH0824282 | JP2009028223 |