EP2955345 - MARINE DIESEL ENGINE EXHAUST GAS TREATMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Electric Co., Ltd. 1-1 Tanabeshinden Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | [2015/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INUI, Takashi c/o FUJI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 1-1 Tanabeshinden, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | 02 /
KAWAKAMI, Hitomi c/o FUJI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 1-1 Tanabeshinden, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-9530 / JP | [2015/51] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/51] |
Former [2015/51] | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13873380.3 | 30.01.2013 | [2015/51] | WO2013JP00508 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014118819 | Date: | 07.08.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2955345 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2955345 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.08.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/01, B01D53/50, B01D53/77, B03C3/38, F01N3/02, F01N3/04, B01D53/30, B01D53/92, B03C3/017, B03C3/06, B03C3/41, B03C3/49, B01D53/78, F01N13/00, F01N3/027 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
F01N3/01 (EP,CN,KR);
F01N13/009 (CN);
B01D53/30 (EP,KR);
B01D53/507 (EP,KR);
B01D53/78 (EP,KR);
B01D53/92 (EP);
B03C3/017 (EP);
B03C3/06 (EP,KR);
B03C3/41 (EP,KR);
B03C3/49 (EP,KR);
F01N13/004 (EP,KR);
F01N3/0275 (EP,KR);
F01N3/085 (CN);
F01N3/0885 (CN);
F01N9/00 (CN);
G01N15/06 (KR);
G01N21/39 (KR);
B01D2252/1035 (EP,CN);
B01D2257/302 (EP);
B01D2258/01 (EP);
B01D2259/4566 (EP);
B03C2201/10 (EP);
F01N2560/022 (CN);
F01N2560/027 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2015/51] | F01N3/01, B01D53/50, B01D53/77, B03C3/38, F01N3/02, F01N3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGASBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM FÜR SCHIFFSDIESELMOTOR | [2015/51] | English: | MARINE DIESEL ENGINE EXHAUST GAS TREATMENT SYSTEM | [2015/51] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DES GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT DE MOTEUR DIESEL MARIN | [2015/51] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2015 | Translation filed | 13.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/51] | 07.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2013 | AL | 18.12.2019 | AT | 18.12.2019 | CY | 18.12.2019 | CZ | 18.12.2019 | DK | 18.12.2019 | EE | 18.12.2019 | ES | 18.12.2019 | FI | 18.12.2019 | HR | 18.12.2019 | LT | 18.12.2019 | LV | 18.12.2019 | MC | 18.12.2019 | MK | 18.12.2019 | MT | 18.12.2019 | NL | 18.12.2019 | PL | 18.12.2019 | RO | 18.12.2019 | RS | 18.12.2019 | SE | 18.12.2019 | SI | 18.12.2019 | SK | 18.12.2019 | SM | 18.12.2019 | TR | 18.12.2019 | IE | 30.01.2020 | LU | 30.01.2020 | BE | 31.01.2020 | CH | 31.01.2020 | LI | 31.01.2020 | BG | 18.03.2020 | GB | 18.03.2020 | NO | 18.03.2020 | GR | 19.03.2020 | IS | 18.04.2020 | PT | 13.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.01.2013 | |
AL | 18.12.2019 | ||
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CY | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
MT | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
TR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 30.01.2020 | ||
LU | 30.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
GB | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 30.01.2020 | ||
LU | 30.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
GB | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/14] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 30.01.2020 | ||
LU | 30.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
IE | 30.01.2020 | ||
LU | 30.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 30.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 30.01.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
LU | 30.01.2020 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 18.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1040865 (MCDERMOTT TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2009145126 (CHILLAR RAHUL J [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0045] - [0052]; figure 1 *; | [I]WO2011065118 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH05200324 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JP2003104292 (WAERTSILAE TECH OY AB); | [Y]JP2004081933 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]JP2004314044 (MIYAMOTO TADASHI, et al); | [Y]JP2005066505 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]JP2008168212 (ANES CO LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2009112978 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2012192361 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2004081933 | JP2009052440 |