EP2959349 - A ROBOTIC WORK TOOL CONFIGURED FOR IMPROVED TURNING IN A SLOPE, A ROBOTIC WORK TOOL SYSTEM, AND A METHOD FOR USE IN THE ROBOTIC WORK TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/01] | A ROBOTIC WORK TOOL CONFIGURED FOR IMPROVED TURNING IN A SLOPE, A ROBOTIC WORK TOOL SYSTEM, AND A METHOD FOR USE IN THE ROBOT WORK TOOL | ||
[2020/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Husqvarna AB Drottninggatan 2 561 82 Huskvarna / SE | [2021/04] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states Husqvarna AB Drottninggatan 2 56182 Huskvarna / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGSTRÖM, Jonas Lyckevägen 24 S-570 21 Malmbäck / SE | 02 /
KLACKENSJÖ, Fredrik Eskilstorp 10 S-571 97 Forserum / SE | 03 /
MARKUSSON, Olle Floragatan 20 S-564 32 Bankeryd / SE | [2016/01] | Application number, filing date | 13875731.5 | 20.02.2013 | [2016/01] | WO2013SE50141 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014129941 | Date: | 28.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2959349 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2959349 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.08.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60L50/60, B60L50/52, B60L53/16, A01D34/00, A01D75/28, B60L1/00, B62D11/00, B60L15/20, G05D1/02, B60L3/00, B60L8/00 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
A01D34/008 (EP,US);
A01D75/28 (EP,US);
B60L1/003 (EP,US);
B60L15/20 (EP,US);
B60L3/0061 (EP,US);
B60L50/52 (EP,US);
B60L50/66 (EP,US);
B60L53/16 (EP,US);
B60L8/003 (EP,US);
B62D11/001 (EP,US);
G05D1/0212 (US);
G05D1/0259 (US);
G05D1/0265 (EP,US);
G05D1/027 (EP,US);
B60L2200/40 (EP,US);
B60L2240/36 (EP,US);
B60L2240/421 (EP,US);
B60L2260/32 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/13] | A01D34/00, A01D75/28, G05D1/02, B62D11/00, B60L1/00, B60L11/18, B60L3/00, B60L8/00, B60L15/20 | ||
Former IPC [2016/47] | A01D34/00, A01D75/28, G05D1/02, B62D11/00 | ||
Former IPC [2016/01] | G05D1/02, A01D34/00, B62D11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROBOTISCHES ARBEITSWERKZEUG FÜR VERBESSERTE DREHUNG IN EINER NEIGUNG, SYSTEM MIT DEM ROBOTISCHEN ARBEITSWERKZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DEM ROBOTISCHEN ARBEITSWERKZEUG | [2016/01] | English: | A ROBOTIC WORK TOOL CONFIGURED FOR IMPROVED TURNING IN A SLOPE, A ROBOTIC WORK TOOL SYSTEM, AND A METHOD FOR USE IN THE ROBOTIC WORK TOOL | [2020/45] | French: | OUTIL DE TRAVAIL ROBOTIQUE CONFIGURÉ POUR MIEUX TOURNER DANS UNE PENTE, SYSTÈME D'OUTIL DE TRAVAIL ROBOTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION DE L'OUTIL DE TRAVAIL ROBOTIQUE | [2016/01] |
Former [2016/01] | A ROBOTIC WORK TOOL CONFIGURED FOR IMPROVED TURNING IN A SLOPE, A ROBOTIC WORK TOOL SYSTEM, AND A METHOD FOR USE IN THE ROBOT WORK TOOL | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 24.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.12.2019 | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.02.2013 | AL | 27.01.2021 | AT | 27.01.2021 | CY | 27.01.2021 | CZ | 27.01.2021 | DK | 27.01.2021 | EE | 27.01.2021 | ES | 27.01.2021 | FI | 27.01.2021 | HR | 27.01.2021 | IT | 27.01.2021 | LT | 27.01.2021 | LV | 27.01.2021 | MC | 27.01.2021 | NL | 27.01.2021 | PL | 27.01.2021 | RO | 27.01.2021 | RS | 27.01.2021 | SI | 27.01.2021 | SK | 27.01.2021 | SM | 27.01.2021 | IE | 20.02.2021 | LU | 20.02.2021 | CH | 28.02.2021 | LI | 28.02.2021 | BG | 27.04.2021 | NO | 27.04.2021 | GR | 28.04.2021 | IS | 27.05.2021 | PT | 27.05.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 20.02.2013 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 20.02.2021 | ||
LU | 20.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 20.02.2021 | ||
LU | 20.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 20.02.2021 | ||
LU | 20.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 20.02.2021 | ||
LU | 20.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
IE | 20.02.2021 | ||
LU | 20.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
LU | 20.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
LU | 20.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
LU | 20.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
LU | 20.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
LU | 20.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5204814 (NOONAN THOMAS H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,10,16-18 * abstract * * column 1, lines 6-10 * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 46 * * column 7, lines 3-33 * * column 9, lines 11-18 * [A] 5-8,11-15; | [X]US2002156556 (RUFFNER BRYAN J [US]) [X] 3,9,19,20 * figures 3, 7; claims 1, 8 * * paragraphs [0078] - [0080] - [0 94] - [0095] - [ 1 4] , [ 131] - [0133] *; | [XI]WO2006087542 (KING S COLLEGE LONDON [GB], et al) [X] 3,19,20 * abstract * * page 3, lines 5-12 * * page 4, lines 22-26 * * page 9, lines 11-23 * * page 10, lines 11-19 * * page 11, lines 7-14 * * page 12, lines 2-4 * * page 14, line 23 - page 15, line 4 *[I] 9; | [A]EP1745686 (BERNINI FABRIZIO [IT]) [A] 1,16-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0053] *; | [A]EP2412221 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [XA]US2012047862 (BAIRD JEFFERY D [US]) [X] 1,2,10,16,18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0 12] , [0 15] , [0 22] - [0026] * [A] 4-8,11-15,17; | [XI]US2012265391 (LETSKY MICHAEL TODD [US]) [X] 3,19,20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0066] - [0067] - [0 95] - [0096] - [ 116] - [0117] - [ 120] - [0121] - [ 128] * [I] 9; | [E]WO2013104455 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [E] 3,9,19,20 * abstract * * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 14 * * page 10, lines 7-25 * * page 11, lines 13-33 * * page 14, line 22 - page 15, line 21 * | International search | [X]US5204814 (NOONAN THOMAS H [US], et al); | [X]EP1745686 (BERNINI FABRIZIO [IT]); | [X]US2012095636 (ISHII NORIHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]US2012298429 (GREENWOOD CHRISTOPHER JOHN [GB], et al); | [XP]WO2013104455 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) | by applicant | US5204814 | US2002156556 | US2012047862 |